Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:18-bk-00284

North Carolina Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Stephani W Humrickhouse
Case #: 5:18-ap-00076
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
Case Filed:Jul 11, 2018
Terminated:Dec 27, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
Wayne Bailey, Inc.
P.O. Box 467
Chadbourn, NC 28431
Represented By
Wayne Bailey, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Carmichael Farms, LLC
PO Box 1547
Laurinburg, NC 28353
Represented By
Margaret R. Westbrook
K&l Gates LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Thursday, December 27, 2018
25 25 order Dismiss and Close AP (Compromise, Conversion, Dismissal of BK Case) Thu 12/27 10:20 AM
Order Dismissing and Closing Adversary Proceeding 5:18-ap-76 closed . (Bissette, Amy)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Motion (Public) Thu 12/27 10:28 AM
Motion Terminated. withdrawn Related [+] (Bissette, Amy)
Related: [-] 4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Carmichael Farms, LLC
Thursday, December 20, 2018
24 24 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 12/20 1:12 PM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Wayne Bailey, Inc. filed by Margaret R. Westbrook on behalf of Carmichael Farms, LLC. (Westbrook, Margaret)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 02, 2018
23 23 order Consent Order (Motion) Tue 10/02 2:54 PM
Consent Order Related [+]. (Harris, Donna)
Related: [-] 19 Motion to Approve Compromise filed by Defendant Wayne Bailey, Inc.
Thursday, September 06, 2018
utility Note - Other (Public) Thu 09/06 4:24 PM
NOTE: Audio file docketed in case number 18-00284 (Wright, Dawn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 04, 2018
22 22 misc Certificate of Service (Not for Summons) Tue 09/04 4:48 PM
Notice of Motion, Certificate of Service filed by Laurie B. Biggs on behalf of Wayne Bailey, Inc. Related [+]. (Biggs, Laurie)
Related: [-] 19 Emergency Motion to Approve Compromise With Carmichael Farms, LLC
21 21 order Expedited Hearing Tue 09/04 4:41 PM
Order Granting Motion for Expedited Hearing Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 9/6/2018 at 02:00 PM at Raleigh Courtroom Responses due by 9/6/2018. Granting Application to Reduce Response Time (Howard, Allyson)
Related: [-] 20 20 19 Emergency Motion to Approve Compromise With Carmichael Farms, LLC filed by Defendant Wayne Bailey, Inc.
20 20 motion Expedited Hearing Tue 09/04 4:33 PM
Motion to Expedite Hearing, In Addition To Application to Reduce Response Time filed by Laurie B. Biggs on behalf of Wayne Bailey, Inc. Related [+]. (Biggs, Laurie)
Related: [-] ument no.19 Motion to Approve Compromise
19 19 motion Compromise Tue 09/04 3:09 PM
Emergency Motion to Approve Compromise With Carmichael Farms, LLC filed by Laurie B. Biggs on behalf of Wayne Bailey, Inc.. (Biggs, Laurie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 28, 2018
18 18 order Continuance of Hearing Tue 08/28 7:17 AM
Order Granting Motion to Continue Hearing Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 9/6/2018 at 10:00 AM at Raleigh Courtroom (Howard, Allyson)
Related: [-] 17 4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Carmichael Farms, LLC
Monday, August 27, 2018
17 17 motion Continue Hearing Mon 08/27 4:52 PM
Second Motion to Continue Hearing Related [+] filed by Margaret R. Westbrook on behalf of Carmichael Farms, LLC. (Westbrook, Margaret)
Related: [-] ument no. Order Granting Motion to Continue Hearing (Related Doc12 ) (related documents4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Carmichael Farms, LLC) Hearing scheduled for 8/28/2018 at 11:30 AM at Raleigh Courtroomument no.14 Order on Motion to Continue Hearing
Friday, August 17, 2018
16 16 order Extend Time Fri 08/17 12:39 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time Related [+] Answer due by 9/10/2018. (Angel, Sharon)
Related: [-] 13
Monday, August 13, 2018
15 15 court Deficiency Notice - Order (BK) Mon 08/13 11:34 AM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE to Laurie B. Biggs re: Order. Either a proposed order was not submitted, or the order submitted has been rejected as follows: The order does not have a 3 inch top margin. An order should be submitted or resubmitted no later than the date indicated. Failure to do so may result in the court assuming you no longer desire the relief requested. Related [+] (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-] ument no.13 First Motion to Extend Time to File Answer, filed by Wayne Bailey, Inc.
