Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-16004

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Laurel M Isicoff
Case #: 1:18-ap-01197
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Apr 26, 2018
Terminated:Apr 12, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
Trinity Contructors of Florida, Inc., a Florida Corporation,
Represented By
Trinity Contructors of Florida, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Marcia Dunn
555 NE 15 Street Suite 934-A
Miami, FL 33132
Represented By
Alexis S Read
Dunn Law, P.A.
contact info
Michael P Dunn
Dunn Law, P.A.
contact info
Tyler A Stull
Dunn Law, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/14/2025 1:06 PM EDT
Friday, April 12, 2019
29 29 court Close Adversary Case Fri 04/12 10:27 AM
Adversary Case 1:18-ap-1197 Closed. Judgment in Favor of Plaintiff (Sanabria, Noemi)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 25, 2019
28 28 misc Certificate of Service Mon 02/25 3:10 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Marcia Dunn Related [+]. (Dunn, Michael)
Related: [-] 23 Judgment
Saturday, February 23, 2019
27 27 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 02/24 12:18 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 02/23/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 24 Notice of Entry (Re:23 Consent Final Judgment Against Trinity Constructors of Florida Inc. .)
26 26 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 02/24 12:18 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 02/23/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 23 Consent Final Judgment Against Trinity Constructors of Florida Inc. .
25 25 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 02/24 12:18 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 02/23/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 24 Notice of Entry (Re:23 Consent Final Judgment Against Trinity Constructors of Florida Inc. .)
Thursday, February 21, 2019
24 24 court Notice of Entry of Judgment Thu 02/21 2:05 PM
Notice of Entry Related [+] (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-] 23 Consent Final Judgment Against Trinity Constructors of Florida Inc. .
23 23 order Judgment Thu 02/21 2:03 PM
Consent Final Judgment Against Trinity Constructors of Florida Inc. . (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 16, 2019
22 22 notice Notice of Filing Wed 01/16 4:24 PM
Notice of Filing Motion to Compromise Controversy with Trinity Constructors of Florida, Inc , Filed by Plaintiff Marcia Dunn. (Dunn, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 26, 2018
21 21 misc Certificate of Service Thu 07/26 1:06 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Marcia Dunn Related [+]. (Dunn, Michael)
Related: [-] 19 Notice of Hearing Amended/Renoticed/Continued
Sunday, July 22, 2018
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Mailing-Hearing BK Mon 07/23 12:21 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Related [+] Notice Date 07/22/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 19 Re- Notice of Pretrial Conference scheduled for 11/05/2018 at 01:30 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128.
Friday, July 20, 2018
19 19 court Notice of Hearing [Amd/Rntc/Cntd] (AP) Fri 07/20 2:29 PM
Re- Notice of Pretrial Conference scheduled for 11/05/2018 at 01:30 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Sanabria, Noemi)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 12, 2018
18 18 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 07/13 12:17 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 07/12/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 16 Order Granting Agreed Ex Parte Motion to Continue Pretrial Conferenceand All Related Deadlines RE: (1 Complaint). Pretrial Conference set for 11/07/2018 at 01:30 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128.
Wednesday, July 11, 2018
17 17 misc Certificate of Service Wed 07/11 5:22 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Marcia Dunn Related [+]. (Dunn, Michael)
Related: [-] 16 Order on Motion to Continue Hearing
Tuesday, July 10, 2018
16 16 order Continue Hearing Order Tue 07/10 1:05 PM
Order Granting Agreed Ex Parte Motion to Continue Pretrial Conferenceand All Related Deadlines RE: (1 Complaint). Pretrial Conference set for 11/07/2018 at 01:30 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 09, 2018
15 15 motion Continue Hearing Mon 07/09 5:29 PM
Agreed Ex Parte Motion to Continue Hearing On: [(1 Complaint)] Filed by Plaintiff Marcia Dunn (Dunn, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit "A" - Proposed Order
Monday, June 25, 2018
14 14 misc Certificate of Service Mon 06/25 2:23 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Defendant Trinity Contructors of Florida, Inc. Related [+]. (Berlowitz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] 13 Initial Disclosure (Rule 26) filed by Defendant Trinity Contructors of Florida, Inc.
13 13 misc Initial Disclosure (Rule 26) Mon 06/25 2:19 PM
Initial Disclosure per FRCP 26 Required by the Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements Defendant's Expert Witness Disclosure Filed by Defendant Trinity Contructors of Florida, Inc.. (Berlowitz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 18, 2018
12 12 misc Initial Disclosure (Rule 26) Mon 06/18 5:17 PM
Initial Disclosure per FRCP 26 Required by the Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements Filed by Plaintiff Marcia Dunn. (Stull, Tyler)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Certificate of Service Mon 06/18 1:39 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Defendant Trinity Contructors of Florida, Inc. Related [+]. (Berlowitz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] 10 Initial Disclosure (Rule 26) filed by Defendant Trinity Contructors of Florida, Inc.
10 10 misc Initial Disclosure (Rule 26) Mon 06/18 1:34 PM
Initial Disclosure per FRCP 26 Required by the Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements Filed by Defendant Trinity Contructors of Florida, Inc.. (Berlowitz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 01, 2018
9 9 misc Certificate of Service Fri 06/01 3:48 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Defendant Trinity Contructors of Florida, Inc. Related [+]. (Berlowitz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] 8 Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant Trinity Contructors of Florida, Inc.
Thursday, May 31, 2018
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 05/31 4:17 PM
Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint Filed by Trinity Contructors of Florida, Inc.. (Berlowitz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 01, 2018
7 7 misc Certificate of Service Tue 05/01 10:07 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Marcia Dunn Related [+]. (Stull, Tyler)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Marcia Dunn,4 Summons Issued,5 Order Setting Requirements
6 6 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 05/01 10:04 AM
Summons Service Executed on Trinity Contructors of Florida, Inc. 5/1/2018 Filed by Plaintiff Marcia Dunn, Defendant Trinity Contructors of Florida, Inc.. (Stull, Tyler)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 27, 2018
5 5 5 pgs order Order Setting Requirements (Adv) Fri 04/27 3:26 PM
Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements for Pretrial and Trial . Initial Disclosure of Witnesses and Documents Shall Be Made at Least 20 Days Before Pretrial Date . (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-]
4 4 court Summons Issued Fri 04/27 3:26 PM
Summons Issued on Trinity Contructors of Florida, Inc. Answer Due 5/29/2018 [Trial Date Shall be Set at Pre-Trial Conference] Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 07/16/2018 at 01:30 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Marcia Dunn
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Service Fri 04/27 12:43 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service by Alexis S Read Filed by Plaintiff Marcia Dunn. Related [+]
Related: [-] ad, Alexis
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Service Fri 04/27 11:23 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service by Michael P Dunn Filed by Plaintiff Marcia Dunn. (Dunn, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 26, 2018
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 04/26 7:33 PM
Adversary case 18-01197 Complaint by Marcia Dunn against Trinity Contructors of Florida, Inc.. Filing Fee Paid. Nature of Suit:,(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) (Stull, Tyler)
Related: [-]