Bloomfield Health Facilities GP, LLC
Member Case
Lead case is: 4:17-bk-44642
Lead case is: 4:17-bk-44642
Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Mark X Mullin |
Case #: | 4:18-bk-42667 |
Case Filed: | Jul 06, 2018 |
Dismissed: | Dec 09, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jan 02, 2020 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 100-199 |
Est. Assets | $0 to $50,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Bloomfield Health Facilities GP, LLC, Debtor
5420 W Plano Pkwy Ste 210
Plano, TX 75093-4823 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
1100 Commerce Street Room 976
Dallas, TX 75242 |
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Thursday, January 02, 2020 | ||
court
Close bankruptcy case
Thu 01/02 9:56 AM
Bankruptcy case closed. (Spelmon, T) |
||
Wednesday, December 11, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
![]() BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. No. of Notices: 258. Notice Date 12/11/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, December 09, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
![]() Order dismissing Debtor without prejudice. Entered on 12/9/2019 (Calfee, J.) |
|
Friday, September 07, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
![]() Schedules: Summary of Assets and Liabilities. Filed by Debtor Bloomfield Health Facilities GP, LLC. (Keiffer, Edwin) |
|
Friday, August 24, 2018 | ||
court
Meeting of creditors held
Fri 08/24 1:55 PM
Trustee's initial report of meeting of creditors held on 8/24/2018 (Schmidt, Erin) |
||
Wednesday, July 25, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
![]() Order granting motion for joint administration lead case 4:17-bk-44642 with member case 4:2018-bk-42667-rfn Judge Mark X. Mullin assigned. Involvement of Judge Russell F. Nelms terminated. An order has been entered directing the joint administration of Preferred Care Inc, et al. The docket in Case No. 17-44642 should be consulted for all matters affecting these cases. Entered on 7/25/2018. (Huffman, David) |
|
Saturday, July 21, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
![]() Statement of financial affairs for a non-individual . Filed by Debtor Bloomfield Health Facilities GP, LLC . (Keiffer, Edwin) |
|
13 | 13
![]() Schedules: Schedules A/B and D-H with Summary of Assets and Liabilities. Filed by Debtor Bloomfield Health Facilities GP, LLC . (Keiffer, Edwin) |
|
Thursday, July 12, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
![]() BNC certificate of mailing - meeting of creditors. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 07/12/2018. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, July 11, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
![]() BNC certificate of mailing. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/11/2018. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, July 10, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Amended motion for joint administration of cases 18-42679 11, 18-42667 11, 18-42668 11, 18-42669 11, 18-42670 11, 18-42671 11, 18-42672 11, 18-42673 11, 18-42674 11, 18-42675 11, 18-42676 11 18-42680 11, 18-42683 11, 18-42684 11, 18-42685 11, 18-42686 11, 18-42687 11, 18-42688 11, 18-42689 11, 18-42691 11, 18-42692 11, 18-42693 11, 18-42694 11, 18-42695 11, 18-42696 11, 18-42697 11, 18-42698 11, 18-42699 11, 18-42700 11, 18-42701 11, 18-42702 11, 18-32289 11 into Case No. 17-44642 MXM-11, In re Preferred Care Inc, et al Filed by Debtor Bloomfield Health Facilities GP, LLC (Keiffer, Edwin) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, July 09, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Objection to filed by Interested Party Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Preferred Care, Inc.. (Brookner, Jason) |
|
8 | 8
court
Meeting of creditors chapter 11
Mon 07/09 11:50 AM
Meeting of creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 8/24/2018 at 01:00 PM at FTW 341 Rm 7A24. Proofs of Claims due by 11/23/2018. Attorney(s)certificate of service of 341 meeting chapter 11 to be filed by 08/8/2018. (Neary, William) |
|
7 | 7
![]() Notice of deficiency. Schedule A/B due 7/20/2018. Schedule D due 7/20/2018. Schedule E/F due 7/20/2018. Schedule G due 7/20/2018. Schedule H due 7/20/2018. Summary of Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information due 7/20/2018. Statement of Financial Affairs due 7/20/2018. (Blanco, J.) |
|
Friday, July 06, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Creditor matrix (Verification of Mailing List) . Filed by Debtor Bloomfield Health Facilities GP, LLC. (Keiffer, Edwin) |
|
4 | 4
![]() Statement of Corporate Ownership filed. filed by Debtor Bloomfield Health Facilities GP, LLC. (Keiffer, Edwin) |
|
3 | 3
![]() Motion for joint administration of cases 18-42679 11, 18-42667 11, 18-42668 11, 18-42669 11, 18-42670 11, 18-42671 11, 18-42672 11, 18-42673 11, 18-42674 11, 18-42675 11, 18-42676 11 18-42679 11, 18-42680 11, 18-42683 11, 18-42684 11, 18-42685 11, 18-42686 11, 18-42687 11, 18-42688 11, 18-42689 11, 18-42691 11, 18-42692 11, 18-42693 11, 18-42694 11, 18-42695 11, 18-42696 11, 18-42697 11, 18-42698 11, 18-42699 11, 18-42700 11, 18-42701 11, 18-42702 11, 18-32289 11 into 17-44642 11-mxm In re Preferred Care, Inc. et al Filed by Debtor Bloomfield Health Facilities GP, LLC (McCullough, Kevin) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
2 | 2
![]() Chapter 11 or Chapter 9 Cases Non- Individual List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Against You and Are Not Insiders . Filed by Debtor Bloomfield Health Facilities GP, LLC. (Keiffer, Edwin) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Non-individual Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Bloomfield Health Facilities GP, LLC (Keiffer, Edwin) |
|
crditcrd
none
Fri 07/06 2:02 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary petition (chapter 11) 18-42667 11) [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt number 25373218, amount $1717.00 . (U.S. Treasury) |