Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11358

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Michael E Wiles
Case #: 1:18-ap-01552
Nature of Suit91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
Case Filed:Jun 01, 2018
Terminated:Aug 17, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
Relativity Media, LLC
9242 Beverly Boulevard Suite 300
Beverly Hills, CA 90210
Represented By
Relativity Media, LLC
contact info
Defendant
RML Distribution Domestic, LLC
9242 Beverly Hills Boulevard Suite 300
Beverly Hills, CA 90210
Represented By
RML Distribution Domestic, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Netflix, Inc.
Represented By
David M. Guess
Klee, Tuchin, Bogdanoff & Stern LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:09 PM EDT
Friday, August 17, 2018
misc Close Adversary Proceeding Fri 08/17 1:19 PM
Adversary Case 1:18-ap-1552 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (DePierola, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 14, 2018
43 43 order So Ordered Stipulation Tue 08/14 2:16 PM
So Ordered Stipulation signed on 8/14/2018 Among Debtors, Ultrav Holdings LLC and Netflix, Inc. Related [+] Settling and Dismissing the Adversary Proceeding. (Gomez, Jessica)
Related: [-] 39
Monday, August 13, 2018
44 44 132 pgs misc Transcript Tue 08/14 2:43 PM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 08/09/2018 at 2:13 pm RE: Trial;. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 11/13/2018. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: eScribers, LLC.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 8/20/2018. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 9/4/2018. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 9/13/2018. Transcript access will be restricted through 11/13/2018. (Lewis, Tenille)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 10, 2018
41 41 order Motion, Shorten Time Fri 08/10 2:39 PM
Order signed on 8/10/2018 Shortening Time with Respect to Approval of Stipulation and Order Among Debtors, UltraV Holdings LLC and Netflix, Inc Related [+]. (Lopez, Mary)
Related: [-] 40
40 40 motion Motion, Shorten Time Fri 08/10 1:33 PM
Motion to Shorten Time With Respect to Approval of Stipulation and Order Among Debtors, UltraV Holdings LLC and Netflix, Inc. Related [+] filed by John Longmire on behalf of RML Distribution Domestic, LLC, Relativity Media, LLC. (Longmire, John)
Related: [-] 39
39 39 notice Notice, Proposed Order/Presentment Fri 08/10 1:30 PM
Notice of Proposed Order / Notice of Proposed Stipulation and Order Among Debtors, UltraV Holdings LLC and Netflix, Inc. filed by John Longmire on behalf of RML Distribution Domestic, LLC, Relativity Media, LLC. with hearing to be held on 8/14/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 617 (MEW) Objections due by 8/14/2018,(Longmire, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Stipulation
Thursday, August 02, 2018
38 38 17 pgs misc Transcript Wed 08/08 10:26 AM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 08/02/2018 at 10:36 am RE: TRIAL. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 10/31/2018. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: eScribers, LLC.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 8/9/2018. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 8/23/2018. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 9/4/2018. Transcript access will be restricted through 10/31/2018. (Lewis, Tenille)
Related: [-]
37 37 97 pgs misc Transcript Thu 08/02 3:40 PM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 08/01/18 at 10:08 AM RE: Trial. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 10/31/2018. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: eScribers.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 8/9/2018. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 8/23/2018. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 9/4/2018. Transcript access will be restricted through 10/31/2018. (Cales, Humberto)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 01, 2018
