North Carolina Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:David M Warren
Case #: 5:18-bk-00284
Case Filed:Jan 21, 2018
Terminated:Oct 13, 2023
Plan Confirmed:Oct 02, 2018

Debtor
Wayne Bailey, Inc.
PO Box 467
Chadbourn, NC 28431-0467
Represented By
Trawick H Stubbs, Jr.
Stubbs & Perdue, P.A.
contact info
Appraiser
Michael Gurkins
Auctioneer
Country Boys Auction & Realty Co. Inc.
Auctioneer
Iron Horse Auction Co., Inc.
Auctioneer
Iron Horse Auction Company, Inc.
Bankruptcy Administrator
Bankruptcy Administrator
Broker
Coldwell Banker Sea Coast Advantage
Creditor
Ally Bank
Creditor
American Express Bank, FSB
Creditor
Amur Equipment Finance, Inc.
Creditor
Axis Capital, Inc.
Creditor
Bank of the West
Creditor
Battleboro Produce, Inc.
Creditor
BB&T
Creditor
Boyette Brothers Produce, LLC
Creditor
Cape Fear Farm Credit, ACA
Creditor
Carmichael Farms, LLC
Creditor
Castellini Company LLC
Creditor
CFG Financial Services, LLC
Creditor
CNH Industrial Capital America LLC
Creditor
CNH Industrial Capital America, LLC
Creditor
Coface North America
Creditor
Diversified Financial Services, LLC
Creditor
Edwards Brothers Properties, Inc
Creditor
Financial Pacific Leasing, Inc.
Creditor
Gay Farms, Inc.
Creditor
Hanmi Bank
Creditor
Hayes Brothers Farm, Inc.
Creditor
Hayes Brothers Farms, Inc. / Joseph Hayes
Creditor
Hendrix Produce Inc.
Creditor
Henry Chancy
Creditor
International Paper
Creditor
Jimmy D. Powers
Creditor
Kornegay Family Produce, LLC
Creditor
Laurie Chancy
Creditor
Millstream Farming, LLC
Creditor
Millstream Farms, Inc.
Creditor
Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company
Creditor
Oliver Oil Company, Inc.
Creditor
Patricia Hill
Creditor
Pawnee Leasing Corporation
Creditor
Rainbow Logistics, LLC
Creditor
Rapid Capital Finance, LLC
Creditor
Roy Herring
Creditor
Savoie, Inc.
Creditor
Scott Farms, Inc.
Creditor
Seven Mile, LLC
Creditor
Southern Produce Distributors, Inc.
Creditor
Southern Roots Farming Company, LLC
Creditor
SP Funding, LLC
Creditor
Spring Acres Sales Company
Creditor
Stearns Bank N.A.
Creditor
Sullivan Farms, Inc.
Creditor
The Coastal Group, Inc
Creditor
Toyota Industries Commercial Finance, Inc.
Creditor
Trinity Frozen Foods, LLC
Creditor
Tull Hill Farms, Inc.
Creditor
United Community Bank
Creditor
Unsecured Creditors' Committee
Creditor Committee Chair
Rob Hill
Creditors' Committee
Patricia Hill
Creditors' Committee
Tull Hill Farms, Inc.
Debtor
W. E. BAILEY AND SON, INC.
Debtor
Wayne Bailey, Inc.
Interested Party
Amy Hill
Interested Party
Kendall Hill
Interested Party
Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company
Interested Party
Rick Martin
Interested Party
Rob Hill
Interested Party
SunTrust Banks, Inc.
Mediator
Benjamin A. Kahn
Officer
Adam Wooten
Officer
George G. Wooten
Officer
George Wooten III
Officer
John Sterling Cook
Other Professional
Alice Wooten
Other Professional
John Sterling Cook
Other Professional
Robert Sterling Cook Jr.
Special Counsel
Nicholls & Crampton, P.A.
Trustee
John C. Bircher III, Trustee

GPO Sep 28 2018
Order Allowing Objection to PACA Claim of Scott Farms Inc. Judge Entering Opinion: SWH (RE: related document(s)367 Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Wayne Bailey, Inc.). (Baker, Carolyn)
GPO Jan 08 2019
Order Allowing. Judge Entering Opinion: SWH (RE: related document(s)380 Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Wayne Bailey, Inc.). (Bissette, Amy)
GPO Feb 01 2019
Order Allowing Objection to Paca Claim of Kornegay Family Produce, LLC. Judge Entering Opinion: SWH (RE: related document(s)386 Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Wayne Bailey, Inc.). (Gurgone, Christy)
GPO Feb 14 2019
Order Allowing Objection to PACA Claim of Southern Roots Farming Company, LLC. Judge Entering Opinion: SWH (RE: related document(s)314 Objection to Claim filed by Creditor CFG Financial Services, LLC, 360 Objection to Claim filed by Creditor Castellini Company LLC, Creditor SP Funding, LLC, 379 Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Wayne Bailey, Inc.). (Gurgone, Christy)
GPO Sep 30 2019
Order filed in District Court on 09/27/2019, (Affirming In Part and Reversing In Part) . (Howard, Allyson)
GPO Mar 19 2020
Order filed in Circuit Court on March 19. 2020, (Dismissing) . (Howard, Allyson)

Docket last updated: 42 minutes ago
Sunday, October 15, 2023
1324 1324 court BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Mon 10/16 12:29 AM
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Notice Date 10/15/2023. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 1323
Friday, October 13, 2023
1323 1323 order Final Decree (Ch. 11) Fri 10/13 10:50 AM
Final Decree . (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-]