Member Case
Lead case is: 4:17-bk-44642

Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Mark X Mullin
Case #: 4:18-bk-42673
Case Filed:Jul 06, 2018
Dismissed:Dec 09, 2019
Terminated:Jan 02, 2020

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors100-199
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Raton Health Facilities GP, LLC, Debtor
5420 W Plano Pkwy Ste 210
Plano, TX 75093-4823
Represented By
Edwin Paul Keiffer
Rochelle Mccullough, LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
1100 Commerce Street Room 976
Dallas, TX 75242


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Thursday, January 02, 2020
court Close bankruptcy case Thu 01/02 10:02 AM
Bankruptcy case closed. (Spelmon, T)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2019
20 20 court BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document Wed 12/11 11:31 PM
BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 222. Notice Date 12/11/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 19 Order dismissing Debtor without prejudice. Entered on 12/9/2019 (Calfee, J.)
Monday, December 09, 2019
19 19 order Dismiss case Mon 12/09 3:04 PM
Order dismissing Debtor without prejudice. Entered on 12/9/2019 (Calfee, J.)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 07, 2018
18 18 misc Schedules Fri 09/07 5:45 PM
Amended Schedules: E/F, with Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Not adding or changing creditors). Filed by Debtor Raton Health Facilities GP, LLC. (Keiffer, Edwin)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 24, 2018
court Meeting of creditors held Fri 08/24 2:09 PM
Trustee's initial report of meeting of creditors held on 8/24/2018 Related [+] (Schmidt, Erin)
Related: [-] 8 Meeting of creditors Chapter 11
Wednesday, July 25, 2018
17 17 order Joint administration Wed 07/25 10:23 AM
Order granting motion for joint administration lead case 4:17-bk-44642 with member case 4:2018-bk-42673-rfn Related [+]Judge Mark X. Mullin assigned. Involvement of Judge Russell F. Nelms terminated . An order has been entered directing the joint administration of Preferred Care Inc., et. al. The docket in Case No. 17-44642 should be consulted for all matters affecting these cases. The clerk shall file and docket all orders, pleadings, papers and documents, except proofs of claim, in Case No. 17-44642 Entered on 7/25/2018. (Chambers, Deanna)
Related: [-] 11
Saturday, July 21, 2018
16 16 misc Statement of financial affairs Sat 07/21 1:19 PM
Statement of financial affairs for a non-individual . Filed by Debtor Raton Health Facilities GP, LLC Related [+]. (Keiffer, Edwin)
Related: [-] 7 Notice of deficiency
15 15 misc Schedules Sat 07/21 1:18 PM
Schedules: Schedules A/B and D-H with Summary of Assets and Liabilities. Filed by Debtor Raton Health Facilities GP, LLC Related [+]. (Keiffer, Edwin)
Related: [-] 7 Notice of deficiency
Thursday, July 12, 2018
14 14 court BNC certificate of mailing - meeting of creditors Thu 07/12 11:37 PM
BNC certificate of mailing - meeting of creditors. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 07/12/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Meeting of creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 8/24/2018 at 01:00 PM at FTW 341 Rm 7A24. Proofs of Claims due by 11/23/2018. Attorney(s)certificate of service of 341 meeting chapter 11 to be filed by 08/8/2018.
Wednesday, July 11, 2018
13 13 court BNC certificate of mailing Wed 07/11 11:36 PM
BNC certificate of mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/11/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 Notice of deficiency. Schedule A/B due 7/20/2018. Schedule D due 7/20/2018. Schedule E/F due 7/20/2018. Schedule G due 7/20/2018. Schedule H due 7/20/2018. Summary of Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information due 7/20/2018. Statement of Financial Affairs due 7/20/2018.
12 12 court BNC certificate of mailing Wed 07/11 11:36 PM
BNC certificate of mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/11/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 INCORRECT ENTRY: Failed to check the Attorney fee disclosure box. Notice of deficiency. Schedule A/B due 7/20/2018. Schedule D due 7/20/2018. Schedule E/F due 7/20/2018. Schedule G due 7/20/2018. Schedule H due 7/20/2018. Summary of Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information due 7/20/2018. Statement of Financial Affairs due 7/20/2018. (Cumby, C) MODIFIED on 7/9/2018 .
