Franklin Health Facilities GP, LLC
Member Case
Lead case is: 4:17-bk-44642
Lead case is: 4:17-bk-44642
Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Mark X Mullin |
Case #: | 4:18-bk-42688 |
Case Filed: | Jul 06, 2018 |
Dismissed: | Dec 09, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jan 02, 2020 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 100-199 |
Est. Assets | $0 to $50,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Franklin Health Facilities GP, LLC, Debtor
5420 W Plano Pkwy Ste 210
Plano, TX 75093-4823 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
1100 Commerce Street Room 976
Dallas, TX 75242 |
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Thursday, January 02, 2020 | ||
court
Close bankruptcy case
Thu 01/02 10:11 AM
Bankruptcy case closed. (Spelmon, T) |
||
Wednesday, December 11, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
![]() BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. No. of Notices: 326. Notice Date 12/11/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, December 09, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
![]() Order dismissing Debtor without prejudice. Entered on 12/9/2019 (Calfee, J.) |
|
Friday, September 07, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
![]() Schedules: Summary of Assets and Liabilities. Filed by Debtor Franklin Health Facilities GP, LLC. (Keiffer, Edwin) |
|
Friday, August 24, 2018 | ||
court
Meeting of creditors held
Fri 08/24 2:03 PM
Trustee's initial report of meeting of creditors held on 8/24/2018 (Schmidt, Erin) |
||
Tuesday, July 24, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
![]() Order granting motion for joint administration lead case 4:17-bk-44642 with member case 4:2018-bk-42688-mxm. The lead case should be consulted for all matters affecting these cases. Entered on 7/24/2018. (Kerr, S.) |
|
Saturday, July 21, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
![]() Statement of financial affairs for a non-individual . Filed by Debtor Franklin Health Facilities GP, LLC . (Keiffer, Edwin) |
|
13 | 13
![]() Schedules: Schedules A/B and D-H with Summary of Assets and Liabilities. Filed by Debtor Franklin Health Facilities GP, LLC . (Keiffer, Edwin) |
|
Thursday, July 12, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
![]() BNC certificate of mailing - meeting of creditors. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 07/12/2018. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, July 11, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
![]() BNC certificate of mailing. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/11/2018. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, July 10, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Amended motion for joint administration of cases 18-42679 11, 18-42667 11, 18-42668 11, 18-42669 11, 18-42670 11, 18-42671 11, 18-42672 11, 18-42673 11, 18-42674 11, 18-42675 11, 18-42676 11 18-42680 11, 18-42683 11, 18-42684 11, 18-42685 11, 18-42686 11, 18-42687 11, 18-42688 11, 18-42689 11, 18-42691 11, 18-42692 11, 18-42693 11, 18-42694 11, 18-42695 11, 18-42696 11, 18-42697 11, 18-42698 11, 18-42699 11, 18-42700 11, 18-42701 11, 18-42702 11, and 18-32289 11 into Case No. 17-44642 MXM-11, In re Preferred Care Inc, et al Filed by Debtor Franklin Health Facilities GP, LLC (Keiffer, Edwin) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, July 09, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Objection to filed by Interested Party Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Preferred Care, Inc.. (Brookner, Jason) |
|
8 | 8
![]() Notice of deficiency. Schedule A/B due 7/20/2018. Schedule D due 7/20/2018. Schedule E/F due 7/20/2018. Schedule G due 7/20/2018. Schedule H due 7/20/2018. Summary of Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information due 7/20/2018. Statement of Financial Affairs due 7/20/2018. (Spelmon, T) |
|
7 | 7
court
Meeting of creditors chapter 11
Mon 07/09 12:02 PM
Meeting of creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 8/24/2018 at 01:00 PM at FTW 341 Rm 7A24. Proofs of Claims due by 11/23/2018. Attorney(s)certificate of service of 341 meeting chapter 11 to be filed by 08/8/2018. (Neary, William) |
|
Saturday, July 07, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Creditor matrix (Verification of Mailing List) . Filed by Debtor Franklin Health Facilities GP, LLC. (Keiffer, Edwin) |
|
4 | 4
![]() Statement of Corporate Ownership filed. filed by Debtor Franklin Health Facilities GP, LLC. (Keiffer, Edwin) |
|
3 | 3
![]() Chapter 11 or Chapter 9 Cases Non- Individual List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Against You and Are Not Insiders . Filed by Debtor Franklin Health Facilities GP, LLC. (Keiffer, Edwin) |
|
Friday, July 06, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Motion for joint administration of cases 18-42679 11, 18-42667 11, 18-42668 11, 18-42669 11, 18-42670 11, 18-42671 11, 18-42672 11, 18-42673 11, 18-42674 11, 18-42675 11, 18-42676 11 18-42679 11, 18-42680 11, 18-42683 11, 18-42684 11, 18-42685 11, 18-42686 11, 18-42687 11, 18-42688 11, 18-42689 11, 18-42691 11, 18-42692 11, 18-42693 11, 18-42694 11, 18-42695 11, 18-42696 11, 18-42697 11, 18-42698 11, 18-42699 11, 18-42700 11, 18-42701 11, 18-42702 11, 18-32289 11 into 17-44642 11-mxm in re Preferred Care Inc, et al Filed by Debtor Franklin Health Facilities GP, LLC (McCullough, Kevin) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
1 | 1
![]() Non-individual Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Franklin Health Facilities GP, LLC (Keiffer, Edwin) |
|
crditcrd
none
Fri 07/06 4:52 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary petition (chapter 11) 18-42688 11) [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt number 25375025, amount $1717.00 . (U.S. Treasury) |