42 42 misc Under Seal Document Fri 08/10 2:59 PM
Document Under Seal Per Court Order . Netflix, Inc.'s Pre-Trial Brief Filed by Robert J. Pfister. Related [+] (Lopez, Mary)
Related: [-] 35
Tuesday, July 31, 2018
36 36 order Pre-Trial Order Tue 07/31 12:47 PM
Joint Pre-Trial Order signed on 7/31/2018. (DePierola, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
35 35 order Motion, Seal Tue 07/31 10:36 AM
Order signed on 7/31/2018 granting Netflix, Inc.'s ex parte motion to file partially redacted pre-trial brief Related [+]. (DePierola, Jacqueline)
Related: [-] 34
Monday, July 30, 2018
34 34 motion Motion, Seal Mon 07/30 5:35 PM
Motion to Seal / Netflix, Inc.'s Ex Parte Motion to File Partially Redacted Pre-Trial Brief Related [+] filed by Robert J. Pfister on behalf of Netflix, Inc.. (Pfister, Robert)
Related: [-] 32 ,31
Att: 1 43 pgs Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
33 33 order Motion, File Under Seal Mon 07/30 4:54 PM
Order signed on 7/30/2018 authorizing the Debtors to file partially redacted pretrial brief Related [+]. (DePierola, Jacqueline)
Related: [-] 30
32 32 30+ pgs answer Memorandum of Law Mon 07/30 4:49 PM
Memorandum of Law / Netflix, Inc.'s Pre-Trial Brief filed by Robert J. Pfister on behalf of Netflix, Inc.. (Pfister, Robert)
Related: [-]
31 31 30+ pgs answer Memorandum of Law Mon 07/30 4:46 PM
Memorandum of Law / Netflix, Inc.'s Pre-Trial Brief filed by Robert J. Pfister on behalf of Netflix, Inc.. (Pfister, Robert)
Related: [-]
30 30 motion Motion, File Under Seal Mon 07/30 3:17 PM
Ex Parte Motion to File Under Seal Partially Redacted Pretrial Brief Related [+] filed by Antonio Yanez Jr. on behalf of RML Distribution Domestic, LLC, Relativity Media, LLC. (Yanez, Antonio)
Related: [-] 29
29 29 30+ pgs ans Memorandum of Law Mon 07/30 3:15 PM
Memorandum of Law / Relativity Media, LLC and RML Distribution Domestic, LLC's Pretrial Brief filed by Antonio Yanez Jr. on behalf of RML Distribution Domestic, LLC, Relativity Media, LLC. (Yanez, Antonio)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 26, 2018
28 28 order So Ordered Stipulation Thu 07/26 4:56 PM
Confidentiality Stipulation and Protective Order signed on 7/26/2018 Related [+]. (DePierola, Jacqueline)
Related: [-] 25
Wednesday, July 25, 2018
27 27 notice Notice, Hearing Wed 07/25 4:14 PM
Notice of Hearing / Notice of Scheduled Trial Dates Related [+] filed by John Longmire on behalf of RML Distribution Domestic, LLC, Relativity Media, LLC. (Longmire, John)
Related: [-] 13 ,11
Tuesday, July 24, 2018
26 26 misc Affidavit of Service Tue 07/24 8:02 PM
Affidavit of Service of Nuno Cardoso Regarding Notice of Presentment of Proposed Confidentiality Stipulation and Protective Order Related [+] filed by Prime Clerk LLC.(Steele, Benjamin)
Related: [-] 25
Thursday, July 19, 2018
25 25 notice Notice, Proposed Order/Presentment Thu 07/19 8:09 AM
Notice of Presentment of Proposed Confidentiality Stipulation and Protective Order filed by Antonio Yanez Jr. on behalf of RML Distribution Domestic, LLC, Relativity Media, LLC. with presentment to be held on 7/24/2018 (check with court for location) Objections due by 7/24/2018, (Yanez, Antonio)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 18, 2018
24 24 misc Letter Wed 07/18 3:58 PM
Letter Filed by Alan R. Glickman on behalf of UltraV Holdings LLC. (Glickman, Alan)
Related: [-]
23 23 order So Ordered Stipulation Wed 07/18 12:31 PM
So Ordered Notice of Substitution of Attorney for Relativity Media, LLC and RML Distribution Domestic, LLC from Winston & Strawn LLP to Willkie Farr & Gallagher LLP signed on 7/18/2018 Related [+]. (DePierola, Jacqueline)
Related: [-] 21
Friday, July 13, 2018
22 22 misc Affidavit of Service Fri 07/13 3:53 PM
Affidavit of Service Of Nuno Cardoso regarding Notice of Substitution of Counsel Related [+] Filed by Adam M. Adler on behalf of Prime Clerk LLC. (Adler, Adam)
Related: [-] 21
Wednesday, July 11, 2018
21 21 notice Notice, Substitution of Attorney Wed 07/11 3:44 PM