Tuesday, July 10, 2018
11 11 motion Joint administration Tue 07/10 1:31 PM
Amended motion for joint administration of cases 18-42679 11, 18-42667 11, 18-42668 11, 18-42669 11, 18-42670 11, 18-42671 11, 18-42672 11, 18-42673 11, 18-42674 11, 18-42675 11, 18-42676 11 18-42680 11, 18-42683 11, 18-42684 11, 18-42685 11, 18-42686 11, 18-42687 11, 18-42688 11, 18-42689 11, 18-42691 11, 18-42692 11, 18-42693 11, 18-42694 11, 18-42695 11, 18-42696 11, 18-42697 11, 18-42698 11, 18-42699 11, 18-42700 11, 18-42701 11, 18-42702 11, and 18-32289 11 into Case No. 17-44642 MXM-11, In re Preferred Care Inc, et al Filed by Debtor Raton Health Facilities GP, LLC (Keiffer, Edwin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, July 09, 2018
10 10 answer Objection Mon 07/09 4:43 PM
Objection to Related [+] filed by Interested Party Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Preferred Care, Inc.. (Brookner, Jason)
Related: [-] 2 Motion for joint administration of cases 18-42679 11, 18-42667 11, 18-42668 11, 18-42669 11, 18-42670 11, 18-42671 11, 18-42672 11, 18-42673 11, 18-42674 11, 18-42675 11, 18-42676 11 18-42679 11, 18-42680 11, 18-42683 11, 18-42684 11, 18-42685 11, 18- filed by Debtor Raton Health Facilities GP, LLC
9 9 court Notice of deficiency Mon 07/09 1:21 PM
Notice of deficiency. Schedule A/B due 7/20/2018. Schedule D due 7/20/2018. Schedule E/F due 7/20/2018. Schedule G due 7/20/2018. Schedule H due 7/20/2018. Summary of Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information due 7/20/2018. Statement of Financial Affairs due 7/20/2018. (Cumby, C)
Related: [-]
8 8 court Meeting of creditors chapter 11 Mon 07/09 11:55 AM
Meeting of creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 8/24/2018 at 01:00 PM at FTW 341 Rm 7A24. Proofs of Claims due by 11/23/2018. Attorney(s)certificate of service of 341 meeting chapter 11 to be filed by 08/8/2018. (Neary, William)
Related: [-]
7 7 court Notice of deficiency Mon 07/09 11:05 AM
Notice of deficiency. Schedule A/B due 7/20/2018. Schedule D due 7/20/2018. Schedule E/F due 7/20/2018. Schedule G due 7/20/2018. Schedule H due 7/20/2018. Summary of Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information due 7/20/2018. Statement of Financial Affairs due 7/20/2018. (Cumby, C)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 06, 2018
5 5 misc Matrix Fri 07/06 7:41 PM
Creditor matrix (Verification of Mailing List) . Filed by Debtor Raton Health Facilities GP, LLC. (Keiffer, Edwin)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Statement of corporate ownership Fri 07/06 7:40 PM
Statement of Corporate Ownership filed. filed by Debtor Raton Health Facilities GP, LLC. (Keiffer, Edwin)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc 20 Largest unsecured creditors Fri 07/06 7:39 PM
Chapter 11 or Chapter 9 Cases Non- Individual List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Against You and Are Not Insiders . Filed by Debtor Raton Health Facilities GP, LLC. (Keiffer, Edwin)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Joint administration Fri 07/06 6:07 PM
Motion for joint administration of cases 18-42679 11, 18-42667 11, 18-42668 11, 18-42669 11, 18-42670 11, 18-42671 11, 18-42672 11, 18-42673 11, 18-42674 11, 18-42675 11, 18-42676 11 18-42679 11, 18-42680 11, 18-42683 11, 18-42684 11, 18-42685 11, 18-42686 11, 18-42687 11, 18-42688 11, 18-42689 11, 18-42691 11, 18-42692 11, 18-42693 11, 18-42694 11, 18-42695 11, 18-42696 11, 18-42697 11, 18-42698 11, 18-42699 11, 18-42700 11, 18-42701 11, 18-42702 11, 18-32289 11 into 17-44642 11-mxm in re Preferred Care Inc, et al Filed by Debtor Raton Health Facilities GP, LLC (McCullough, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
1 1 6 pgs misc Voluntary petition ch 11 (attorney filer) Fri 07/06 1:47 PM
Non-individual Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Raton Health Facilities GP, LLC (Keiffer, Edwin)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none Fri 07/06 2:02 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary petition (chapter 11) 18-42673 11) [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt number 25373218, amount $1717.00 Related [+]. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1