Original Case: 1:11-cv-00691

Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:18-cv-02191
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Case Filed:Jul 26, 2018
Terminated:Mar 04, 2021
Last checked: Friday Mar 05, 2021 4:31 AM EST
Defendant
Delfin Leonidas Payagu Payaguaje
Defendant
Jose Gabriel Revelo Llore
Defendant
Maria Clelia Reascos Revelo
Defendant
Maria Magdalena Rodri Barcenes
Defendant
Jose Miguel Ipiales Chicaiza
Defendant
Heleodoro Pataron Guaraca
Defendant
Luisa Delia Tanguila Narvaez
Defendant
Lourdes Beatriz Chimbo Tanguil
Defendant
Maria Hortencia Viver Cusangua
Defendant
Segundo Angel Amanta Milan
Defendant
Octavio Ismael Cordova Huanca
Defendant
Elias Roberto Piyahua Payahuaje
Defendant
Daniel Carlos Lusitand Yaiguaje
Defendant
Benancio Fredy Chimbo Grefa
Defendant
Guillermo Vicente Payagua Lusitante
Defendant
Rosa Teresa Chimbo Tanguila
Defendant
Alfredo Donaldo Payagua Payaguaje
Defendant
Miguel Mario Payaguaje Payaguaje
Defendant
Teodoro Gonzalo Piaguaj Payaguaje
Defendant
Fermin Piaguaje Payaguaje
Defendant
Reinaldo Lusitande Yaiguaje
Defendant
Luis Agustin Payagua Piaguaje
Defendant
Emilio Martin Lusitand Yaiguaje
Defendant
Simon Lusitande Yaiguaje
Defendant
Armando Wilfrido Piagua Payaguaje
Defendant
Angel Justino Piaguag Lucitant
Defendant
Hugo Gerardo Camacho Naranjo
Defendant
Javier Piaguaje Payaguaje
Defendant
Luis Armando Chimbo Yumbo
Defendant
Lidia Alexandra Aguin Aguinda
Defendant
Lucio Enrique Grefa Tanguila
Defendant
Pablo Fajardo Mendoza
Defendant
Luis Yanza
Defendant
Frente de Defensa De La Amazonia, AKA Amazon Defense Front
Defendant
Selva Viva Selviva CIA, Ltda
Defendant
Maria Aguinda Salazar
Defendant
Carlos Grefa Huatatoca
Defendant
Catalina Antonia Aguinda Salazar
Defendant
Patricio Alberto Chimbo Yumbo
Defendant
Clide Ramiro Aguinda Agunida
Defendant
Narcisa Aida Tanguila Narvaez
Defendant
Franciso Victor Tanguill Grefa
Defendant
Gloria Lucrecia Tangui Grefa
Defendant
Bertha Antonia Yumbo Tanguila
Defendant
Beatriz Mercedes Grefa Tanguila
Defendant
Lorenzo Jose Alvarado Yumbo
Defendant
Olga Gloria Grefa Cerda
Defendant
Francisco Alvarado Yumbo
Defendant
Francisco Matias Alvarado Yumbo
Defendant
Celia Irene Viveros Cusangua
Defendant
Patricio Wilson Aguinda Agunida
Defendant-Counter-Claimant
Donziger & Associates, PLLC
Defendant-Counter-Claimant
The Law Offices of Steven R. Donziger
Defendant-Counter-Claimant
Ann Maest
Defendant-Counter-Claimant
Douglas Beltman
Defendant-Counter-Claimant
Stratus Consulting, Inc.
Defendant-Counter-Claimant - Appellant
Steven Robert Donziger
Represented By
Steven R. Donziger
Donziger and Associates
contact info
Defendant-Counter-Claimant - Appellant
Steven R. Donziger
Represented By
Steven R. Donziger
Donziger and Associates
contact info
Plaintiff-Counter-Defendant - Appellee
Chevron Corporation
Represented By
Thomas G. Hungar
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Andrea Ellen Neuman
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Randy Michael Mastro
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
William Edward Thomson III
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info

GPO Mar 04 2021
OPINION, affirming the district courtâ??s amended judgment awarding costs to Chevron. Affirming in part and reversing in part the district courtâ??s contempt finding and vacating the supplemental judgment awarding Chevron $666,476.34 in compensatory sanctions. Vacating the supplemental judgment awarding attorneysâ?? fees and remanding to the district court to determine the fees reasonably expended to secure the contempt findings affirmed on appeal, by DJ, GEL, RJS (dissenting), FILED.[3048723] [18-855, 18-2191, 19-1584]
GPO Mar 04 2021
OPINION, Dissenting, by RJS, FILED.[3048731] [18-855, 18-2191, 19-1584]

Docket last updated: 05/17/2021 12:12 AM EDT
Thursday, July 26, 2018
1 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Steven R. Donziger, FILED. [2354322] 18-2191 [Entered: 07/27/2018 11:18 AM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax
Att: 2 351 pgs Case FILED
2 2 1 pgs DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 06/25/2018, RECEIVED.[2354333] 18-2191 [Entered: 07/27/2018 11:21 AM]
Related: [-]
3 3 30+ pgs DISTRICT COURT OPINION, dated 06/27/2018, RECEIVED.[2354334] 18-2191 [Entered: 07/27/2018 11:22 AM]
Related: [-]
4 4 2 pgs DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 07/23/2018, RECEIVED.[2354336] 18-2191 [Entered: 07/27/2018 11:23 AM]
Related: [-]
5 5 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2354337] 18-2191 [Entered: 07/27/2018 11:24 AM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed
Att: 2 350 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED