New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 15
Judge:Martin Glenn
Case #: 1:18-bk-12104
Case Filed:Jul 12, 2018
Terminated:Jan 07, 2019
Last checked: never
Foreign Representative
Agrokor d.d.
Represented By
James H.M. Sprayregen
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee U.S. Federal Office Building 201 Varick Street, Room 1006
New York, NY 10014

GPO Oct 24 2018
Memorandum Opinion, Signed on 10/24/2018, Granting Recognition and Enforcement of Foreign Debtors' Settlement Agreement Within the Territorial Jurisdiction of the United States. (related document(s)30, 24) (Anderson, Deanna)

Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Monday, January 07, 2019
misc Close Bankruptcy Case Mon 01/07 10:18 AM
Case Closed. (Suarez, Aurea)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 04, 2019
38 38 order Order, Closing Chapter 15 Case Fri 01/04 2:38 PM
Order, signed on 1/4/2019, Closing Chapter 15 Cases. (Anderson, Deanna)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 28, 2018
37 37 misc Affidavit of Service Fri 12/28 3:36 PM
Affidavit of Service Related [+] Filed by Adam C Paul on behalf of Agrokor d.d.. (Paul, Adam)
Related: [-] 36 ,35
Thursday, December 20, 2018
36 36 misc Certificate of Service Thu 12/20 7:05 PM
Certificate of Service /Certification of Service Regarding Motion for Entry of an Order Closing Chapter 15 Cases and Final Status Report Related [+] Filed by Adam C Paul on behalf of Agrokor d.d.. (Paul, Adam)
Related: [-] 35
35 35 notice Notice, Proposed Order/Presentment Thu 12/20 7:02 PM
Notice of Presentment of the Foreign Representative's Motion for Entry of an Order Closing Chapter 15 Cases filed by Adam C Paul on behalf of Agrokor d.d.. with presentment to be held on 1/10/2019 at 09:00 AM at Courtroom 523 (MG) Objections due by 1/3/2019, (Paul, Adam)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 14, 2018
34 34 order Order, Recognizing Foreign Proceeding Fri 12/14 8:36 AM
Order, Signed on 12/14/2018, Granting Recognition and Enforcement of Foreign Debtors' Settlement Agreement Within the Territorial Jurisdiction of the United States. Related [+] (Anderson, Deanna)
Related: [-] 32 ,31
Friday, November 30, 2018
33 33 misc Affidavit of Service Fri 11/30 10:25 AM
Affidavit of Service Related [+] Filed by Adam C Paul on behalf of Agrokor d.d.. (Paul, Adam)
Related: [-] 32
Thursday, November 29, 2018
32 32 notice Notice, Proposed Order/Presentment Thu 11/29 3:43 PM
Notice of Proposed Order Granting Recognition and Enforcement of Foreign Debtors' Settlement Agreement Within the Territorial Jurisdiction of the United States filed by Adam C Paul on behalf of Agrokor d.d.. (Paul, Adam)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 24, 2018
31 31 55 pgs order Written Opinion Wed 10/24 12:43 PM
Memorandum Opinion, Signed on 10/24/2018, Granting Recognition and Enforcement of Foreign Debtors' Settlement Agreement Within the Territorial Jurisdiction of the United States. Related [+] (Anderson, Deanna)
Related: [-] 30 ,24
Friday, September 21, 2018
30 30 order Order, Recognizing Foreign Proceeding Fri 09/21 8:41 AM
Order, signed on 9/21/2018, Granting Petition for (I) Recognition as Foreign Main Proceedings, (II) Recognition of Foreign Representative, and (III) Related Relief Under Chapter 15 of the Bankruptcy Code. Related [+] (Anderson, Deanna)
Related: [-] 1 ,19
Tuesday, August 28, 2018
29 29 72 pgs misc Transcript Tue 09/04 3:17 PM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 08/27/18 at 10:13 AM RE: Recognition Hearing. (CC: Doc. No. 3, 4, 5, 6, 24) Marked Up Documents: 1, 3, 4, 5, 6, 13, 18, 19, 20, 21, 23, 24, 25, 26, 27. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 11/26/2018. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Veritext Legal Solutions.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.) Related [+]. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 9/4/2018. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 9/18/2018. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 9/28/2018. Transcript access will be restricted through 11/26/2018. (Cales, Humberto)
Related: [-] 5 ,18 ,13 ,23 ,27 ,3 ,4 ,19 ,21 ,24 ,26 ,25 ,1 ,20 ,6
Monday, August 27, 2018
28 28 misc Affidavit of Service Mon 08/27 2:17 PM
Affidavit of Service Related [+] Filed by Adam C Paul on behalf of Agrokor d.d.. (Paul, Adam)
Related: [-] 27
Friday, August 24, 2018
27 27 notice Notice, Agenda Fri 08/24 11:36 AM
Notice of Agenda for Hearing on August 27, 2018 filed by Adam C Paul on behalf of Agrokor d.d.. with hearing to be held on 8/27/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 523 (MG) (Paul, Adam)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 21, 2018
26 26 answer Statement Tue 08/21 3:31 PM
Statement in Support of and Reservation of Rights Regarding the Verified Petition of Fabris Perusko as Foreign Representative of Croation Insolvency Proceedings of Agrokor D.D. and Certain Affiliated Debtors filed by Eric A Schaffer on behalf of BNY Mellon Corporate Trustee Services Limited and The Bank of New York Mellon, as indenture trustees. with hearing to be held on 8/27/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 523 (MG) (Schaffer, Eric)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, August 14, 2018
25 25 misc Affidavit of Service Tue 08/14 11:56 AM
Affidavit of Service Related [+] Filed by Adam C Paul on behalf of Agrokor d.d.. (Paul, Adam)
Related: [-] 24
Monday, August 13, 2018
24 24 30+ pgs ans Memorandum of Law Mon 08/13 11:56 AM
Memorandum of Law / Brief in Further Support of Verified Petition for (I) Recognition of Foreign Main Proceedings, (II) Recognition of Foreign Representative, and (III) Related Relief Under Chapter 15 of the Bankruptcy Code filed by Adam C Paul on behalf of Agrokor d.d.. (Paul, Adam)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 30, 2018
23 23 37 pgs misc Transcript Thu 08/02 2:58 PM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 07/17/18 2:02 P.M. RE: Case Management Conference. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 10/29/2018. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Veritext Legal Solutions.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 8/6/2018. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 8/20/2018. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 8/30/2018. Transcript access will be restricted through 10/29/2018. (Su, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 27, 2018
22 22 misc Affidavit of Service Fri 07/27 10:25 AM
Affidavit of Service Related [+] Filed by Adam C Paul on behalf of Agrokor d.d.. (Paul, Adam)
Related: [-] 21
Thursday, July 26, 2018
21 21 misc Letter Thu 07/26 6:02 PM
Letter re Foreign Recognition Hearings of Agrokor Filed by James H.M. Sprayregen on behalf of Agrokor d.d.. (Sprayregen, James)
Related: [-]
20 20 misc Affidavit of Service Thu 07/26 12:25 PM
Affidavit of Service Related [+] Filed by James H.M. Sprayregen on behalf of Agrokor d.d.. (Sprayregen, James)
Related: [-] 19
Monday, July 23, 2018
19 19 order Motion, Approve Mon 07/23 2:09 PM
Order, Signed on 7/23/2018, Scheduling Recognition Hearing and Specifying Form and Manner of Service of Notice Related [+]. Hearing to be held on 8/27/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 523 (MG). (Anderson, Deanna)
Related: [-] 3
Monday, July 16, 2018
18 18 notice Notice, Hearing Mon 07/16 7:06 PM
Notice of Hearing filed by James H.M. Sprayregen on behalf of Agrokor d.d.. with hearing to be held on 7/17/2018 (check with court for location) (Sprayregen, James)
Related: [-]
17 17 order Application, Pro Hac Vice Mon 07/16 4:27 PM
Order, signed on 7/16/2018, Granting Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Adam C. Paul Related [+] . (Anderson, Deanna)
Related: [-] 8
16 16 order Application, Pro Hac Vice Mon 07/16 4:24 PM
Order, Signed on 7/16/2018, Granting Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Brad Weiland Related [+] . (Anderson, Deanna)
Related: [-] 9
15 15 order Application, Pro Hac Vice Mon 07/16 4:12 PM
Order, Signed on 7/16/18, Granting Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Whitney Fogelberg Related [+]. (Anderson, Deanna)
Related: [-] 10
14 14 misc Affidavit of Service Mon 07/16 3:30 PM
Affidavit of Service Related [+] Filed by James H.M. Sprayregen on behalf of Agrokor d.d.. (Sprayregen, James)
Related: [-] 5 ,13 ,3 ,4 ,2 ,7 ,12 ,1 ,6
Friday, July 13, 2018
13 13 notice Notice, Hearing Fri 07/13 5:45 PM
Notice of Hearing /s/ Propsed Agenda for Hearing filed by James H.M. Sprayregen on behalf of Agrokor d.d.. with hearing to be held on 7/17/2018 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 523 (MG) (Sprayregen, James)
Related: [-]
12 12 4 pgs order Motion, Joint Administration Fri 07/13 3:21 PM
Order, Signed on 7/13/2018, (I) Directing Joint Administration of Cases Under Chapter 15 of the Bankruptcy Code and (II) Authorizing Foreign Representative to File Consolidated Lists of Information Required by Bankruptcy Rule 1007(A)(4). Related [+] (Anderson, Deanna)
