Outpatient Services TN, Inc.
Member Case
Lead case is: 1:18-bk-11212
Lead case is: 1:18-bk-11212
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Brendan Linehan Shannon |
Case #: | 1:18-bk-11248 |
Case Filed: | May 23, 2018 |
Terminated: | Sep 25, 2019 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $0 to $50,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Nature of Business | Health Care Business |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 23 minutes ago |
Wednesday, September 25, 2019 | ||
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Wed 09/25 2:07 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (SJS) |
||
Monday, September 23, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
order
Final Decree
Mon 09/23 5:36 PM
Final Decree Closing Certain Chapter 11 Cases and Granting Related Relief. Signed on 9/23/2019 (NAB) |
|
Wednesday, December 26, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
claims
Claims Register
Wed 12/26 12:17 PM
Claims Register Alpha and Numeric . Filed by Donlin, Recano & Co., Inc.. (Jordan, Lillian) |
|
Att: 1 Numeric Claims Register | ||
Monday, June 25, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Schedules/Statements
Mon 06/25 3:30 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs, Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Filed by Outpatient Services TN, Inc.. (Ward, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Statement of Financial Affairs | ||
Friday, May 25, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
crditcrd
none
Fri 05/25 10:28 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 18-11248 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt Number 90433, amount $1717.00. (COH) |
|
Thursday, May 24, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order-Joint Admin
Thu 05/24 3:16 PM
Order Granting Motion for Joint Administration. An order has been entered in this case directing the procedural consolidation and joint administration of the chapter 11 cases of EBH Topco, LLC and its affiliates that have concurrently commenced chapter 11 cases. The docket in the chapter 11 case of EBH Topco, LLC, Case No. 18-11212 (BLS), should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. Order Signed on 5/24/2018 (LMD) |
|
Wednesday, May 23, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Corporate Ownership Statement
Wed 05/23 6:42 PM
Amended Corporate Ownership Statement pursuant to F.R.B.P. 7007.1(a) Filed by Outpatient Services TN, Inc.. (Ward, Christopher) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Joint Administration - Motion (Multi)
Wed 05/23 2:06 PM
Motion for Joint Administration Filed by EBH Topco, LLC. (Ward, Christopher) |
|
1 | 1
23
pgs
misc
RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Wed 05/23 1:39 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1717. Filed by Outpatient Services TN, Inc.. Appointment of health care ombudsman due by 06/22/2018 (Ward, Christopher) |
|
court
Case Assigned
Wed 05/23 3:13 PM
Judge Brendan Linehan Shannon added to case. (AK) |