Pennsylvania Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Patricia M Mayer
Case #: 4:18-bk-13774
Case Filed:Jun 06, 2018
Creditor Meeting:Aug 14, 2018
Claims Deadline:Oct 23, 2018

Debtor
Worley & Obetz, Inc.
85 White Oak Rd
Manheim, PA 17545-8550
Represented By
WILLIAM J. BURNETT
Flaster/greenberg P.C.
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
CHRISTINE C. SHUBERT
821 Wesley Avenue
Ocean City, NJ 08226
Represented By
MAGDALENA SCHARDT
Fox,rothschild,o'Brien & Frankel, L
contact info
ROBERT W. SEITZER
Karalis PC
contact info
JASON CHRISTOPHER MANFREY
Fox Rothchild LLP
contact info
JESSE M. HARRIS
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
DAVID GRANT CROOKS
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
CHRISTINE C. SHUBERT
contact info
MICHAEL G. MENKOWITZ
Fox,rothschild, LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee 833 Chestnut Street Suite 500
Philadelphia, PA 19107
Represented By
DAVE P. ADAMS
United States Trustee
contact info

GPO Feb 28 2020
Memorandum Re: Objection to Claim Number 256 by Claimant Sheila Pringle And Objection to Claim Number 251 by Claimant Sandra L. Rapp. For the reasons discussed the Court will sustain in part and overrule in part the Trustees Objections. The Court will sustain each of the Trustees Objections in part on the grounds that the Claims are not entitled to administrative priority under §503(b)(1). The Court will, however, overrule the Trustees Objections in part because each of the Claims is entitled to priority status pursuant to §507(a)(7).(related document(s)787, 789). (W., Christine)

Docket last updated: 01/14/2025 4:56 PM EST
Wednesday, June 06, 2018
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Wed 06/06 6:00 PM
Receipt of Voluntary petition (Chapter 7) 18-13774 [misc,volp7a] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 20247275. Fee Amount $ 335.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 9 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Wed 06/06 5:29 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-individual . Fee Amount $335 Filed by Worley & Obetz, Inc.. Matrix List of Creditors due 06/13/2018. Government Proof of Claim Deadline: 12/3/2018. Atty Disclosure Statement due 06/20/2018. Schedule A/B due 06/20/2018. Schedule D due 06/20/2018. Schedule E/F due 06/20/2018. Schedule G due 06/20/2018. Schedule H due 06/20/2018. Statement of Financial Affairs due 06/20/2018. Summary of Assets and Liabilities Form B206 due 06/20/2018. Incomplete Filings due by 06/20/2018. (BURNETT, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset) Wed 06/06 5:30 PM
Name of Trustee assigned to case: CHRISTINE C. SHUBERT, Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 07/10/2018 at 12:30 PM at Lancaster Bar Association. (Administration, Automatic)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Corporate Resolution Thu 06/07 9:20 AM
Corporate Resolution Filed by WILLIAM J. BURNETT on behalf of Worley & Obetz, Inc.. (H., Lisa)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Statement of Corporate Ownership Thu 06/07 9:21 AM
Statement of Corporate Ownership filed. Filed by WILLIAM J. BURNETT on behalf of Worley & Obetz, Inc.. (H., Lisa)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Requiring Documents Thu 06/07 9:23 AM
Order Entered the debtor having failed to file or submit with the petition all of the documents required by Fed. R. Bankr.P.1007, It is hereby ORDERED that this case MAY BE DISMISSED WITHOUT FURTHER NOTICE if the documents listed are not filed by deadlines listed: Any request for an extension of time must be filed prior to the expiration of the deadlines listed. (Matrix List of Creditors due 06/13/2018. Atty Disclosure Statement due 06/20/2018. Schedules A/B,D,E/F,G,H due 06/20/2018. Statement of Financial Affairs due 06/20/2018. Summary of Assets and Liabilities Form B206 due 06/20/2018.) (H., Lisa)
Related: [-]