Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-15829

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Neil W Bason
Case #: 2:19-ap-01070
Nature of Suit67 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny
68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury
62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Mar 18, 2019
Terminated:Aug 27, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Philip J Layfield
8 The Green Suite 6426
Dover, DE 19901
Represented By
Philip J Layfield
contact info
Plaintiff
Fred A. Hickey
Coleman Frost 201 Nevada Street El Segundo
El Segundo, CA 90245
Represented By
Derrick F Coleman
Coleman Frost LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Thursday, August 27, 2020
29 29 court Close Adversary Case Thu 08/27 3:29 PM
Adversary Case 2:19-ap-1070 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. (Sumlin, Sharon E.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 12, 2020
28 28 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Wed 08/12 9:52 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 08/12/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 27 Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (BNC-PDF)
Monday, August 10, 2020
27 27 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (BNC-PDF) Mon 08/10 12:23 PM
ORDER approving stipulation for dismissal of complaint with prejudice and dismissing complaint with prejudice. (BNC-PDF) Signed on 8/10/2020 Related [+]. (Sumlin, Sharon E.)
Related: [-] 6 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Philip J Layfield
Thursday, August 06, 2020
26 26 court Hearing Held (Other) Thu 08/06 4:41 PM
Hearing Held on 08/04/20 at 11:00 a.m.: Off Calendar Related [+] (Ghaltchi (Johnson), Dina)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Fred A. Hickey
Friday, May 08, 2020
25 25 order BAP/USDC dismissal of appeal Fri 05/08 1:31 PM
USDC Dismissal of Appeal - Appellants Notice of Settlementand Voluntary Dismissal RE: Appeal USDC Number: 2:19-cv-09371-DSF (Originally filed at District Court 04/01/2020). Related [+]. (Milano, Sonny)
Related: [-] 14 Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election (Official Form 417A) filed by Defendant Philip J Layfield
Wednesday, April 29, 2020
24 24 motion Stipulation (motion) Wed 04/29 3:11 PM
Stipulation By Fred A. Hickey and Philip Layfield for Dismissal of Complaint with Prejudice Filed by Plaintiff Fred A. Hickey (Coleman, Derrick)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 02, 2020
court Hearing Continued (Other) Thu 04/02 11:14 AM
Hearing (Adv Other) Continued Related [+] Status Hearing to be held on 08/04/2020 at 11:00 AM 255 E. Temple St. Courtroom 1545 Los Angeles, CA 90012 for1 , (Ghaltchi (Johnson), Dina)
Related: [-] 1 COMPLAINT filed by Fred A. Hickey
Tuesday, November 19, 2019
23 23 court Deficiency notice send to BAP/USDC Tue 11/19 9:40 AM
Deficiency Notice Sent to USDC RE: 2:19-cv-09371-DSF - Statement of Issues; Notice of Transcript; and First Appeal Installment Payment in the amount of $74.50, due on November 1, 2019, has not been paid. Related [+] (Milano, Sonny)
Related: [-] 14 Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election (Official Form 417A) filed by Defendant Philip J Layfield
Monday, November 04, 2019
22 22 court Ntc RE: Appeal from BK (USDC) Mon 11/04 1:31 PM
Notice RE: Appeal from Bankruptcy Court (USDC) RE: 2:19-cv-09371-DSF (Originally filed at District Court 11/04/2019). Related [+] (Milano, Sonny)
Related: [-] 14 Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election (Official Form 417A) filed by Defendant Philip J Layfield
Wednesday, October 30, 2019
21 21 court Deficiency letter to Appellant Wed 10/30 8:48 AM
Deficiency Notice to Appellant - Notice of Appeal does not include entered stamped copy of order, judgment, or decree Related [+] (Milano, Sonny)
Related: [-] 14 Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election (Official Form 417A) filed by Defendant Philip J Layfield
20 20 court Notice of referral of appeal to USDC with CMLG Wed 10/30 8:35 AM
Notice of Referral of Appeal to the United States District Court, Central District of California; with Notice of Appeal Service List. Related [+] (Milano, Sonny) Additional attachment(s) added on 10/30/2019 (Milano, Sonny)
Related: [-] 14 Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election (Official Form 417A) filed by Defendant Philip J Layfield
Att: 1 ORDER (1) DENYING DEBTORS
Thursday, October 24, 2019
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Thu 10/24 9:32 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 10/24/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 17 Order on Generic Application (BNC-PDF)
18 18 court Hearing Held (Other) Thu 10/24 3:30 PM
Hearing Held re cont'd status conf. Matter cont'd to 11/12/19 at 2:00 pm Related [+] (Toliver, Wanda)
Related: [-] . #1
Tuesday, October 22, 2019
17 17 order X - Application (Generic) (RE: Application) (BNC-PDF) Tue 10/22 8:51 AM
Order (1) Denying Debtor's Application For Waiver Of The Appellate Filing Fee In A Chapter 7 Case; And (2) Setting Installment Payment Deadlines - $74.50 On Or Before November 1, 2019; $74.50 On Or Before November 15, 2019; $74.50 On Or Before November 29, 2019; $74.50 On Or Before December 13, 2019. (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 10/22/2019 (Milano, Sonny)
Related: [-] 16
Thursday, October 17, 2019
16 16 motion X - Application (Generic) (motion) Thu 10/17 3:04 PM
Application for Waiver of the Appellate Filing Fee in a Chapter 7 Case; filed by Defendant Philip J Layfield (Milano, Sonny)
Related: [-]
15 15 appeal Appellant Designation Thu 10/17 3:03 PM
Appellant Designation of Contents For Inclusion in Record On Appeal; filed by Defendant Philip J Layfield Related [+]. Appellee designation due by 10/31/2019. (Milano, Sonny)
Related: [-] 14 Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election (Official Form 417A)
14 14 appeal Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election (Official Form 417A) Thu 10/17 3:02 PM
Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election to U.S. District Court - (Official Form 417A) - Fee Amount: $298.00 (Fee Not Paid); filed by Defendant Philip J Layfield Related [+]. (Milano, Sonny)
Related: [-] 12 Order on Motion For Summary Judgment (BNC-PDF)
Wednesday, October 16, 2019
court Hearing Continued (Other) Wed 10/16 6:14 PM
Hearing (Adv Other) Continued Related [+] Status Hearing to be held on 03/31/2020 at 11:00 AM 255 E. Temple St. Courtroom 1545 Los Angeles, CA 90012 for1 , (Sumlin, Sharon E.)
