Original Case: 1:14-cv-00790

Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:18-cv-01239
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage
Case Filed:Apr 26, 2018
Terminated:Oct 02, 2019
Last checked: Saturday Oct 05, 2019 4:42 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellee
Mehmet Altunkilic
Represented By
Mehmet Altunkilic
-
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Continental Industries Group, Inc.
Represented By
Michael Conway
Shipman & Goodwin LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 10/05/2019 4:36 AM EDT
Thursday, April 26, 2018
1 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Continental Industries Group, Inc., FILED. [2290282] 18-1239 [Entered: 04/27/2018 02:43 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax
Att: 2 12 pgs Case FILED
2 2 12 pgs DISTRICT COURT ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, dated 03/27/2018, RECEIVED.[2290297] 18-1239 [Entered: 04/27/2018 02:53 PM]
Related: [-]
3 3 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2290305] 18-1239 [Entered: 04/27/2018 02:57 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed
Att: 2 10 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED
4 4 1 pgs INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2290313] 18-1239 [Entered: 04/27/2018 03:00 PM]
Related: [-]
5 5 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Continental Industries Group, Inc., district court receipt # 0208-14989610, FILED.[2290332] 18-1239 [Entered: 04/27/2018 03:09 PM]
Related: [-]