Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:15-bk-13008

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Theodor Albert
Case #: 8:18-ap-01098
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jun 01, 2018
Terminated:Jan 29, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Greenleaf Advertising and Media, Inc.
Represented By
Greenleaf Advertising and Media, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Karen Sue Naylor, Chapter 7 Trustee
Represented By
Christopher Minier
Ringstad & Sanders LLP
contact info
Trustee
Karen S Naylor (TR)
4343 Von Karman Avenue, Suite 300
Newport Beach, CA 92660
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (SA)
411 W Fourth St., Suite 7160
Santa Ana, CA 92701


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 1:05 PM PDT
Wednesday, January 29, 2020
27 27 court Close Adversary Case Wed 01/29 3:35 PM
Adversary Case 8:18-ap-1098 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. Related [+] (Steinberg, Elizabeth)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Karen Sue Naylor,9 Scheduling Order (BNC-PDF)
Thursday, December 12, 2019
26 26 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Thu 12/12 9:31 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 12/12/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 24 Stipulation and ORDER thereon (BNC-PDF)
25 25 court Hearing Held (Other) Thu 12/12 6:36 PM
Hearing Held Re: Pre-Trial Conference RE: Complaint To Avoid And Recover - OFF CALENDAR - ORDER ON STIPULATION BETWEEN PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT TO DISMISS ADVERSARY PROCEEDING WITH PREJUDICE ENTERED 12-10-19 (Deramus, Glenda)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2019
24 24 order Stipulation and ORDER thereon (BNC-PDF) Tue 12/10 11:55 AM
Order On Stipulation Between Plaintiff And Defendant To Dismiss Adversary Proceeding With Prejudice (BNC-PDF) Related [+] - ORDER THAT: (1) THE STIPULATION IS APPROVED; (2) THIS ADVERSARY PROCEEDING, AND EVERY CAUSE OF ACTION ALLEGED HEREIN, IS HEREBY DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; AND (3) THE PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULED TO BE HELD IS TAKEN OFF OF THE COURT'S CALENDAR Signed on 12/10/2019 (Deramus, Glenda)
Related: [-] 23
Monday, December 09, 2019
23 23 motion Stipulation (motion) Mon 12/09 9:58 AM
Stipulation By Karen Sue Naylor and Defendant to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding with Prejudice Filed by Plaintiff Karen Sue Naylor (Minier, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2019
22 22 court Hearing Continued (Other) Fri 09/27 3:31 PM
Hearing Continued PER ORDER ON STIPULATION (THIRD) BETWEEN PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT TO CONTINUE PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE ENTERED 7-15-19 Related [+] CONTINUED Pre-Trial Conference set for 12/12/2019 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 5B, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Theodor Albert (Steinberg, Elizabeth)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Karen Sue Naylor
Wednesday, July 17, 2019
21 21 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Wed 07/17 9:47 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 07/17/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 20 Stipulation and ORDER thereon (BNC-PDF)
Monday, July 15, 2019
20 20 order Stipulation and ORDER thereon (BNC-PDF) Mon 07/15 10:14 AM
Order Approving Stipulation (Third) between Plaintiff and Defendant to Continue the (1) Discovery Completion deadline (2) Deadline for filing Pre-Trial Motions; and (3) Pre-Trial Conference. The discovery completion deadline is this adversary proceeding shall be extended to, and including, October 31, 2019; The pre-trail motion filing deadline in this adversary proceeding shall be extended to, and including, November 15, 2019; and The pre-trial conference in this adversary proceeding shall be, and hereby is, continued from September 26, 2019 at 10:00 a.m., to December 12, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 7/15/2019 (Mccall, Audrey)
Related: [-] 19
Friday, July 12, 2019
19 19 motion Stipulation (motion) Fri 07/12 12:39 PM
Stipulation By Karen Sue Naylor and Stipulation (Third) Between Plaintiff and Defendant to Continue the: (1) Discovery Completion Deadline; (2) Deadline for Filing Pre-Trial Motions; and (3) Pre-Trial Conference Filed by Plaintiff Karen Sue Naylor (Donahoo, Richard)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 30, 2019
18 18 court Hearing Continued (Other) Mon 06/03 11:51 AM
Hearing Continued Related [+] - Pre-Trial Conference continued to 9-26-19 at 10:00 am Per Order on Stipulation (Second) Between Plaintiff and Defendant to Continue Pre-Trial Conference Entered 5-07-19. The case judge is Theodor Albert (Daniels, Sally)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Karen Sue Naylor
Thursday, May 09, 2019
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Thu 05/09 9:36 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 05/09/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 16 Stipulation and ORDER thereon (BNC-PDF)
Tuesday, May 07, 2019
16 16 order Stipulation and ORDER thereon (BNC-PDF) Tue 05/07 2:05 PM
Order On Stipulation (Second) Between Plaintiff And Defendant To Continue The: (1) Discovery Completion DEadline; (2) Deadline For Filing Pre-Trial Motions; And (3) Pre-Trial Conferencen (BNC-PDF) Related [+] - THE PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE IN THIS ADVERSARY PROCEEDING SHALL BE, AND HEREBY IS CONTINUED FROM MAY 30, 2019 AT 10:00 A.M. TO SEPTEMBER 26, 2019 AT 10:00 A.M. - PLEASE SEE ORDER Signed on 5/7/2019 (Deramus, Glenda)
Related: [-] 15
Friday, May 03, 2019
15 15 motion Stipulation (motion) Fri 05/03 5:26 PM
Stipulation By Karen Sue Naylor and Stipulation (Second) Between Plaintiff and Defendant to Continue the: (1) Discovery Completion Deadline; (2) Deadline for Filing Pre-Trial Motions; and (3) Pre-Trial Conference Filed by Plaintiff Karen Sue Naylor (Minier, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 28, 2019
