Belje d.d. and Fabris Perusko
Member Case
Lead case is: 1:18-bk-12104
Lead case is: 1:18-bk-12104
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 15 | |
Judge: | Martin Glenn |
Case #: | 1:18-bk-12106 |
Case Filed: | Jul 12, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jan 07, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Foreign Representative
Belje d.d.
|
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee U.S. Federal Office Building 201 Varick Street, Room 1006
New York, NY 10014 |
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Monday, January 07, 2019 | ||
misc
Close Bankruptcy Case
Mon 01/07 10:34 AM
Case Closed. (Suarez, Aurea) |
||
Friday, January 04, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Order, signed on 1/4/2019, Closing Chapter 15 Cases. (Anderson, Deanna) |
|
Friday, July 13, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Order, Signed on 7/13/2018, (I) Directing Joint Administration of Cases Under Chapter 15 of the Bankruptcy Code and (II) Authorizing Foreign Representative to File Consolidated Lists of Information Required by Bankruptcy Rule 1007(A)(4). (Anderson, Deanna) |
|
misc
Case Association - Joint Administration
Fri 07/13 3:45 PM
An order has been entered in this case directing the procedural consolidation and joint administration of the chapter 15 cases of Agrokor d.d., Agrokor Trgovina d.o.o., Belje d.d., Ledo d.d., Jamnica d.d., Konzum d.d., PIK-Vinkovci d.d., Vupik d.d., and Zvijezda d.d. The docket in Case No. 18-12104 (MG) should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. All further pleadings and other papers shall be filed in and all further docket entries shall be made in Case No. 18-12104 (MG) (Anderson, Deanna) |
||
Thursday, July 12, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Motion for Joint Administration filed by James H.M. Sprayregen on behalf of Belje d.d.. (Sprayregen, James) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Chapter 15 Petition for Recognition of Foreign Proceeding . Fee Amount $1717 Filed by James H.M. Sprayregen of Kirkland & Ellis LLP on behalf of Belje d.d.. (Sprayregen, James) |
|
crditcrd
Auto - docket of credit card
Thu 07/12 2:46 PM
Receipt of Petition for Recognition of Foreign Proceeding (Chapter 15) 18-12106 [misc,petfp15] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 12668751. Fee amount 1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
misc
Add Judge
Thu 07/12 2:48 PM
Judge Martin Glenn added to the case. (Porter, Minnie) |