Seidel v. Bio-Rad Laboratories, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:17-bk-32255
Lead BK case is: 3:17-bk-32255
Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Barbara J Houser |
Case #: | 3:18-ap-03067 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | May 03, 2018 |
Terminated: | Aug 03, 2018 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Bio-Rad Laboratories, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Scott M. Seidel, Trustee
Seidel Law Firm 6505 W. Park Blvd. Suite 306
Plano, TX 75093 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 1:10 PM CDT |
Wednesday, March 30, 2022 | ||
court
Receipt of filing fee for complaint
Wed 03/30 8:55 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee - $350.00 by SW. Receipt Number 339228. (admin) |
||
Friday, August 03, 2018 | ||
court
Close adversary case
Fri 08/03 1:34 PM
Adversary case 3:18-ap-3067 closed (Luna, G) |
||
Wednesday, August 01, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of dismissal or stipulated dismissal in an adversary proceeding
Wed 08/01 1:08 PM
Notice of stipulated dismissal in an adversary proceeding filed by Plaintiff Scott M. Seidel. (Kaisani, Fareed) |
|
Monday, May 07, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
cmp
Summons service executed
Mon 05/07 10:16 AM
Summons service executed on Bio-Rad Laboratories, Inc. 5/7/2018 (Kaisani, Fareed) |
|
Friday, May 04, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
order
Standing scheduling order in an adversary proceeding
Fri 05/04 10:15 AM
Scheduling order setting deadlines. Discovery and all exhibits except impeachment documents: 45 days prior to Docket Call, pre-trial order: 7 calendar days prior to Docket Call, proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law: 7 days prior to first scheduled docket call . Trial Docket Call date set for 9/4/2018 at 01:15 PM at Dallas Judge Houser Ctrm. Entered on 5/4/2018 (Harden, D.) |
|
3 | 3
court
Summons issued
Fri 05/04 10:13 AM
Summons issued on Bio-Rad Laboratories, Inc. Answer Due 6/4/2018 (Harden, D.) |
|
Thursday, May 03, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice (generic)
Thu 05/03 11:38 AM
Notice to Defer Filing Fee filed by Plaintiff Scott Seidel. (Kaisani, Fareed) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 05/03 11:35 AM
Adversary case 18-03067 Complaint by Scott Seidel against Bio-Rad Laboratories, Inc.. Fee Amount $350. Nature(s) of suit: 12 . (Kaisani, Fareed) |