14 14 order Continuance of Hearing Mon 08/13 10:24 AM
Order Granting Motion to Continue Hearing Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 8/28/2018 at 11:30 AM at Raleigh Courtroom (Howard, Allyson)
Related: [-] 12 4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Carmichael Farms, LLC
Friday, August 10, 2018
13 13 motion Extend Time/Deadlines Fri 08/10 10:36 AM
First Motion to Extend Time to File Answer, filed by Laurie B. Biggs on behalf of Wayne Bailey, Inc.. (Biggs, Laurie)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Continue Hearing Fri 08/10 8:28 AM
Motion to Continue Hearing Related [+] filed by Margaret R. Westbrook on behalf of Carmichael Farms, LLC. (Westbrook, Margaret)
Related: [-] ument no. Notice of Hearing (related document(s):4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Margaret R. Westbrook on behalf of Carmichael Farms, LLC. filed by Plaintiff Carmichael Farms, LLC) Hearing scheduled for 8/14/2018 at 10:30 AM at Raleigh Courtroomument no.11 Notice of Hearing
Friday, August 03, 2018
11 11 court Hearing Set (Motion) Fri 08/03 12:37 PM
Notice of Hearing Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 8/14/2018 at 10:30 AM at Raleigh Courtroom (Howard, Allyson)
Related: [-] 4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Margaret R. Westbrook on behalf of Carmichael Farms, LLC. filed by Plaintiff Carmichael Farms, LLC
Thursday, August 02, 2018
10 10 utility Matter Scheduled/Added to Calendar Thu 08/02 7:13 AM
Matter Scheduled/Added to Calendar Related [+] (Howard, Allyson)
Related: [-] ument no.1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Carmichael Farms, LLC,4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Carmichael Farms, LLC,5 Memorandum of Law filed by Plaintiff Carmichael Farms, LLC,9 Response filed by Defendant Wayne Bailey, Inc.
Wednesday, August 01, 2018
9 9 answerap Response Wed 08/01 3:20 PM
Response to Related [+] filed by Joseph Zachary Frost on behalf of Wayne Bailey, Inc. (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-] 4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Carmichael Farms, LLC
Tuesday, July 17, 2018
8 8 misc Notice of Appearance Tue 07/17 11:13 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Joseph Zachary Frost on behalf of Wayne Bailey, Inc.. (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Notice of Appearance Tue 07/17 11:12 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Trawick H Stubbs Jr. on behalf of Wayne Bailey, Inc.. (Stubbs, Trawick)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Notice of Appearance Tue 07/17 11:12 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Laurie B. Biggs on behalf of Wayne Bailey, Inc.. (Biggs, Laurie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 12, 2018
utility Set Deadline (Private) Thu 07/12 1:07 PM
Answer due by 08/10/2018 (adi)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 11, 2018
5 5 14 pgs misc Memorandum of Law Wed 07/11 2:48 PM
Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Margaret R. Westbrook on behalf of Carmichael Farms, LLC Related [+]. (Westbrook, Margaret)
Related: [-] 4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction
4 4 motion Preliminary Injunction Wed 07/11 2:47 PM
Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Margaret R. Westbrook on behalf of Carmichael Farms, LLC. (Westbrook, Margaret)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 07/11 2:45 PM
Summons Service Executed on Wayne Bailey, Inc. 7/11/2018. filed by Margaret R. Westbrook on behalf of Carmichael Farms, LLC. (Westbrook, Margaret)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Wed 07/11 11:56 AM
Summons Issued on Wayne Bailey, Inc. Answer Due 08/10/2018 (Westbrook, Margaret)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 07/11 11:56 AM
Adversary case 18-00076 5. Complaint by Carmichael Farms, LLC against Wayne Bailey, Inc. (Fee Paid) (02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) (Westbrook, Margaret)
Related: [-]