Texas Northern District Court
Case #: 1:18-cr-00034
Case Filed:Apr 11, 2018
Terminated:Jan 25, 2019
Last checked: Sunday Oct 21, 2018 4:20 AM CDT
Defendant
Ronelle Lamar Oudems (1)
Represented By
David E Sloan-FPD
Federal Public Defender - Lubbock
contact info
Kenneth G Leggett
Gravley & Leggett
contact info
Federal Public Defender - AB/LU/SA
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Sarah Gunter
Federal Public Defender Northern District Of Texas
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Anderson Hatfield-DOJ
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info
Juanita Fielden-DOJ
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info

GPO Sep 21 2018
Report and Recommendation on Guilty Plea as to Ronelle Lamar Oudems Re: 58 Consent Regarding Entry of a Plea of Guilty. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge E. Scott Frost on 9/21/2018) (jmc)
GPO Oct 09 2018
Order Accepting re: 59 Report and Recommendation on Guilty Plea as to Ronelle Lamar Oudems. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 10/9/2018) (jmc)

Docket last updated: 08/04/2022 10:13 PM CDT
Wednesday, April 11, 2018
1 1 2 pgs Sealed Motion to Seal Indictment as to Ronelle Lamar Oudems. (jak)
Related: [-]
2 2 1 pgs ORDER granting1 Sealed Motion to Seal Indictment until initial appearance of defendant in federal court as to Ronelle Lamar Oudems (1) (Ordered by Magistrate Judge D. Gordon Bryant, Jr on 4/11/2018) (jak)
Related: [-]
3 3 4 pgs SEALED INDICTMENT as to Ronelle Lamar Oudems (1) count(s) 1, 2. (jak)
Related: [-]