Loveridge tr v. Energy Drilling, LLC et al
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:16-bk-23671
Lead BK case is: 2:16-bk-23671
Utah Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | William T Thurman |
Case #: | 2:18-ap-02053 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer |
Case Filed: | Apr 27, 2018 |
Terminated: | Dec 05, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Energy Drilling, LLC
803 W. Birch St. Box 1346
Glenrock, WY 82637 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Janet Smith
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Elizabeth R. Loveridge tr
Strong and Hanni 102 South 200 East Suite 800
Salt Lake City, UT 84111 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Thursday, December 05, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
order
Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (Judge's Order) (order)
Thu 12/05 9:18 AM
Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (sjl) |
|
court
Dispose Adversary Case
Thu 12/05 9:19 AM
Adversary Case 18-02053 Disposed. (sjl) |
||
Wednesday, December 04, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
audio
Wed 12/04 10:30 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 12/4/2019 2:59:38 PM ]. File Size [ 572 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:01:12 ]. (Order to Show Cause). (admin) |
|
court
Minute Entry
Wed 12/04 3:04 PM
Minute Entry Re: Order to Show Cause15 Order. Appearances: None. Findings made on the record. Case dismissed. OTF-Court. (tjc) |
||
Tuesday, October 29, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
order
Continue/Set Hearing - AP (order)
Tue 10/29 1:12 PM
Order Setting Hearing for Order to Show Cause. Hearing scheduled for 12/4/2019 at 03:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court. (lmg) Modified on 10/30/2019 (mfr) |
|
Friday, October 18, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
order
Show Cause for Lack of Prosecution (order)
Fri 10/18 2:08 PM
Order to Show Cause for Lack of Prosecution. Response Due 11/7/2019. (mfr) |
|
Thursday, October 17, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
audio
Thu 10/17 10:30 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 10/17/2019 3:48:41 PM ]. File Size [ 472 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:00:59 ]. (Settlement Conference). (admin) |
|
court
Minute Entry
Fri 10/18 2:08 PM
Minute Entry Appearances: No appearances. Order to Show Cause to be entered by the Court. (mfr) |
||
Tuesday, April 30, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
order
Amend Order Governing Scheduling and Preliminary Matters (Order)
Tue 04/30 12:50 PM
Order Granting Motion to Amend Order Governing Scheduling and Preliminary Matters Final Pre-Trial Conference scheduled for 12/12/2019 at 03:30PM at Courtroom 2B, St. George. Hearing scheduled for 10/17/2019 at 03:30 PM at Courtroom 2B, St. George. (tdg) |
|
Thursday, April 25, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Pending Order
Thu 04/25 3:08 PM
Pending Order (Other) Re:10 Stipulation. (Lambert, Reid) |
|
Friday, March 15, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Stipulation
Fri 03/15 3:03 PM
Stipulation Re Filed by Elizabeth R. Loveridge tr. (Lambert, Reid) |
|
Friday, January 25, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Amend Order Governing Scheduling and Preliminary Matters (Motion)
Fri 01/25 1:20 PM
Motion to Amend Order Governing Scheduling and Preliminary Matters Filed by Elizabeth R. Loveridge tr. (Lambert, Reid) |
|
Thursday, December 20, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Certificate of Service
Thu 12/20 4:26 PM
Certificate of Service for Trustee's First Set of Discovery Requests to Energy Services, LLC and Janet Smith Filed by Elizabeth R. Loveridge tr. (Lambert, Reid) |
|
Wednesday, July 11, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
order
Governing Scheduling and Preliminary Matters (order)
Wed 07/11 11:15 AM
Order Governing Scheduling and Preliminary Matters. Pre-Trial Order due by 5/30/2019. Final Pre-Trial Conference scheduled for 6/13/2019 at 03:00PM at Courtroom 2B, St. George. Status hearing to be held on 2/14/2019 at 03:00 PM at Courtroom 2B, St. George. (sjl) |
|
Tuesday, July 10, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Report of Parties Planning Meeting (Form 35)
Tue 07/10 2:43 PM
Form 35/Report of Parties Planning Meeting Filed by Elizabeth R. Loveridge tr. (Lambert, Reid) |
|
Thursday, June 14, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
generic
BNC Certificate of Mailing Re: Order
Thu 06/14 10:39 PM
Certificate of Service Re: Order. . Notice Date 06/14/2018. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, June 12, 2018 | ||
order
Order/Notice of Initial Pretrial Conf. (order)
Tue 06/12 8:08 AM
Order and Notice of Initial Pre-Trial Conference. Pre-Trial Conference set for 7/19/2018 at 03:30 PM at Courtroom 2B, St. George. Report of Parties Planning Meeting due by 7/10/2018. (mfm) |
||
Monday, June 11, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
answer
Response
Mon 06/11 5:11 PM
Response to Filed by Energy Drilling, LLC, Janet Smith. (Pearce, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, May 09, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Wed 05/09 11:47 AM
Summons Service Executed. Party Served: Janet Smith. (Loveridge tr, Elizabeth) |
|
2 | 2
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Wed 05/09 11:46 AM
Summons Service Executed. Party Served: Energy Drilling, LLC. (Loveridge tr, Elizabeth) |
|
Tuesday, May 08, 2018 | ||
misc
Request for Reissuance of Summons (NO IMAGE)
Tue 05/08 11:17 AM
Request for Reissuance of Summons Filed by Elizabeth R. Loveridge tr. (Loveridge tr, Elizabeth) |
||
Friday, April 27, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/27 3:00 PM
Adversary case[LINK 18-02053 . Complaint by Elizabeth R. Loveridge tr against Energy Drilling, LLC, Janet Smith. Receipt Number DEFER, Fee Amount $350. Nature of Suit(s): [12 , 13]. (Loveridge tr, Elizabeth) |