California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Neil W Bason
Case #: 2:18-bk-15829
Case Filed:May 21, 2018
Creditor Meeting:Apr 03, 2019
Claims Deadline:Apr 12, 2019
Discharge Objection Deadline:Mar 18, 2019

Debtor
Philip James Layfield
Los Angeles MDC Serial No. 71408-050 535 N. Alameda St.
Los Angeles, CA 90012
Represented By
Philip James Layfield
contact info
Last checked: Friday Aug 03, 2018 11:24 AM PDT
Financial Advisor
CBIZ Valuation Group, LLC
4722 N. 24th St., Ste. 300
Phoenix, AZ 85016
Represented By
Jeffrey L Sumpter
Cbiz Valuation Group LLC
contact info
Interested Party
Courtesy NEF
Represented By
Beth Gaschen
Weiland Golden Goodrich LLP
contact info
Petitioning Creditor
Alliance Legal Solutions LLC
501 S. Sharon Amity Rd.
Charlotte, NC 28211
Represented By
Megan Hanley Baer
contact info
Petitioning Creditor
Richard M Pachulski
10100 Santa Monica Blvd. #1300
Los Angeles, CA 90067
Represented By
Malhar S Pagay
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info
Petitioning Creditor
Wellgen Standard LLC
50 Ridgewood Rd.
Chagrin Falls, OH 44022
Represented By
Faye C Rasch
contact info
Beth Gaschen
Weiland Golden Goodrich LLP
contact info
Roger G Jones
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP
contact info
Roger G. Jones
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP
contact info
Jeffrey I Golden
contact info
Petitioning Creditor
Joseph M. Barrett
2049 CENTURY PARK EAST 2049 Century Park East STE 2460 STE 2460
Los Angeles, CA 90067
Represented By
Damion Robinson
Affeld Grivakes LLP
contact info
Petitioning Creditor
Daniel Tontini
Parker Mills LLP 800 West 6th Street Suite 500
Los Angeles, CA 90017
Represented By
Joel A Osman
Parker Mills
contact info
Trustee
Wesley H Avery (TR)
758 E. Colorado Blvd., Suite 210
Pasadena, CA 91101
Represented By
Faye C Rasch
contact info
Beth Gaschen
Weiland Golden Goodrich LLP
contact info
Ryan W Beall
contact info
Jeffrey I Golden
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 04/25/2020 8:28 AM PDT
Monday, May 21, 2018
court X - Receipt Number and Filing Fee (Generic) (Auto - CR/ECF)(Retired) Mon 05/21 9:30 PM
Receipt of Chapter 7 Filing Fee - $335.00 by 03. Receipt Number 20227445. (admin)
Related: [-]
1 1 6 pgs misc Involuntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Official Form 105 or 205) Mon 05/21 4:10 PM
Chapter 7 Involuntary Petition Against an Individual. Fee Amount $335 Re: Philip James Layfield Filed by Petitioning Creditor(s): Wellgen Standard LLC (attorney Jeffrey I Golden), Richard M Pachulski (attorney Malhar S Pagay), Alliance Legal Solutions LLC (attorney Megan Hanley Baer) . (Fierro, Viridiana)
Related: [-]