Original Case: 1:18-cv-05820

Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:21-cv-00105
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Case Filed:Jan 19, 2021
Terminated:May 07, 2021
Last checked: Tuesday May 11, 2021 4:30 AM EDT
Defendant
Afropunk Fest 2015 LLC
Defendant
Afropunk Global Initiative LLC
Defendant
John Doe, individually
Defendant
Jane Doe, 1-10, individually
Defendant - Appellee
Afropunk LLC
Represented By
Jonathan Goins
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP
contact info
Brian Pete
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Matthew Morgan, individually
Represented By
Jonathan Goins
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP
contact info
Brian Pete
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Jocelyn Cooper, individually
Represented By
Jonathan Goins
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP
contact info
Brian Pete
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Mambu Bayoh
Represented By
Robert L. Greener
Law Office of Robert L. Greener
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/11/2021 4:29 AM EDT
Tuesday, January 19, 2021
1 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Mambu Bayoh, FILED. [3016529] [21-105] [Entered: 01/19/2021 09:15 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax
Att: 2 24 pgs Case FILED
2 2 24 pgs DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 10/26/2020, RECEIVED.[3016533] [21-105] [Entered: 01/19/2021 09:22 PM]
Related: [-]
3 3 4 pgs DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 10/28/2020, RECEIVED.[3016534] [21-105] [Entered: 01/19/2021 09:23 PM]
Related: [-]
4 4 14 pgs DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 12/11/2020, RECEIVED.[3016535] [21-105] [Entered: 01/19/2021 09:23 PM]
Related: [-]
5 5 4 pgs DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER, dated 12/18/2020, RECEIVED.[3016536] [21-105] [Entered: 01/19/2021 09:24 PM]
Related: [-]
6 6 1 pgs DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 12/21/2020, RECEIVED.[3016537] [21-105] [Entered: 01/19/2021 09:24 PM]
Related: [-]
7 7 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Mambu Bayoh, USCA receipt # ANYSDC23561392, FILED.[3016538] [21-105] [Entered: 01/19/2021 09:25 PM]
Related: [-]