Original Case: 1:18-cr-00034

Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:19-dcrim-10127
Typedirect criminal / direct criminal
Case Filed:Feb 04, 2019
Terminated:Nov 19, 2019
Last checked: Thursday Aug 04, 2022 10:14 PM CDT
Defendant - Appellant
RONELLE LAMAR OUDEMS
Represented By
David E. Sloan
Federal Public Defender's Office
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
Ronelle Lamar Oudems
Represented By
Kevin Joel Page
Federal Public Defender's Office
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By
James Wesley Hendrix
U.S. Attorney's Office
contact info
Rebekah Ricketts
U.S. Attorney's Office
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
United States of America
Represented By
Rebekah Ricketts
U.S. Attorney's Office
contact info
Leigha Amy Simonton
U.S. Attorney's Office
contact info

GPO Nov 19 2019
UNPUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [19-10127 Affirmed ] Judge: CDK, Judge: JEG, Judge: DRW. Mandate issue date is 12/11/2019 for Appellant Ronelle Lamar Oudems. [19-10127]

Docket last updated: 08/04/2022 10:14 PM CDT
Monday, February 04, 2019
2 pgs DIRECT CRIMINAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Ronelle Lamar Oudems 19-10127 (CBW)
Related: [-]