Bayoh v. Afropunk Fest 2015 LLC et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Denise L Cote |
Referred: | Kevin Nathaniel Fox |
Case #: | 1:18-cv-05820 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Jun 27, 2018 |
Terminated: | Dec 21, 2020 |
Last checked: Monday Dec 24, 2018 4:59 AM EST |
Defendant
Afropunk Fest 2015 LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Afropunk Global Initiative LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Afropunk LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jocelyn Cooper
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John Doe
|
|
Defendant
Jane Doe 1-10
|
|
Defendant
Matthew Morgan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mambu Bayoh
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, June 02, 2021 | ||
misc
Notice Regarding Deleted Document
Wed 06/02 12:16 PM
***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 202 Certificate of Good Staning Request. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (vba) |