Related: [-] 1 COMPLAINT filed by Fred A. Hickey
Friday, October 11, 2019
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Mon 10/14 2:00 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 10/11/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 Order on Motion For Summary Judgment (BNC-PDF)
Wednesday, October 09, 2019
12 12 order SUMMARY JUDGMENT (BNC-PDF) Wed 10/09 1:02 PM
Order Denying defendant Philip Layfield's Motion For Judgment on the pleadings (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 10/9/2019 (Sumlin, Sharon E.)
Related: [-] 6
Tuesday, October 08, 2019
11 11 misc Notice of Lodgment Tue 10/08 3:21 PM
Notice of lodgment Filed by Plaintiff Fred A. Hickey Related [+]. (Coleman, Derrick)
Related: [-] 6 Motion For Judgment on the pleadings and Notice of motion Filed by Defendant Philip J Layfield (Sumlin, Sharon E.) filed by Defendant Philip J Layfield
Tuesday, September 24, 2019
10 10 misc Proof of service Wed 09/25 2:44 PM
Proof of service (Amended) Filed by Defendant Philip J Layfield Related [+]. (Toliver, Wanda)
Related: [-] 6 Motion For Summary Judgment
9 9 answer Reply Wed 09/25 2:40 PM
Reply to Motion for Judgment on the pleadings Related [+] Filed by Defendant Philip J Layfield (Toliver, Wanda)
Related: [-] 6 Motion For Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Philip J Layfield
Tuesday, September 17, 2019
8 8 answer Opposition Tue 09/17 5:08 PM
Opposition to Related [+] Filed by Plaintiff Fred A. Hickey (Coleman, Derrick)
Related: [-] 6 Motion For Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Philip J Layfield
Thursday, August 29, 2019
7 7 court Hearing Set (Motion) Thu 08/29 11:46 AM
Hearing Set Related [+] The Hearing date is set for 10/1/2019 at 02:00 PM at Crtrm 1545, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Neil W. Bason (Sumlin, Sharon E.)
Related: [-] 6 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Philip J Layfield
Thursday, August 22, 2019
6 6 motion Summary Judgment (motion) Thu 08/29 11:44 AM
Motion For Judgment on the pleadings and Notice of motion Filed by Defendant Philip J Layfield (Sumlin, Sharon E.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2019
court Hearing Continued (Other) Wed 05/22 12:37 PM
Hearing (Adv Other) Continued Related [+] Status Hearing to be held on 11/05/2019 at 11:00 AM 255 E. Temple St. Courtroom 1545 Los Angeles, CA 90012 for1 , (Ghaltchi (Johnson), Dina)
Related: [-] 1 COMPLAINT filed by Fred A. Hickey
Tuesday, May 07, 2019
5 5 5 pgs misc Status report Tue 05/07 2:12 PM
Status report Filed Jointly Per LBR 7016-1(a)(2) Filed by Plaintiff Fred A. Hickey Related [+]. (Coleman, Derrick)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Wednesday, March 27, 2019
4 4 6 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Thu 03/28 4:24 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Philip J Layfield . (Ghaltchi (Johnson), Dina)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2019
3 3 court Summons Issued Mon 03/18 2:50 PM
Summons Issued on Philip J Layfield Date Issued 3/18/2019, Answer Due 4/17/2019 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 5/21/2019 at 11:00 AM at Crtrm 1545, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Neil W. Bason (Sumlin, Sharon E.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Fred A. Hickey
2 2 misc Supplemental Mon 03/18 1:31 PM
Supplemental Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet Filed by Plaintiff Fred A. Hickey. (Coleman, Derrick)
Related: [-]
1 1 29 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 03/18 1:25 PM
Adversary case 2:19-ap-01070. Complaint by Fred A. Hickey against Philip J Layfield. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)),(67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)),(68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)) (Coleman, Derrick)
Related: [-]