Member Case
Lead case is: 1:18-bk-11699

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Mary F Walrath
Case #: 1:18-bk-11702
Case Filed:Jul 22, 2018
Terminated:Jul 15, 2019

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1,000-5,000
Est. Assets$500,000,001 to $1 billion
Est. Liabilities $100,000,001 to $500 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
PartPilot LLC
6910 Whirlpool Dr
Tulsa, OK 74117-1305
Represented By
Daniel J. DeFranceschi
Richards, Layton & Finger
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801


Docket last updated: 5 minutes ago
Monday, July 15, 2019
10 10 order Final Decree Mon 07/15 9:45 AM
Final Decree (I) Closing the Chapter 11 Cases and (II) Granting Related Relief Signed on 7/15/2019 (LMC)
Related: [-]
court Close Bankruptcy Case Mon 07/15 1:26 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (BJM)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 10, 2018
9 9 misc Amended Schedules/Statements - Jointly Administered Entity Mon 12/10 7:55 PM
Amended Schedules/Statements - Jointly Administered Entity filed: , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. //Notice of Filing Amendments to Statement of Financial Affairs Filed by PartPilot LLC. (Kenney, Megan)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Amended Schedules/Statements - Jointly Administered Entity Mon 12/10 7:52 PM
Amended Schedules/Statements - Jointly Administered Entity filed: Sch A-B, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. //Notice of Filing Amendments to Schedule A/B (Assets - Real and Personal Property) Filed by PartPilot LLC. (Kenney, Megan)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 21, 2018
7 7 misc Schedules/Statements Fri 09/21 6:39 PM
[SEALED] Schedules/Statements filed: , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. (SEALED) Filed by PartPilot LLC. (Haywood, Brett)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Schedules/Statements Fri 09/21 6:38 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. (REDACTED) Filed by PartPilot LLC. (Haywood, Brett)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Schedules/Statements Fri 09/21 6:37 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. Filed by PartPilot LLC. (Haywood, Brett)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 24, 2018
4 4 order Order-Joint Admin Tue 07/24 11:05 AM
Order Authorizing the Joint Administration of the Debtors' Chapter 11 Cases. An order has been entered in this case directing the procedural consolidation and joint administration of the chapter 11 cases of The NORDAM Group, Inc., Nacelle Manufacturing 1 LLC, Nacelle Manufacturing 23 LLC, PartPilot LLC, and TNG DISC Inc. The docket in Case No. 18-11699 (MFW) should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. Signed on 7/24/2018 (LMC)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 23, 2018
3 3 crditcrd none Mon 07/23 12:06 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 18-11702 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt Number 8947193, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
court Case Assigned Mon 07/23 7:52 AM
Judge Mary F. Walrath added to case (LB)
Related: [-]
Sunday, July 22, 2018
2 2 motion Joint Administration - Motion (Multi) Sun 07/22 11:52 PM
Motion for Joint Administration Filed by The NORDAM Group, Inc.. (DeFranceschi, Daniel)
Related: [-]
1 1 25 pgs misc RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Sun 07/22 11:42 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1717. Filed by PartPilot LLC. (DeFranceschi, Daniel)
Related: [-]