Elements Behavioral Health, Inc.
Member Case
Lead case is: 1:18-bk-11212
Lead case is: 1:18-bk-11212
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Brendan Linehan Shannon |
Case #: | 1:18-bk-11214 |
Case Filed: | May 23, 2018 |
Terminated: | Sep 25, 2019 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1,000-5,000 |
Est. Assets | $50,000,001 to $100 million |
Est. Liabilities | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Nature of Business | Health Care Business |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Elements Behavioral Health, Inc.
5000 Airport Plaza Dr Ste 100
Long Beach, CA 90815-1273 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Friday, March 27, 2020 | ||
23 | 23
notice
Address Change - Notice
Tue 03/31 8:49 AM
Notice of Address Change . Filed by Facebook, Inc.. (SJS) |
|
Wednesday, September 25, 2019 | ||
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Wed 09/25 1:52 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (SJS) |
||
Monday, September 23, 2019 | ||
22 | 22
order
Final Decree
Mon 09/23 5:36 PM
Final Decree Closing Certain Chapter 11 Cases and Granting Related Relief. Signed on 9/23/2019 (NAB) |
|
Thursday, January 31, 2019 | ||
21 | 21
claims
Withdrawal of Claim-Chapter 11
Thu 01/31 5:27 PM
Withdrawal of Claim . Filed by TN Dept of Revenue. (McCloud, Laura) |
|
Wednesday, December 26, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
claims
Claims Register
Wed 12/26 11:42 AM
Claims Register Alpha and Numeric . Filed by Donlin, Recano & Co., Inc.. (Jordan, Lillian) |
|
Att: 1 Numeric Claims Register | ||
Monday, December 17, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
claims
Withdrawal of Claim-Chapter 11
Mon 12/17 1:13 PM
Withdrawal of Claim #75 for Los Angeles County Treasurer and Tax Collector . Filed by Donlin, Recano & Co., Inc.. (Jordan, Lillian) |
|
Friday, December 07, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
claims
Withdrawal of Claim-Chapter 11
Fri 12/07 2:03 PM
Withdrawal of Claim #339 for Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts . Filed by Donlin, Recano & Co., Inc.. (Jordan, Lillian) |
|
17 | 17
claims
Withdrawal of Claim-Chapter 11
Fri 12/07 2:02 PM
Withdrawal of Claim #338 for Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts . Filed by Donlin, Recano & Co., Inc.. (Jordan, Lillian) |
|
16 | 16
claims
Withdrawal of Claim-Chapter 11
Fri 12/07 2:01 PM
Withdrawal of Claim #337 for Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts . Filed by Donlin, Recano & Co., Inc.. (Jordan, Lillian) |
|
15 | 15
claims
Withdrawal of Claim-Chapter 11
Fri 12/07 2:00 PM
Withdrawal of Claim #336 for Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts . Filed by Donlin, Recano & Co., Inc.. (Jordan, Lillian) |
|
14 | 14
claims
Withdrawal of Claim-Chapter 11
Fri 12/07 1:59 PM
Withdrawal of Claim #335 for Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts . Filed by Donlin, Recano & Co., Inc.. (Jordan, Lillian) |
|
13 | 13
claims
Withdrawal of Claim-Chapter 11
Fri 12/07 1:58 PM
Withdrawal of Claim #334 for Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts . Filed by Donlin, Recano & Co., Inc.. (Jordan, Lillian) |
|
12 | 12
claims
Withdrawal of Claim-Chapter 11
Fri 12/07 1:55 PM
Withdrawal of Claim #333 for Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts . Filed by Donlin, Recano & Co., Inc.. (Jordan, Lillian) |
|
11 | 11
claims
Withdrawal of Claim-Chapter 11
Fri 12/07 1:54 PM
Withdrawal of Claim #332 for Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts . Filed by Donlin, Recano & Co., Inc.. (Jordan, Lillian) |
|
10 | 10
claims
Withdrawal of Claim-Chapter 11
Fri 12/07 1:48 PM
Withdrawal of Claim #331 for Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts . Filed by Donlin, Recano & Co., Inc.. (Jordan, Lillian) |
|
Monday, August 13, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Amended Schedules/Statements - Jointly Administered Entity
Mon 08/13 3:18 PM
Amended Schedules/Statements - Jointly Administered Entity filed: Sch A-B, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. Filed by Elements Behavioral Health, Inc.. (Katona, Shanti) |
|
Monday, June 25, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Schedules/Statements
Mon 06/25 1:49 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs, Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Filed by Elements Behavioral Health, Inc.. (Ward, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Statement of Financial Affairs | ||
Tuesday, June 19, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Application to Appear Re: 9010-1(e)(ii)
Tue 06/19 1:25 PM
Application To Appear Pursuant to Local Rule 9010-1(e)(ii) Filed by Mark Courson. (Hernandez, Donna) |
|
Friday, June 15, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Appearance - Notice
Fri 06/15 5:16 PM
Notice of Appearance. The party has consented to electronic service. Filed by Mark Courson. (Hernandez, Donna) |
|
Thursday, May 24, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order-Joint Admin
Thu 05/24 3:16 PM
Order Granting Motion for Joint Administration. An order has been entered in this case directing the procedural consolidation and joint administration of the chapter 11 cases of EBH Topco, LLC and its affiliates that have concurrently commenced chapter 11 cases. The docket in the chapter 11 case of EBH Topco, LLC, Case No. 18-11212 (BLS), should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. Order Signed on 5/24/2018 (LMD) |
|
Wednesday, May 23, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Corporate Ownership Statement
Wed 05/23 5:57 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement pursuant to F.R.B.P. 7007.1(a) Filed by Elements Behavioral Health, Inc.. (Ward, Christopher) |
|
3 | 3
crditcrd
none
Wed 05/23 3:58 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 18-11214 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt Number 90429, amount $1717.00. (COH) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Joint Administration - Motion (Multi)
Wed 05/23 2:06 PM
Motion for Joint Administration Filed by EBH Topco, LLC. (Ward, Christopher) |
|
1 | 1
23
pgs
misc
RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Wed 05/23 12:22 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1717. Filed by Elements Behavioral Health, Inc.. Appointment of health care ombudsman due by 06/22/2018 (Ward, Christopher) |
|
court
Case Assigned
Wed 05/23 3:13 PM
Judge Brendan Linehan Shannon added to case. (AK) |