Relativity Media, LLC and Relativity Liquidating Trust
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Michael E Wiles |
Case #: | 1:18-bk-11358 |
Case Filed: | May 03, 2018 |
Terminated: | Feb 22, 2024 |
Plan Confirmed: | Jan 31, 2019 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1,000-5,000 |
Est. Assets | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Est. Liabilities | $500,000,001 to $1 billion |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Relativity Media, LLC
9242 Beverly Boulevard Suite 300
Beverly Hills, CA 90210 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: Sunday May 20, 2018 3:31 PM EDT |
Claims and Noticing Agent
Prime Clerk, LLC
830 Third Ave 9th Fl
New York, NY 10022 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Writers Guild of America, West, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Writers Guild Pension Plan and Industry Health Fund
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
WWE Studios, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Directors Guild of America, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Directors Guild of America, Inc.-Producer Pension and Health Plans
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
UltraV Holdings LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Kenneth Halsband
333 S Hope Street 35th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90071 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Technicolor, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Screen Actors Guild-Producers Pension & Health Plans
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Motion Picture Industry Pension and Health Plans
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Netflix, Inc.
Klee, Tuchin, Bogdanoff & Stern LLP 1999 Avenue of the Stars 39th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90067 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Screen Actors Guild - American Federation of Television and Radio Artists
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Pure Flix Entertainment LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Prepetition Midcap Secured Lenders
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Ollawood Productions, LLC
|
|
Interested Party
Macquarie US Trading LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Ryan Kavanaugh
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Crystal Screens Media Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Other Prof.
Relativity Litigation Trust under Confirmed Chapter 11 Plan for Relativity Fashion, LLC et al.,
|
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee U.S. Federal Office Building 201 Varick Street, Room 1006
New York, NY 10014 |
Represented By
|
Unknown
RKA Film Financing, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Unknown
Twentieth Century Fox Home Entertainment LLC
|
Represented By
|
Unknown
Adam Fields
|
Represented By
|
![]() Bench Decision signed on 7/6/2018 regarding application for permission to retain Winston & Strawn LLP and objections thereto (related document(s)228). (DePierola, Jacqueline) |
Docket last updated: 56 minutes ago |