Member Case
Lead case is: 4:17-bk-44642

Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Mark X Mullin
Case #: 4:18-bk-42683
Case Filed:Jul 06, 2018
Dismissed:Dec 09, 2019
Terminated:Dec 26, 2019

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors100-199
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Cadiz Health Facilities GP, LLC, Debtor
5420 W Plano Pkwy Ste 210
Plano, TX 75093-4823
Represented By
Edwin Paul Keiffer
Rochelle Mccullough, LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
1100 Commerce Street Room 976
Dallas, TX 75242


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Thursday, December 26, 2019
court Close bankruptcy case Thu 12/26 9:31 AM
Bankruptcy case closed. (Hurtado, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2019
18 18 court BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document Wed 12/11 11:31 PM
BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 285. Notice Date 12/11/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 17 Order dismissing Debtor without prejudice. Entered on 12/9/2019 (Calfee, J.)
Monday, December 09, 2019
17 17 order Dismiss case Mon 12/09 2:40 PM
Order dismissing Debtor without prejudice. Entered on 12/9/2019 (Calfee, J.)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 07, 2018
16 16 misc Schedules Fri 09/07 2:45 PM
Schedules: Summary of Assets and Liabilities. Filed by Debtor Cadiz Health Facilities GP, LLC. (Keiffer, Edwin)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 24, 2018
court Meeting of creditors held Fri 08/24 1:58 PM
Trustee's initial report of meeting of creditors held on 8/24/2018 Related [+] (Schmidt, Erin)
Related: [-] 8 Meeting of creditors Chapter 11
Wednesday, July 25, 2018
15 15 order Joint administration Wed 07/25 10:42 AM
Order granting motion for joint administration lead case 4:18-bk-42683 with member case 4:2018-bk-42683-rfn Related [+]Judge Mark X. Mullin assigned. Involvement of Judge Russell F. Nelms terminated. An order has been entered directing the joint administration of Preferred Care Inc., et. al. The docket in Case No. 17-44642 should be consulted for all matters affecting these cases.The clerk shall file and docket all orders, pleadings, papers and documents, except proofs of claim, in Case No. 17-44642 Entered on 7/25/2018. (Chambers, Deanna)
Related: [-] 10
Saturday, July 21, 2018
14 14 misc Statement of financial affairs Sat 07/21 2:30 PM
Statement of financial affairs for a non-individual . Filed by Debtor Cadiz Health Facilities GP, LLC Related [+]. (Keiffer, Edwin)
Related: [-] 7 Notice of deficiency
13 13 misc Schedules Sat 07/21 2:29 PM
Schedules: Schedules A/B and D-H with Summary of Assets and Liabilities. Filed by Debtor Cadiz Health Facilities GP, LLC Related [+]. (Keiffer, Edwin)
Related: [-] 7 Notice of deficiency
Thursday, July 12, 2018
12 12 court BNC certificate of mailing - meeting of creditors Thu 07/12 11:37 PM
BNC certificate of mailing - meeting of creditors. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 07/12/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Meeting of creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 8/24/2018 at 01:00 PM at FTW 341 Rm 7A24. Proofs of Claims due by 11/23/2018. Attorney(s)certificate of service of 341 meeting chapter 11 to be filed by 08/8/2018.
Wednesday, July 11, 2018
11 11 court BNC certificate of mailing Wed 07/11 11:36 PM
BNC certificate of mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/11/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Notice of deficiency. Schedule A/B due 7/20/2018. Schedule D due 7/20/2018. Schedule E/F due 7/20/2018. Schedule G due 7/20/2018. Schedule H due 7/20/2018. Summary of Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information due 7/20/2018. Statement of Financial Affairs due 7/20/2018. (Holland, K.)
Tuesday, July 10, 2018
