New York Southern District Court
Judge:Katherine B Forrest
Referred: Henry B Pitman
Case #: 1:15-cv-02671
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1441nr Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Apr 06, 2015
Terminated:May 02, 2018
Last checked: Saturday Oct 03, 2015 3:43 PM EDT
Defendant
CTS Holdings, Inc.
Represented By
Vivian Margarita Arias
Thompson & Knight, Llp (nyc)
contact info
Stuart J. Glick
Thompson & Knight, Llp (nyc)
contact info
Defendant
CTS Systems, Inc.
Represented By
Vivian Margarita Arias
Thompson & Knight, Llp (nyc)
contact info
Stuart J. Glick
Thompson & Knight, Llp (nyc)
contact info
Plaintiff
Ecommission Solutions, LLC
Represented By
Elizabeth J. Sher
Day Pitney, L.L.P. (times Square)
contact info
Chelsea Elizabeth Mullarney
Day Pitney, L.L.P. (times Square)
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, September 15, 2023
174 174 misc Sealed Document Disposed Fri 09/15 1:29 PM
SEALED MATERIALS DISPOSED: Document(s) 139, 154 and 165 were destroyed since the filing party did not retrieve the material(s) within 30 days of the date indicated. The sealed record(s) were destroyed on 09/15/2023..(jus)
Related: [-]
173 173 misc Sealed Document Disposed Fri 09/15 1:26 PM
SEALED MATERIALS DISPOSED: Document(s) 138, 152 and 163 were destroyed since the filing party did not retrieve the material(s) within 30 days of the date indicated. The sealed record(s) were destroyed on 09/15/2023..(jus)
Related: [-]