Relativity Fashion, LLC
Member Case
Lead case is: 1:18-bk-11358
Lead case is: 1:18-bk-11358
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Michael E Wiles |
Case #: | 1:18-bk-11291 |
Case Filed: | May 03, 2018 |
Terminated: | Dec 12, 2019 |
Debtor
Relativity Fashion, LLC
9242 Beverly Blvd Ste 300
Beverly Hills, CA 90210-3728 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee U.S. Federal Office Building 201 Varick Street, Room 1006
New York, NY 10014 |
Docket last updated: 12 minutes ago |
Thursday, December 12, 2019 | ||
misc
Close Bankruptcy Case
Thu 12/12 3:12 PM
Case Closed. (Rouzeau, Anatin) |
||
Tuesday, December 10, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
5
pgs
order
Order (for Multi-Cases) - Court use only
Tue 12/10 12:48 PM
Order signed on 12/10/2019 granting motion of the Relativity Liquidating Trust for entry of final decree closing substantively consolidated chapter 11 cases. (DePierola, Jacqueline) |
|
Wednesday, May 30, 2018 | ||
misc
Terminate Pending Deadlines
Wed 05/30 8:40 AM
Pending Deadlines Terminated: Schedules A-H, Summary of Schedules, Statement of Financial Affairs, Local Rule 1007-2 Form. (McCaffrey, Dawn) |
||
Wednesday, May 16, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice, Appearance
Wed 05/16 1:37 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Documents filed by Eric J. Wise on behalf of Crystal Screens Media Inc., Macquarie US Trading LLC. (Wise, Eric) |
|
Friday, May 11, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
154
pgs
misc
Transcript
Thu 05/17 11:21 AM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 05/09/2018 at 2:08 pm RE: First Day Motions. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 8/9/2018. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: eScribers, LLC.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 5/18/2018. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 6/1/2018. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 6/11/2018. Transcript access will be restricted through 8/9/2018. (Lewis, Tenille) |
|
Thursday, May 10, 2018 | ||
misc
Add Claims and Noticing Agent
Thu 05/10 12:46 PM
Claims and Noticing Agent, Prime Clerk LLC Claims Agent, added to the case. (Richards, Beverly) |
||
Tuesday, May 08, 2018 | ||
misc
Case Association - Joint Administration
Tue 05/08 10:11 AM
Case Joint Administration. An order has been entered in this case under rule 1015(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure directing the procedural consolidation and joint administration of the chapter 11 cases of Relativity Holdings LLC and Relativity Media, LLC and their direct and indirect debtor subsidiaries. All further pleadings and other papers shall be filed in, and all further docket entries shall be made in the docket of Relativity Media, LLC, Case No. 18-11358 (MEW) and such docket should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. (Lopez, Mary) |
||
Monday, May 07, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
13
pgs
order
Order (for Multi-Cases) - Court use only
Mon 05/07 4:45 PM
Order signed on 5/7/2018 authorizing the joint administration of their chapter 11 cases under 18-11358 . (DePierola, Jacqueline) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Motion, Joint Administration
Mon 05/07 3:07 PM
Motion for Joint Administration filed by Carrie V Hardman on behalf of Relativity Fashion, LLC. (Hardman, Carrie) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Adams Declaration | ||
Friday, May 04, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice, Appearance
Fri 05/04 2:25 PM
Notice of Appearance /Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Papers filed by Frank A. Oswald on behalf of Litigation Trust to the Confirmed Chapter 11 Plan of Relativity Fashion, LLC et al.,. (Oswald, Frank) |
|
Thursday, May 03, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice, Appearance
Thu 05/03 12:50 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Serene K. Nakano on behalf of United States Trustee. (Nakano, Serene) |
|
1 | 1
10
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Thu 05/03 5:38 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual. Order for Relief Entered. Schedule A/B due 05/17/2018. Schedule C due 05/17/2018. Schedule D due 05/17/2018. Schedule E/F due 05/17/2018. Schedule G due 05/17/2018. Schedule H due 05/17/2018. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 05/17/2018. Statement of Financial Affairs due 05/17/2018. Local Rule 1007-2 Affidavit due by: 05/17/2018. Incomplete Filings due by 05/17/2018, Filed by Carey D. Schreiber of Winston & Strawn LLP on behalf of Relativity Fashion, LLC. (Schreiber, Carey) |
|
crditcrd
Auto - docket of credit card
Thu 05/03 5:48 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 18-11291 [misc,824] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 12558615. Fee amount 1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
misc
Add Judge
Thu 05/03 7:28 AM
Judge Michael E. Wiles added to the case. (Porter, Minnie) |