Loveridge tr v. Markowitz
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:16-bk-23671
Lead BK case is: 2:16-bk-23671
Utah Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | William T Thurman |
Case #: | 2:18-ap-02054 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Apr 27, 2018 |
Terminated: | Dec 03, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Warren R. Markowitz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Elizabeth R. Loveridge tr
Strong and Hanni 102 South 200 East Suite 800
Salt Lake City, UT 84111 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Wednesday, December 04, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Dismissing Case
Wed 12/04 10:39 PM
BNC Certificate of Service - Order Dismissing Case. . Notice Date 12/04/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, December 03, 2019 | ||
court
Dispose Adversary Case
Tue 12/03 8:35 AM
Adversary Case 2:18-ap-2054 Disposed. (djf) |
||
Monday, December 02, 2019 | ||
order
Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (Administrative) (order)
Mon 12/02 9:25 AM
Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (jst) |
||
Wednesday, November 06, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
generic
Certificate of Service Re: Miscellaneous Pleadings
Wed 11/06 10:38 PM
Certificate of Service Re: Miscellaneous Pleadings. Notice Date 11/06/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, November 04, 2019 | ||
order
Show Cause for Lack of Prosecution (order)
Mon 11/04 9:53 AM
Order to Show Cause for Lack of Prosecution. Response Due 11/25/2019. (jst) |
||
Monday, April 29, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
answer
Response
Mon 04/29 4:16 PM
Response to Filed by Elizabeth R. Loveridge tr. (Lambert, Reid) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
generic
Certificate of Service Re: Miscellaneous Pleadings
Thu 04/11 10:47 PM
Certificate of Service Re: Miscellaneous Pleadings. Notice Date 04/11/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2019 | ||
order
Show Cause for Lack of Prosecution (order)
Tue 04/09 9:45 AM
Order to Show Cause for Lack of Prosecution. Response Due 4/29/2019. (bc) |
||
Wednesday, January 02, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
answer
Response
Wed 01/02 4:01 PM
Response to Filed by Elizabeth R. Loveridge tr. (Lambert, Reid) |
|
Wednesday, December 12, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
generic
Certificate of Service Re: Miscellaneous Pleadings
Wed 12/12 10:38 PM
Certificate of Service Re: Miscellaneous Pleadings. Notice Date 12/12/2018. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, December 10, 2018 | ||
order
Show Cause for Lack of Prosecution (order)
Mon 12/10 9:39 AM
Order to Show Cause for Lack of Prosecution. Response Due 1/2/2019. (bc) |
||
Tuesday, September 04, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
answer
Response
Tue 09/04 4:45 PM
Response to Filed by Elizabeth R. Loveridge tr. (Lambert, Reid) |
|
Wednesday, August 15, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
generic
Certificate of Service Re: Miscellaneous Pleadings
Wed 08/15 11:03 PM
Certificate of Service Re: Miscellaneous Pleadings. Notice Date 08/15/2018. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, August 13, 2018 | ||
order
Show Cause for Lack of Prosecution (order)
Mon 08/13 10:19 AM
Order to Show Cause for Lack of Prosecution. Response Due 9/4/2018. (bc) |
||
Wednesday, May 09, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Wed 05/09 11:47 AM
Summons Service Executed. Party Served: Warren R. Markowitz. (Loveridge tr, Elizabeth) |
|
Tuesday, May 08, 2018 | ||
misc
Request for Reissuance of Summons (NO IMAGE)
Tue 05/08 11:18 AM
Request for Reissuance of Summons Filed by Elizabeth R. Loveridge tr. (Loveridge tr, Elizabeth) |
||
Friday, April 27, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/27 3:07 PM
Adversary case[LINK 18-02054 . Complaint by Elizabeth R. Loveridge tr against Warrent R. Markowitz. Receipt Number Defer, Fee Amount $350. Nature of Suit(s): [12 ]. (Loveridge tr, Elizabeth) |