Related: [-] 2
11 11 notice Notice, Appearance Fri 07/13 10:07 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notices filed by Eric A Schaffer on behalf of BNY Mellon Corporate Trustee Services Limited and The Bank of New York Mellon, as indenture trustees.(Schaffer, Eric)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Thursday, July 12, 2018
10 10 motion Application, Pro Hac Vice Admission Thu 07/12 5:41 PM
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Whitney Fogelberg filed by James H.M. Sprayregen on behalf of Agrokor d.d.. (Sprayregen, James)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Application, Pro Hac Vice Admission Thu 07/12 5:40 PM
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Brad Weiland filed by James H.M. Sprayregen on behalf of Agrokor d.d.. (Sprayregen, James)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Application, Pro Hac Vice Admission Thu 07/12 5:39 PM
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Adam C. Paul filed by James H.M. Sprayregen on behalf of Agrokor d.d.. (Sprayregen, James)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice, Commencement of Chapter 15 Case Thu 07/12 5:15 PM
Notice of Commencement of Chapter 15 Case (for Recognition of a Foreign Proceeding) filed by James H.M. Sprayregen on behalf of Agrokor d.d.. (Sprayregen, James)
Related: [-]
6 6 answer Declaration Thu 07/12 5:09 PM
Declaration of Elias Ernst in Support of Verified Petition for (I) Recognition of Foreign Main Proceedings, (II) Recognition of Foreign Representative, and (III) Related Relief Under Chapter 15 of the Bankruptcy Code filed by James H.M. Sprayregen on behalf of Agrokor d.d.. (Sprayregen, James)
Related: [-]
5 5 answer Declaration Thu 07/12 5:06 PM
Declaration of Foreign Representative Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 1515 and Rule 1007(a)(4) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and in Support of Verified Petition of (I) Recognition of Foreign Main Proceedings, (II) Recognition of Foreign Representative, and (III) Related Relief Under Chapter 15 of the Bankruptcy Code filed by James H.M. Sprayregen on behalf of Agrokor d.d.. (Sprayregen, James)
Related: [-]
4 4 answer Statement Thu 07/12 4:55 PM
Statement / Verified Petition for (I) Recognition of Foreign Main Proceedings, (II) Recognition of Foreign Representative, and (III) Related Relief Under Chapter 15 of the Bankruptcy Code filed by James H.M. Sprayregen on behalf of Agrokor d.d.. (Sprayregen, James)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Motion, Approve Thu 07/12 4:39 PM
Motion to Approve / Motion for Order Scheduling Recognition Hearing and Specifying Form and Manner of Service of Notice filed by James H.M. Sprayregen on behalf of Agrokor d.d.. (Sprayregen, James)
Related: [-]
2 2 14 pgs motion Motion, Joint Administration Thu 07/12 4:22 PM
Motion for Joint Administration filed by James H.M. Sprayregen on behalf of Agrokor d.d.. (Sprayregen, James)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Petition for Recognition of Foreign Proceeding (Chapter 15) Thu 07/12 2:10 PM
Chapter 15 Petition for Recognition of Foreign Proceeding . Fee Amount $1717 Filed by James H.M. Sprayregen of Kirkland & Ellis LLP on behalf of Agrokor d.d.. (Sprayregen, James)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Thu 07/12 2:46 PM
Receipt of Petition for Recognition of Foreign Proceeding (Chapter 15) 18-12104 [misc,petfp15] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 12668751. Fee amount 1717.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #1
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Thu 07/12 5:43 PM
Receipt of Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission 18-12104 mg) [motion,122] ( 200.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 12669395. Fee amount 200.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #8
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Thu 07/12 5:43 PM
Receipt of Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission 18-12104 mg) [motion,122] ( 200.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 12669395. Fee amount 200.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #9
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Thu 07/12 5:43 PM
Receipt of Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission 18-12104 mg) [motion,122] ( 200.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 12669395. Fee amount 200.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #10