Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Mary F Walrath
Case #: 1:18-bk-11699
Case Filed:Jul 22, 2018
Terminated:Jul 15, 2019
Plan Confirmed:Mar 18, 2019

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1,000-5,000
Est. Assets$500,000,001 to $1 billion
Est. Liabilities $100,000,001 to $500 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
The NORDAM Group, Inc.
6910 North Whirlpool Drive
Tulsa, OK 74117
Represented By
Daniel J. DeFranceschi
Richards, Layton & Finger
contact info
Megan Kenney
Richards, Layton & Finger
contact info
Natasha S. Hwangpo
Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP
contact info
Paul Noble Heath
Richards, Layton & Finger
contact info
Daniel Gwen
Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP
contact info
Brett Michael Haywood
Richards, Layton & Finger, P.A.
contact info
Ray C Schrock
Weil, Gotshal & Manges, LLP
contact info
Ryan Preston Dahl
Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP
contact info
Jill Frizzley
Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP
contact info
Last checked: Friday Jan 18, 2019 1:07 PM EST
Accountant
Grant Thornton LLP
Represented By
Brett Michael Haywood
Richards, Layton & Finger, P.A.
contact info
Attorney
Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP
Attorney
Richards, Layton & Finger, P.A.
Represented By
Brett Michael Haywood
Richards, Layton & Finger, P.A.
contact info
Claims Agent
Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC
www.epiqsystems.com 777 Third Avenue, 12th Floor
New York, NY 10017
Creditor
TN Dept of Revenue
Bankruptcy Division P.O. Box 20207
Nashville, TN 37202
Represented By
Laura L. McCloud
Tennessee Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Creditor
Hain Capital Group, LLC
301 Route 17 North 7th Floor
Rutherford, NJ 07070
Creditor
Infosys Limited
Represented By
Kevin M. Capuzzi
Benesch Friedlander Coplan & Aronoff LLP
contact info
Jennifer R. Hoover
Benesch Friedlander Coplan & Aronoff LLP
contact info
Creditor
LynxSystems, LLC
11415 E 19th St Suite A
Tulsa, OK 74128
Represented By
Wm Brad Heckenkemper
Barrow & Grimm, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Missouri Metals, LLC
Represented By
Scott J. Leonhardt
The Rosner Law Group LLC
contact info
Michael J. Lombardo
Duke, Holzman, Photiadis & Gresens LLP
contact info
Creditor
Plascore Inc.
Creditor
Public Service Company of Oklahoma dba American Electric Power
Represented By
Russell R. Johnson
Law Firm Of Russell R. Johnson Iii, PLC
contact info
John D. Demmy
Saul Ewing Arnstein & Lehr, LLP
contact info
John M. Craig
Law Firm Of Russell R. Johnson Iii, PLC
contact info
Creditor
Rohr, Inc. d/b/a Goodrich Aerostructures
Represented By
Joseph H. Huston, Jr.
Stevens & Lee
contact info
Evan B. Coren
Stevens & Lee PC
contact info
Creditor
SAP America, Inc.
Brown & Connery, LLP Donald K. Ludman, Esquire 6 N. Broad Street Suite 100
Woodbury, NJ 08096
Represented By
Donald K. Ludman
Brown & Connery LLP
contact info
Creditor
Sid Tool Company, Inc., d/b/a MSC Industrial Supply Co.
Holland & Knight LLP 10 St. James Avenue
Boston, MA 02116
Represented By
John J. Monaghan
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
Kathleen M. St. John
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
Lynne B Xerras
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
Creditor
Kollsman Inc.
Represented By
Jeffrey D. Cawdrey
Gordon & Rees LLP
contact info
Shelby A Poteet
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani
contact info
Creditor
TSS Technologies, Inc.
Represented By
Jeffrey M Hendricks
Graydon Head & Ritchey, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Tannor Partners Credit Fund, LP
555 Theodore Fremd Ave, Suite C-209
Rye, NY 10580
Creditor
Textron Aviation
Represented By
Darrell W. Clark
Stinson Morrison Hecker LLP
contact info
Adam Hiller
Hiller Law, LLC
contact info
Tracey M. Ohm
Stinson Morrison Hecker LLP
contact info
Creditor
Trinity Liquidity Group, LLC
PO Box 669
Smithtown, NY 11787
Creditor
Triumph Group, Inc.
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP 2005 Market Street Suite 2600
Philadelphia, PA 19103
Represented By
Joelle E. Polesky
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Gretchen M. Santamour
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young
contact info
Creditor
United HealthCare Services, Inc.
One Constitution Plaza
Hartford, CT 06103
Represented By
Eric S. Goldstein
Shipman & Goodwin LLP
contact info
Creditor
Vendor Recover Fund IV, LLC
PO Box 669
Smithtown, NY 11787
Creditor
Wannamaker Drive Acquisition II LLC
360 Madison Avenue 22nd Floor
New York, NY 10017
Creditor
Wells Fargo Equipment Finance, Inc., as Successor to General Electric Capital Corporation
Attn: Matthew J. Rifino, Esq. Renaissance Centre 405 N. King Street, 8th Floor
Wilmington, DE 19801
Represented By
Matthew Rifino
Mccarter & English, LLP
contact info
David A. White
Mccarter & English
contact info
Creditor
Wencor Group
Represented By
Alessandra Glorioso
Dorsey & Whitney (delaware) LLP
contact info
Natasha Wells
Dorsey & Whitney LLP
contact info
Monica L. Clark
contact info
Creditor
Green Country Aircraft
Represented By
William A. Hazeltine
Sullivan Hazeltine Allinson LLC
contact info
Creditor
Arrowhead Products
Represented By
Morton R. Branzburg
Klehr Harrison Harvey Branzburg LLP
contact info
Domenic E. Pacitti
Klehr Harrison Harvey Branzburg LLP
contact info
Creditor
Broken Arrow Electric Supply, Inc
PO Box 22105
Tulsa, OK 74121
Represented By
J Patrick Mensching
Doerner, Saunders Daniel & Anderson, LLP
contact info
Creditor
CRG Financial LLC
100 Union Avenue
Cresskill, NJ 07626
Creditor
Fiber Pad, Inc.
730 N. Post Oak Rd., Suite 100
Houston, TX 77024
Represented By
James Louis Hordern, Jr.
Timothy R. Ploch, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Constellation NewEnergy Gas Division, LLC
Represented By
Russell R. Johnson
Law Firm Of Russell R. Johnson Iii, PLC
contact info
John D. Demmy
Saul Ewing Arnstein & Lehr, LLP
contact info
John M. Craig
Law Firm Of Russell R. Johnson Iii, PLC
contact info
Creditor
Dassault Falcon Jet Corp.
Represented By
Aaron S. Applebaum
Saul Ewing Arnstein & Lehr LLP
contact info
Steven C. Reingold
Saul Ewing Arnstein & Lehr LLP
contact info
Creditor
Davis Graham & Stubbs, LLC
1550 17th Street, Suite 500
Denver, CO 80202
Represented By
Christopher Lee Richardson
Davis Graham & Stubbs LLP
contact info
Creditor
Embraer S.A.
Represented By
Jeff J. Friedman
Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP
contact info
Timothy J. Lynes
Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP
contact info
Thomas E. Healey
Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP
contact info
Creditor
Ferguson Perforating Company
Represented By
Rachel B. Mersky
Monzack Mersky Mclaughlin & Browder, PA
contact info
Brian J. McLaughlin
Monzack Mersky Mclaughlin And Browder PA
contact info
Creditor
Fair Harbor Capital, LLC
Ansonia Finance Station PO Box 237037
New York, NY 10023
Creditor Committee
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Represented By
Raffaele P Ferraioli
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Daniel J Harris
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Daniel F.X. Geoghan
Cole Schotz P.C.
contact info
Lorenzo Marinuzzi
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Jonathan I. Levine
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Norman L. Pernick
Cole Schotz P.C.
contact info
Todd M. Goren
Morrison Foerster
contact info
J. Kate Stickles
Cole Schotz P.C.
contact info
Interested Party
MidFirst Bank
Represented By
Chantelle D'nae McClamb
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
William H. Hoch, III
Crowe & Dunlevy
contact info
Interested Party
Gulfstream Aerospace Corporation
Represented By
Stephen M. Miller
Morris James LLP
contact info
Taejin Kim
King & Spalding LLP
contact info
Sarah R. Borders
King & Spalding LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Bradford Capital Management, LLC
Interested Party
Flame Spray Inc
Interested Party
United Technologies Corp., Pratt & Whitney Canada Corp., Pratt & Whitney Canada Distribution USA, LLC
Represented By
Joseph H. Huston, Jr.
Stevens & Lee
contact info
John F. Lynch
Wachtell Lipton Rosen & Katz
contact info
Douglas K Mayer
Wachtell, Lipton, Rosen & Katz
contact info
Phillip Mindlin
Wachtell, Lipton, Rosen & Katz
contact info
Neil K. Chatani
Wachtell Lipton Rosen & Katz
contact info
Neil M. Snyder
Wachtell, Lipton, Rosen & Katz
contact info
Angela K. Herring
Wachtell Lipton Rosen & Katz
contact info
Emil A. Kleinhaus
Wachtell Lipton Rosen & Katz
contact info
Interested Party
United States of America
Represented By
Leah Victoria Lerman
Us Department Of Justice
contact info
Interested Party
CEM Defense Materials, LLC
Represented By
Gregory Joseph Flasser
Bayard, P.A.
contact info
Robert M. Schechter
Porzio Bromberg & Newman P.C.
contact info
Justin R. Alberto
Bayard, P.A.
contact info
Interested Party
CITIBANK, N.A.
Represented By
Jeffrey T. Mispagel
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Keith A. Simon
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Interested Party
TnT Machine, Inc.
Represented By
Eric J. Monzo
Morris James LLP
contact info
Edward J Nazar
Hinkle Law Firm LLC
contact info
Interested Party
The Johns Hopkins University
Represented By
E. Bernard Justis
The John Hopkins University
contact info
Interested Party
Cherokee Partners, L.L.C., Eight Partners, LLC, East Plant Investment, L.L.C., and East Plant Holding, L.L.C.
Represented By
Maris J. Kandestin
Dla Piper Llp (us)
contact info
R. Craig Martin
contact info
Richard A. Chesley
Dla Piper Llp (us)
contact info
Kaitlin MacKenzie Edelman
Dla Piper Llp (us)
contact info
Interested Party
Coast Composites, LLC
Represented By
Michael S. Neiburg
Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Concur Technologies, Inc.
Represented By
Donald K. Ludman
Brown & Connery LLP
contact info
Interested Party
TR Capital Management LLC
Interested Party
JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A.
Represented By
David Baruch
Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP
contact info
Christopher M. Winter
Duane Morris LLP
contact info
Michael R. Lastowski
Duane Morris LLP
contact info
Elisha D. Graff
Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP
contact info
Jarret P. Hitchings
Duane Morris LLP
contact info
Nicholas Baker
Simpson Thacher & Barlett LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Cytec Engineered Materials Ltd.
Represented By
Gregory Joseph Flasser
Bayard, P.A.
contact info
Robert M. Schechter
Porzio Bromberg & Newman P.C.
contact info
Justin R. Alberto
Bayard, P.A.
contact info
Interested Party
Cytec Engineered Materials, Inc.
Represented By
Gregory Joseph Flasser
Bayard, P.A.
contact info
Robert M. Schechter
Porzio Bromberg & Newman P.C.
contact info
Justin R. Alberto
Bayard, P.A.
contact info
Interested Party
Rocky Point Claims LLC
P.O. Box 165
Norwalk, CT 06853
Interested Party
LMI Aerospace Washington DBA Valent Aerostructures
Represented By
Stephen J. Astringer
Polsinelli PC
contact info
Shanti M. Katona
Polsinelli PC
contact info
Matthew S Layfield
Polsinelli PC
contact info
Interested Party
LMI Aerospace, Inc.
Represented By
Stephen J. Astringer
Polsinelli PC
contact info
Shanti M. Katona
Polsinelli PC
contact info
Matthew S Layfield
Polsinelli PC
contact info
Interested Party
Milann H. Siegfried, Robin M. Siegfried, Cherrie L. Siegfried, Theodore H. Siegfried, Meredith S. Madden, Milannie S. Williams, Jude T. Siegfried, Bailey J. Siegfried & Raegen H. Siegfried
Represented By
Maris J. Kandestin
Dla Piper Llp (us)
contact info
R. Craig Martin
contact info
Richard A. Chesley
Dla Piper Llp (us)
contact info
Kaitlin M Edelman
Dla Piper Llp(us)
contact info
Other Prof.
Huron Consulting Services LLC
Other Prof.
Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC
Other Prof.
Guggenheim Securities, LLC
Transcriber
Wilcox & Fetzer, LTD.
1330 King St
Wilmington, DE 19801
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801
Represented By
Juliet M. Sarkessian
U.S. Trustee'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 49 minutes ago
Thursday, August 08, 2019
1273 1273 claims Records Transmittal & Receipt - SF135 Thu 08/08 11:10 AM
Records Transmittal & Receipt - SF135. Filed by Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC. (Persaud, Tony)
Related: [-]