Notice of Substitution of Attorney for Relativity Media, LLC and RML Distribution Domestic, LLC from Winston & Strawn LLP to Willkie Farr & Gallagher LLP filed by Antonio Yanez Jr. on behalf of RML Distribution Domestic, LLC, Relativity Media, LLC. (Yanez, Antonio)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 10, 2018
20 20 misc Certificate of Service Tue 07/10 1:37 PM
Certificate of Service re Netflix, Inc.'s Answer to Counterclaims of Relativity Media, LLC and RML Distribution Domestic, LLC Related [+] Filed by Robert J. Pfister on behalf of Netflix, Inc.. (Pfister, Robert)
Related: [-] 19
Monday, July 09, 2018
19 19 answer None Mon 07/09 9:30 PM
Answer to Counterclaim Related [+] filed by Robert J. Pfister on behalf of Netflix, Inc.. (Pfister, Robert)
Related: [-] 13
Thursday, July 05, 2018
18 18 146 pgs misc Transcript Fri 07/06 1:07 PM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 07/03/2018 at 11:06 am RE: Status Conference;. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 10/3/2018. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: eScribers, LLC.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 7/12/2018. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 7/26/2018. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 8/6/2018. Transcript access will be restricted through 10/3/2018. (Lewis, Tenille)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 02, 2018
16 16 misc Letter Mon 07/02 11:31 PM
Letter Regarding Discovery Issues Filed by Carrie V Hardman on behalf of RML Distribution Domestic, LLC, Relativity Media, LLC. with hearing to be held on 7/3/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 617 (MEW) (Hardman, Carrie)
Related: [-]
Sunday, July 01, 2018
17 17 67 pgs misc Transcript Fri 07/06 12:39 PM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 06/28/2018 at 11:06 am RE: Status Conference. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 10/1/2018. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: eScribers, LLC.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 7/9/2018. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 7/23/2018. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 8/1/2018. Transcript access will be restricted through 10/1/2018. (Lewis, Tenille)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 29, 2018
15 15 notice Notice, Withdrawal Fri 06/29 2:04 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance of David M. Guess filed by David M. Guess on behalf of Netflix, Inc.. (Guess, David)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice, Hearing Fri 06/29 1:38 PM
Notice of Hearing / Notice of Status Conference on July 3, 2018 at 11:00 AM (ET) filed by Carrie V Hardman on behalf of Relativity Media, LLC. with hearing to be held on 7/3/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 617 (MEW) (Hardman, Carrie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 27, 2018
13 13 answer|cmp Answer, Amended Complaint|Counterclaim Wed 06/27 9:27 AM
Answer to Amended Complaint Related [+], Counterclaim against Netflix, Inc. filed by Carrie V Hardman on behalf of RML Distribution Domestic, LLC, Relativity Media, LLC. (Hardman, Carrie)
Related: [-] 11 11
Wednesday, June 20, 2018
12 12 misc Affidavit of Service Wed 06/20 6:29 PM
Affidavit of Service Of Nuno Cardoso regarding Relativity Media, LLC, and RML Distributions Domestic, LLCs Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Counterclaims to Netflix, Inc.s Adversary Complaint for Declaratory Judgement Related [+] Filed by Adam M. Adler on behalf of Prime Clerk LLC. (Adler, Adam)
Related: [-] 8
Tuesday, June 19, 2018
11 11 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 06/19 10:14 PM
Amended Complaint against RML Distribution Domestic, LLC, Relativity Media, LLC // Amended Adversary Complaint for Declaratory Judgment Related [+] Filed by Robert J. Pfister on behalf of Netflix, Inc.. (Pfister, Robert)
Related: [-] 1
Att: 1 Exhibit A - License Agreement
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Default Notice
Att: 3 Exhibit C - April 25 Letter
Att: 4 Exhibit D - May 8 Letter
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Additional Netflix Letter
