Seidel v. HC-7502 Greenville Avenue, LLC et al
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:17-bk-32255
Lead BK case is: 3:17-bk-32255
Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Barbara J Houser |
Case #: | 3:18-ap-03219 |
Nature of Suit | 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Jun 27, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jan 11, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
HC-7502 Greenville Avenue, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Capital One, NA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Scott M. Seidel, Chapter 7 Trustee for Walnut Hill Physicians Hospital, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 1:10 PM CDT |
Wednesday, March 30, 2022 | ||
court
Receipt of filing fee for complaint
Wed 03/30 8:55 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee - $350.00 by SW. Receipt Number 339228. (admin) |
||
Friday, January 11, 2019 | ||
court
Close adversary case
Fri 01/11 9:43 AM
Adversary case 3:18-ap-3219 closed (Levario, Tandi) |
||
Thursday, January 10, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Stipulation
Thu 01/10 7:43 PM
Stipulation by Scott M. Seidel and HC-7502 Greenville Avenue, LLC. filed by Plaintiff Scott M. Seidel . (Rukavina, Davor) |
|
15 | 15
notice
Notice of dismissal of party(ies)
Thu 01/10 6:38 PM
Notice of dismissal of Capital One, N.A. as a party(ies) in this case filed by Plaintiff Scott M. Seidel. (Rukavina, Davor) |
|
Friday, December 21, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice (generic)
Fri 12/21 11:08 AM
Notice of Withdrawal filed by Defendant HC-7502 Greenville Avenue, LLC . (Lamberson, Phillip) |
|
Tuesday, November 06, 2018 | ||
court
Hearing held
Fri 11/09 10:54 AM
Trial Docket Call held on 11/6/2018. (SETTLEMENT ANNOUNCED. 9019 TO BE FILED ON OR BEFORE 11/16/18.) (Harden, D.) |
||
Friday, October 26, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of hearing
Fri 10/26 9:30 AM
Notice of hearing filed by Defendant HC-7502 Greenville Avenue, LLC . Hearing to be held on 12/27/2018 at 02:00 PM Dallas Judge Houser Ctrm for9 , (Chiarello, Annmarie) |
|
Wednesday, October 17, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
court
Clerk's correspondence
Wed 10/17 3:29 PM
Clerk's correspondence requesting a notice of hearing from attorney for defendant. Responses due by 10/26/2018. (Taylor, A) |
|
Friday, August 31, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
answer
Objection
Fri 08/31 7:40 PM
Objection to filed by Plaintiff Scott M. Seidel. (Berghman, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibits A & B | ||
Tuesday, August 28, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Brief
Tue 08/28 7:51 PM
Brief in support filed by Defendant HC-7502 Greenville Avenue, LLC . (Chiarello, Annmarie) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Dismiss adversary proceeding
Tue 08/28 7:50 PM
Motion to dismiss adversary proceeding filed by Defendant HC-7502 Greenville Avenue, LLC (Chiarello, Annmarie) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, August 22, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of appearance and request for notice
Wed 08/22 7:37 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Annmarie Antoniette Chiarello filed by Defendant HC-7502 Greenville Avenue, LLC. (Chiarello, Annmarie) |
|
Friday, June 29, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
cmp
Summons service executed
Fri 06/29 11:05 AM
Summons service executed on HC-7502 Greenville Avenue, LLC 6/29/2018 (Vasek, Julian) |
|
6 | 6
cmp
Summons service executed
Fri 06/29 11:04 AM
Summons service executed on Capital One, NA 6/29/2018 (Vasek, Julian) |
|
5 | 5
cmp
Summons service executed
Fri 06/29 11:04 AM
Summons service executed on Capital One, NA 6/29/2018 (Vasek, Julian) |
|
crditcrd
none
Fri 06/29 7:50 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 18-03219 bjh) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt number TC - Trustee Seidel filed Adversary Proceeding & Notice to Defer Filing Fee, amount $ 0.00 . (Castillo) |
||
Thursday, June 28, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice (generic)
Thu 06/28 1:50 PM
Notice to Defer Filing Fee filed by Plaintiff Scott M. Seidel. (Vasek, Julian) |
|
3 | 3
order
Standing scheduling order in an adversary proceeding
Thu 06/28 11:31 AM
Scheduling order setting deadlines. Discovery and all exhibits except impeachment documents: 45 days prior to Docket Call, pre-trial order: 7 calendar days prior to Docket Call, proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law: 7 days prior to first scheduled docket call . Trial Docket Call date set for 11/6/2018 at 01:15 PM at Dallas Judge Houser Ctrm. Entered on 6/28/2018 (Harden, D.) |
|
2 | 2
court
Summons issued
Thu 06/28 11:29 AM
Summons issued on Capital One, NA Answer Due 7/30/2018; HC-7502 Greenville Avenue, LLC Answer Due 7/30/2018 (Harden, D.) |
|
Wednesday, June 27, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 06/27 9:18 PM
Adversary case 18-03219 Complaint by Scott Seidel against HC-7502 Greenville Avenue, LLC, Capital One, NA. Fee Amount $350. Nature(s) of suit: 14 . (Vasek, Julian) |
|
Att: 1 Adversary Cover Sheet |