Original Case: 1:15-cv-02671

Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:18-cv-01672
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Case Filed:May 31, 2018
Terminated:May 28, 2019
Last checked: Thursday May 30, 2019 4:33 AM EDT
Defendant-Counter-Claimant - Appellee
CTS Holdings, Inc.
Represented By
Stuart Jay Glick
Thompson & Knight LLP
contact info
Marion Bachrach
Thompson & Knight LLP
contact info
Stuart J. Glick
Thompson & Knight LLP
contact info
Vivian Arias
Thompson & Knight LLP
contact info
Brittney M. Edwards
Thompson & Knight LLP
contact info
Defendant-Counter-Claimant - Appellee
CTS Systems, Inc.
Represented By
Stuart Jay Glick
Thompson & Knight LLP
contact info
Marion Bachrach
Thompson & Knight LLP
contact info
Stuart J. Glick
Thompson & Knight LLP
contact info
Vivian Arias
Thompson & Knight LLP
contact info
Brittney M. Edwards
Thompson & Knight LLP
contact info
Plaintiff-Counter-Defendant - Appellant
Ecommission Solutions, LLC
Represented By
Caleb Bransford Bulls
Kelly Hart & Hallman LLP
contact info
Caleb B. Bulls
Kelly Hart & Hallman LLP
contact info
Michael D. Anderson
Kelly Hart & Hallman LLP
contact info
John H. Cayce Jr.
Kelly Hart & Hallman LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/30/2019 4:28 AM EDT
Thursday, May 31, 2018
1 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Ecommission Solutions, LLC, FILED. [2317002] 18-1672 [Entered: 06/04/2018 12:12 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax
Att: 2 21 pgs Case FILED
2 2 18 pgs DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 05/01/2018, RECEIVED.[2317025] 18-1672 [Entered: 06/04/2018 12:23 PM]
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 05/02/2018, RECEIVED.[2317030] 18-1672 [Entered: 06/04/2018 12:25 PM]
Related: [-]
4 4 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Ecommission Solutions, LLC, district court receipt # 0208-15139082, FILED.[2317049] 18-1672 [Entered: 06/04/2018 12:32 PM]
Related: [-]
5 5 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2317055] 18-1672 [Entered: 06/04/2018 12:37 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed
Att: 2 21 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED