Member Case
Lead case is: 1:18-bk-12104

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 15
Judge:Martin Glenn
Case #: 1:18-bk-12108
Case Filed:Jul 12, 2018
Terminated:Jan 07, 2019
Last checked: never
Foreign Representative
Jamnica d.d.
Represented By
James H.M. Sprayregen
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee U.S. Federal Office Building 201 Varick Street, Room 1006
New York, NY 10014


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, January 07, 2019
misc Close Bankruptcy Case Mon 01/07 10:41 AM
Case Closed. (Suarez, Aurea)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 04, 2019
4 4 order Order, Closing Chapter 15 Case Fri 01/04 2:47 PM
Order, signed on 1/4/2019, Closing Chapter 15 Cases. (Anderson, Deanna)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 13, 2018
3 3 order Motion, Joint Administration Fri 07/13 3:33 PM
Order, Signed on 7/13/2018, (I) Directing Joint Administration of Cases Under Chapter 15 of the Bankruptcy Code and (II) Authorizing Foreign Representative to File Consolidated Lists of Information Required by Bankruptcy Rule 1007(A)(4). Related [+] (Anderson, Deanna)
Related: [-] 2
misc Case Association - Joint Administration Fri 07/13 3:47 PM
An order has been entered in this case directing the procedural consolidation and joint administration of the chapter 15 cases of Agrokor d.d., Agrokor Trgovina d.o.o., Belje d.d., Ledo d.d., Jamnica d.d., Konzum d.d., PIK-Vinkovci d.d., Vupik d.d., and Zvijezda d.d. The docket in Case No. 18-12104 (MG) should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. All further pleadings and other papers shall be filed in and all further docket entries shall be made in Case No. 18-12104 (MG) (Anderson, Deanna)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 12, 2018
2 2 motion Motion, Joint Administration Thu 07/12 4:24 PM
Motion for Joint Administration filed by James H.M. Sprayregen on behalf of Jamnica d.d.. (Sprayregen, James)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Petition for Recognition of Foreign Proceeding (Chapter 15) Thu 07/12 2:30 PM
Chapter 15 Petition for Recognition of Foreign Proceeding . Fee Amount $1717 Filed by James H.M. Sprayregen of Kirkland & Ellis LLP on behalf of Jamnica d.d.. (Sprayregen, James)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Thu 07/12 2:49 PM
Receipt of Petition for Recognition of Foreign Proceeding (Chapter 15) 18-12108 [misc,petfp15] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 12668772. Fee amount 1717.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #1
misc Add Judge Thu 07/12 2:48 PM
Judge Martin Glenn added to the case. (Porter, Minnie)
Related: [-]