Member Case
Lead case is: 4:18-bk-13774

Pennsylvania Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Patricia M Mayer
Case #: 4:18-bk-13784
Case Filed:Jun 06, 2018
Creditor Meeting:Jul 10, 2018

Debtor
Amerigreen Propane, LLC
85 White Oak Rd
Manheim, PA 17545-8550
Represented By
WILLIAM J. BURNETT
Flaster/greenberg P.C.
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
CHRISTINE C. SHUBERT
821 Wesley Avenue
Ocean City, NJ 08226
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee 833 Chestnut Street Suite 500
Philadelphia, PA 19107


Docket last updated: 06/07/2018 12:04 AM EDT
Wednesday, June 06, 2018
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Wed 06/06 6:00 PM
Receipt of Voluntary petition (Chapter 7) 18-13784 [misc,volp7a] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 20247275. Fee Amount $ 335.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Wed 06/06 5:57 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-individual . Fee Amount $335 Filed by Amerigreen Propane, LLC. Government Proof of Claim Deadline: 12/3/2018. Atty Disclosure Statement due 06/20/2018. Schedule A/B due 06/20/2018. Schedule D due 06/20/2018. Schedule E/F due 06/20/2018. Schedule G due 06/20/2018. Schedule H due 06/20/2018. Statement of Financial Affairs due 06/20/2018. Summary of Assets and Liabilities Form B106 due 06/20/2018. Incomplete Filings due by 06/20/2018. (BURNETT, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Matrix Wed 06/06 5:57 PM
Matrix Filed. Number of pages filed: 0, Filed by WILLIAM J. BURNETT on behalf of Amerigreen Propane, LLC. (BURNETT, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset) Wed 06/06 6:00 PM
Name of Trustee assigned to case: CHRISTINE C. SHUBERT, Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 07/10/2018 at 02:00 PM at Lancaster Bar Association. (Administration, Automatic)
Related: [-]