New York Southern District Court
Judge:Analisa Torres
Referred: James L Cott
Case #: 1:14-cv-00790
Nature of Suit380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage
Cause28:1332pd Diversity-Property Damage
Case Filed:Feb 07, 2014
Re-opened:Oct 25, 2019
Terminated:Mar 27, 2018
Last checked: Monday Dec 08, 2014 6:47 AM EST
Defendant
Mehmet Altunkilic
Represented By
Robert Howard Rickner
Eaton & Van Winkle, Lllp
contact info
Plaintiff
Continental Industries Group, Inc.
Represented By
Nicole Ann Sullivan
Leclairryan(nyc)
contact info
Michael Terrance Conway
Leclairryan, (nyc)
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Friday, July 14, 2023
99 99 misc Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 07/14 1:11 PM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Mehmet Altunkilic pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Mehmet Altunkilic. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Gunay Balatsas, Petek)
Related: [-]