Att: 6 Exhibit F - May 21 Letter
Att: 7 Exhibit G - May 24 Letter
10 10 notice Notice, Produce Documents Tue 06/19 5:33 PM
Notice to Produce Documents // Plaintiff's Notice of Service of Discovery on Defendants and Notice of Issuance of Third-Party Subpoenas to UltraV Parties filed by Robert J. Pfister on behalf of Netflix, Inc..(Pfister, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's First Consolidated Set of Discovery Requests to Defendants
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Subpoena to UltraV Holdings
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Subpoena to AWN Holdings II
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Subpoena to RMRM Holdings
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Subpoena to Sound Point Capital Management
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Subpoena to David Robbins
Att: 7 Exhibit G - Subpoena to Lex Miron
Att: 8 Exhibit H - Subpoena to Larry Robbins
Monday, June 18, 2018
9 9 misc Affidavit of Service Mon 06/18 8:30 PM
Affidavit of Service of Kadeem Champagnie Regarding Notice of Status Conference on June 28, 2018 at 11:00 a.m. (ET) Related [+] filed by Prime Clerk LLC.(Steele, Benjamin)
Related: [-] 7
Thursday, June 14, 2018
8 8 answer|cmp None|Counterclaim Thu 06/14 10:35 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+], Counterclaim against Netflix, Inc. filed by Carrie V Hardman on behalf of RML Distribution Domestic, LLC, Relativity Media, LLC. (Hardman, Carrie)
Related: [-] 1 1
Wednesday, June 13, 2018
7 7 notice Notice, Hearing Wed 06/13 6:08 PM
Notice of Hearing / NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE ON JUNE 28, 2018 AT 11:00 AM (ET) filed by Carrie V Hardman on behalf of RML Distribution Domestic, LLC, Relativity Media, LLC. with hearing to be held on 6/28/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 617 (Hardman, Carrie)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 08, 2018
6 6 misc Letter Fri 06/08 10:47 AM
Letter / Further Letter re, inter alia, Request for Expedited Discovery Schedule and Trial Date Related [+] Filed by Carrie V Hardman on behalf of RML Distribution Domestic, LLC, Relativity Media, LLC.(Hardman, Carrie)
Related: [-] 5
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Thursday, June 07, 2018
5 5 misc Letter Thu 06/07 9:12 PM
Letter re, inter alia, Request for Expedited Discovery Schedule and Trial Date Filed by Carrie V Hardman on behalf of RML Distribution Domestic, LLC, Relativity Media, LLC.(Hardman, Carrie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
4 4 notice Notice, Appearance in Adversary Proceeding Thu 06/07 9:07 PM
Notice of Appearance in Adversary Proceeding filed by Carrie V Hardman on behalf of RML Distribution Domestic, LLC, Relativity Media, LLC. (Hardman, Carrie)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 01, 2018
3 3 other Certificate, Service Fri 06/01 7:43 PM
Certificate of Service re Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference in an Adversary Proceeding and Adversary Complaint for Declaratory Judgment Related [+] filed by David M. Guess on behalf of Netflix, Inc.. (Guess, David)
Related: [-] 1 ,2
2 2 cmp Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference Fri 06/01 4:49 PM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 7/24/2018 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 617 (MEW), Answer due by 7/2/2018, (Braithwaite, Kenishia)
Related: [-]
1 1 20 pgs cmp Complaint (fee) Fri 06/01 2:59 PM
Adversary case 18-01552 Complaint against Relativity Media, LLC, RML Distribution Domestic, LLC Adversary Complaint for Declaratory Judgment (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (91 (Declaratory judgment)) Filed by David M. Guess on behalf of Netflix, Inc.. (Guess, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 48 pgs Exhibit A (License Agreement)
Att: 2 Exhibit B (Default Notice)
Att: 3 Exhibit C (April 25 Letter)
Att: 4 Exhibit D (May 8 Letter)
Att: 5 Exhibit E (Additional Netflix Letter)
Att: 6 Exhibit F (May 21 Letter)
Att: 7 Exhibit G (May 25 Letter)