10 10 motion Joint administration Tue 07/10 1:37 PM
Amended motion for joint administration of cases 18-42679 11, 18-42667 11, 18-42668 11, 18-42669 11, 18-42670 11, 18-42671 11, 18-42672 11, 18-42673 11, 18-42674 11, 18-42675 11, 18-42676 11 18-42680 11, 18-42683 11, 18-42684 11, 18-42685 11, 18-42686 11, 18-42687 11, 18-42688 11, 18-42689 11, 18-42691 11, 18-42692 11, 18-42693 11, 18-42694 11, 18-42695 11, 18-42696 11, 18-42697 11, 18-42698 11, 18-42699 11, 18-42700 11, 18-42701 11, 18-42702 11, and 18-32289 11 into Case No. 17-44642 MXM-11, In re Preferred Care Inc, et al Filed by Debtor Cadiz Health Facilities GP, LLC (Keiffer, Edwin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, July 09, 2018
9 9 answer Objection Mon 07/09 4:17 PM
Objection to Related [+] filed by Interested Party Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Preferred Care, Inc.. (Brookner, Jason)
Related: [-] 2 Motion for joint administration of cases 18-42679 11, 18-42667 11, 18-42668 11, 18-42669 11, 18-42670 11, 18-42671 11, 18-42672 11, 18-42673 11, 18-42674 11, 18-42675 11, 18-42676 11 18-42679 11, 18-42680 11, 18-42683 11, 18-42684 11, 18-42685 11, 18- filed by Debtor Cadiz Health Facilities GP, LLC
8 8 court Meeting of creditors chapter 11 Mon 07/09 11:59 AM
Meeting of creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 8/24/2018 at 01:00 PM at FTW 341 Rm 7A24. Proofs of Claims due by 11/23/2018. Attorney(s)certificate of service of 341 meeting chapter 11 to be filed by 08/8/2018. (Neary, William)
Related: [-]
7 7 court Notice of deficiency Mon 07/09 10:12 AM
Notice of deficiency. Schedule A/B due 7/20/2018. Schedule D due 7/20/2018. Schedule E/F due 7/20/2018. Schedule G due 7/20/2018. Schedule H due 7/20/2018. Summary of Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information due 7/20/2018. Statement of Financial Affairs due 7/20/2018. (Holland, K.)
Related: [-]
Saturday, July 07, 2018
5 5 misc Matrix Sat 07/07 3:17 PM
Creditor matrix (Verification of Mailing List) . Filed by Debtor Cadiz Health Facilities GP, LLC. (Keiffer, Edwin)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Statement of corporate ownership Sat 07/07 3:16 PM
Statement of Corporate Ownership filed. filed by Debtor Cadiz Health Facilities GP, LLC. (Keiffer, Edwin)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc 20 Largest unsecured creditors Sat 07/07 3:15 PM
Chapter 11 or Chapter 9 Cases Non- Individual List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Against You and Are Not Insiders . Filed by Debtor Cadiz Health Facilities GP, LLC. (Keiffer, Edwin)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 06, 2018
2 2 motion Joint administration Fri 07/06 6:20 PM
Motion for joint administration of cases 18-42679 11, 18-42667 11, 18-42668 11, 18-42669 11, 18-42670 11, 18-42671 11, 18-42672 11, 18-42673 11, 18-42674 11, 18-42675 11, 18-42676 11 18-42679 11, 18-42680 11, 18-42683 11, 18-42684 11, 18-42685 11, 18-42686 11, 18-42687 11, 18-42688 11, 18-42689 11, 18-42691 11, 18-42692 11, 18-42693 11, 18-42694 11, 18-42695 11, 18-42696 11, 18-42697 11, 18-42698 11, 18-42699 11, 18-42700 11, 18-42701 11, 18-42702 11, 18-32289 11 into 17-44642 11-mxm in re Preferred Care Inc, et al Filed by Debtor Cadiz Health Facilities GP, LLC (McCullough, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
1 1 6 pgs misc Voluntary petition ch 11 (attorney filer) Fri 07/06 3:46 PM
Non-individual Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Cadiz Health Facilities GP, LLC (Keiffer, Edwin)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none Fri 07/06 4:06 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary petition (chapter 11) 18-42683 11) [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt number 25374633, amount $1717.00 Related [+]. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1