Amerigreen Electricity, LLC
Member Case
Lead case is: 4:18-bk-13774
Lead case is: 4:18-bk-13774
Pennsylvania Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Patricia M Mayer |
Case #: | 4:18-bk-13780 |
Case Filed: | Jun 06, 2018 |
Creditor Meeting: | Jul 10, 2018 |
Debtor
Amerigreen Electricity, LLC
85 White Oak Rd
Manheim, PA 17545-8550 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
CHRISTINE C. SHUBERT
821 Wesley Avenue
Ocean City, NJ 08226 |
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee 833 Chestnut Street Suite 500
Philadelphia, PA 19107 |
Docket last updated: 06/07/2018 12:04 AM EDT |
Wednesday, June 06, 2018 | ||
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card
Wed 06/06 6:00 PM
Receipt of Voluntary petition (Chapter 7) 18-13780 [misc,volp7a] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 20247275. Fee Amount $ 335.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
1 | 1
![]() Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-individual . Fee Amount $335 Filed by Amerigreen Electricity, LLC. Government Proof of Claim Deadline: 12/3/2018. Atty Disclosure Statement due 06/20/2018. Schedule A/B due 06/20/2018. Schedule D due 06/20/2018. Schedule E/F due 06/20/2018. Schedule G due 06/20/2018. Schedule H due 06/20/2018. Statement of Financial Affairs due 06/20/2018. Summary of Assets and Liabilities Form B106 due 06/20/2018. Incomplete Filings due by 06/20/2018. (BURNETT, WILLIAM) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Matrix
Wed 06/06 5:48 PM
Matrix Filed. Number of pages filed: 0, Filed by WILLIAM J. BURNETT on behalf of Amerigreen Electricity, LLC. (BURNETT, WILLIAM) |
|
3 | 3
court
Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset)
Wed 06/06 5:50 PM
Name of Trustee assigned to case: CHRISTINE C. SHUBERT, Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 07/10/2018 at 01:30 PM at Lancaster Bar Association. (Administration, Automatic) |