3 Days to Kill Productions, LLC
Member Case
Lead case is: 1:18-bk-11358
Lead case is: 1:18-bk-11358
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Michael E Wiles |
Case #: | 1:18-bk-11303 |
Case Filed: | May 03, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jul 03, 2018 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $0 to $50,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $500,000,001 to $1 billion |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
3 Days to Kill Productions, LLC
9242 Beverly Blvd Ste 300
Beverly Hills, CA 90210-3728 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee U.S. Federal Office Building 201 Varick Street, Room 1006
New York, NY 10014 |
Docket last updated: 9 minutes ago |
Thursday, July 05, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Certificate of Mailing . Notice Date 07/05/2018. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, July 03, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Notice RE: Order signed on 7/3/2018 dismissing and closing the duplicate case and refunding the associated filing fees. (DePierola, Jacqueline) |
|
4 | 4
![]() Order signed on 7/3/2018 dismissing and closing the duplicate case and refunding the associated filing fees . (DePierola, Jacqueline) |
|
misc
Close Bankruptcy Case
Tue 07/03 9:58 AM
Case Closed. (Rodriguez, Maria) |
||
Friday, June 15, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Affidavit of Service of Kadeem Champagnie Regarding Notice of Presentment of (A) Motion to Dismiss and Close Duplicate Case and Refund the Associated Filing Fees and (B) Order Dismissing and Closing the Duplicate Case and Refunding the Associated Filing Fees Filed by Adam M. Adler on behalf of Prime Clerk LLC Claims Agent. (Adler, Adam) |
|
Tuesday, June 12, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Motion to Authorize / NOTICE OF PRESENTMENT OF (A) MOTION TO DISMISS AND CLOSE DUPLICATE CASE AND REFUND THE ASSOCIATED FILING FEES AND (B) ORDER DISMISSING AND CLOSING THE DUPLICATE CASE AND REFUNDING THE ASSOCIATED FILING FEES filed by Carrie V Hardman on behalf of 3 Days to Kill Productions, LLC. (Hardman, Carrie) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, May 04, 2018 | ||
misc
Add Judge
Fri 05/04 8:11 AM
Judge Michael E. Wiles added to the case. (Porter, Minnie) |
||
Thursday, May 03, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
![]() Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual. Order for Relief Entered. Schedule A/B due 05/17/2018. Schedule C due 05/17/2018. Schedule D due 05/17/2018. Schedule E/F due 05/17/2018. Schedule G due 05/17/2018. Schedule H due 05/17/2018. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 05/17/2018. Statement of Financial Affairs due 05/17/2018. Local Rule 1007-2 Affidavit due by: 05/17/2018. Incomplete Filings due by 05/17/2018, Filed by Carey D. Schreiber of Winston & Strawn LLP on behalf of 3 Days to Kill Productions, LLC. (Schreiber, Carey) |
|
crditcrd
Auto - docket of credit card
Thu 05/03 10:49 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 18-11303 [misc,824] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 12560518. Fee amount 1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |