Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:15-bk-13008

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Theodor Albert
Case #: 8:18-ap-01109
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jun 13, 2018
Terminated:Apr 20, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Alan Gladstone
Represented By
Alan Gladstone
contact info
Plaintiff
Karen Sue Naylor, Chapter 7 Trustee
4343 Von Karman Avenue, Ste 300
Newport Beach, CA 92660
Represented By
Todd C. Ringstad
contact info
Trustee
Karen S Naylor (TR)
4343 Von Karman Avenue, Suite 300
Newport Beach, CA 92660
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (SA)
411 W Fourth St., Suite 7160
Santa Ana, CA 92701


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 1:05 PM PDT
Wednesday, April 20, 2022
77 77 court Close Adversary Case Wed 04/20 2:16 PM
Adversary Case 8:18-ap-1109 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. Related [+] (Mccall, Audrey)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Karen Sue Naylor,29 Scheduling Order (BNC-PDF), 65 Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case), 67 Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case)
Wednesday, April 13, 2022
76 76 misc Notice of Change of Address Wed 04/13 9:24 AM
Notice of Change of Address Filed by Trustee Karen S Naylor (TR). (Naylor (TR), Karen)
Related: [-]