14 14 court Hearing Continued (Other) Mon 04/01 5:51 PM
PRE-TIRAL CONFERENCE CONTINUED Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 5/30/2019 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 5B, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Theodor Albert - CONTINUED TO 5-30-19 AT 10:00 A.M. PER ORDER ON STIPULATION BETWEEN PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANTS TO CONTINUE PRE-TRIAL ENTERED 2-14-19 (Deramus, Glenda)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Karen Sue Naylor
Saturday, February 16, 2019
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sat 02/16 9:30 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 02/16/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 Stipulation and ORDER thereon (BNC-PDF)
Thursday, February 14, 2019
12 12 order Stipulation and ORDER thereon (BNC-PDF) Thu 02/14 4:32 PM
Order On Stipulation Between Plaintiff And Defendants To Continue The: (1) Discovery Completion Deadline; (2) Deadline For Filing Pre-Trial Motions; and (3) Pre-Trial Conference (BNC-PDF) Related [+] - IT IS ORDERED: 1. THE STIPULATION IS APPROVED; 2. THE PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE IS CONTINUED FROM MARCH 28, 2019 AT 10:00 A.M. TO MAY 30, 2019 AT 10:00 A.M. Signed on 2/14/2019 (Deramus, Glenda)
Related: [-] 11
Friday, February 01, 2019
11 11 motion Stipulation (motion) Fri 02/01 5:55 PM
Stipulation By Greenleaf Advertising and Media, Inc. and Karen Sue Naylor, Chapter 7 Trustee to Continue the: (1) Discovery Completion Deadline; (2) Deadline for Filing Pre-Trial Motions; and (3) Pre-Trial Conference Filed by Defendant Greenleaf Advertising and Media, Inc. (Haag, Mirco)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 30, 2018
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Thu 08/30 9:36 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 08/30/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 Scheduling Order (BNC-PDF)
Tuesday, August 28, 2018
9 9 order Scheduling Order (BNC-PDF) Tue 08/28 10:54 AM
Scheduling Order In Adversary Proceeding (BNC-PDF) Signed on 8/28/2018. Pre-Trial Conference set for 3/28/2019 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 5B, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Theodor Albert Pre-Trial Order due by 3/11/2019. Discovery due by 2/28/2019. PLEASE SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER RULING (Deramus, Glenda)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 24, 2018
7 7 misc Notice of Lodgment Fri 08/24 3:02 PM
Notice of lodgment of Scheduling Order in Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Karen Sue Naylor Related [+]. (Minier, Christopher)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Thursday, August 23, 2018
8 8 court Hearing Continued (Other) Mon 08/27 11:31 AM
STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING HELD Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 3/28/2019 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 5B, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Theodor Albert - DEADLINE FOR COMPLETING DISCOVERY: FEBRUARY 28, 2019; LAST DATE FOR FILING PRE-TRIAL MOTIONS: MARCH 11, 2019; PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE ON: MARCH 28, 2019 AT 10:00 A.M.; JOINT PRE-TRIAL ORDER DUE PER LOCAL RULES. ATTORNEY FOR TRUSTEE, CHRIS MINIER, TO SUBMIT FORM OF ORDER. (Dermus, Glenda)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Karen Sue Naylor
Thursday, August 09, 2018
6 6 misc Status report Thu 08/09 4:34 PM
Status report Joint Status Report Filed by Plaintiff Karen Sue Naylor Related [+]. (Minier, Christopher)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Monday, July 16, 2018
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 07/16 1:52 PM
Answer to Complaint to Avoid and Recover Preferential Transfers Filed by Greenleaf Advertising and Media, LLC. (Garfinkle, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 05, 2018
4 4 notice Notice Tue 06/05 11:40 AM
Notice of Need to Comply with Local Bankruptcy Rule 7026-1, Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 7026, and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26 to Defendant, Greenleaf Advertising and Media, Inc. Filed by Plaintiff Karen Sue Naylor Related [+]. (Minier, Christopher)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 8:18-ap-01098. Complaint by Karen Sue Naylor, Chapter 7 Trustee against Greenleaf Advertising and Media, Inc.. (Charge To Estate - $350.00). Complaint to Avoid and Recover Preferential Transfer Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) (Minier, Christopher) Modified on 6/4/2018 (Daniels, Sally). Corrected demand amount from 3532000000 to 3532000 Modified on 6/4/2018. filed by Plaintiff Karen Sue Naylor
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 06/05 11:31 AM
Summons Service Executed on Greenleaf Advertising and Media, Inc. 6/5/2018 (Minier, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 04, 2018
2 2 court Summons Issued Mon 06/04 11:53 AM
Summons Issued on Greenleaf Advertising and Media, Inc. Date Issued 6/4/2018, Answer Due 7/5/2018 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 8/23/2018 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 5B, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Theodor Albert (Daniels, Sally)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Karen Sue Naylor
Friday, June 01, 2018
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 06/01 4:20 PM
Adversary case 8:18-ap-01098. Complaint by Karen Sue Naylor, Chapter 7 Trustee against Greenleaf Advertising and Media, Inc.. (Charge To Estate - $350.00). Complaint to Avoid and Recover Preferential Transfer Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) (Minier, Christopher) Modified on 6/4/2018 (Daniels, Sally). Corrected demand amount from 3532000000 to 3532000 Modified on 6/4/2018 (Daniels, Sally)
Related: [-]