Sweet v. QK Healthcare, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-30077
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-30077
Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Daniel S Oppermanflint |
Case #: | 4:18-ap-03059 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Jul 31, 2018 |
Terminated: | Nov 27, 2018 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
QK Healthcare, Inc.
35 Sawgrass Drive Suite 3
Bellport, NY 11713 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Samuel D. Sweet
P.O. Box 757
Ortonville, MI 48462 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/02/2024 1:08 PM EDT |
Tuesday, November 27, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
order
Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (Compromise)
Tue 11/27 11:25 AM
Upon Entry of the Order Approving the Application to Compromise in the Bankruptcy Case Entered on 11/27/18, this Adversary Proceeding is Dismissed Without Prejudice. So Ordered by /s/ Judge Daniel S. Opperman. (kcm) |
|
11 | 11
court
Copy of
Tue 11/27 11:22 AM
Copy of: Order Approving Trustee's Motion For Approval To Compromise The Estate's Claim With QK Healthcare, Inc. (entered in debtor's bankruptcy) (kcm) |
|
utility
Disposition of Adversary
Tue 11/27 11:26 AM
Disposition of Adversary 4:18-ap-3059 : Settled. (kcm) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Tue 11/27 11:27 AM
Adversary Case 4:18-ap-3059 Closed. (kcm) |
||
Tuesday, November 06, 2018 | ||
court
Minute Entry. Order to Show Cause Dissolved
Tue 11/06 12:25 PM
Minute Entry. Order to Show Cause Dissolved. Motion to approve compromise under rule 9019 filed in parent case. (JAM) |
||
Friday, October 19, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
order
Show Cause
Fri 10/19 9:23 AM
Order To Show Cause For Lack Of Progress And Prosecution - Show Cause hearing to be held on 11/07/2018 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom, Flint, 226 West Second St. (Mum, J) |
|
Tuesday, October 02, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
court
Clerk's Entry of Default
Tue 10/02 8:43 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default of QK Healthcare, Inc. - Default Judgment Motion due by 10/16/2018. (Mum, J) |
|
Friday, August 24, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Certificate of Service
Fri 08/24 10:18 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Samuel D. Sweet . (Sweet, Samuel) |
|
7 | 7
order
Extend (Sua Sponte)
Fri 08/24 8:49 AM
Order Extending Answer Deadline - Extended to 09/29/2018 . (Mum, J) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Stipulation
Fri 08/24 7:43 AM
Stipulation By and Between Samuel D. Sweet & Gregory F. Fischer Re: Stipulation Extending Answer Deadline . Filed by Plaintiff Samuel D. Sweet. (Sweet, Samuel) |
|
Wednesday, August 01, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
cmp
Amended Complaint
Wed 08/01 9:22 AM
Amended Complaint CORRECTED by Samuel D. Sweet on behalf of Samuel D. Sweet against QK Healthcare, Inc.. . (Sweet, Samuel) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Sheet | ||
4 | 4
court
Deficiency Notice (AP)
Wed 08/01 8:52 AM
Notice of Deficient Pleading: Electronic Signature in Incorrect Format (ECF Procedure 11 d-1) - Corrected Electronic Signature due on 08/08/2018. (Mum, J) |
|
Tuesday, July 31, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Tue 07/31 1:58 PM
Summons Service Executed on QK Healthcare, Inc. 7/31/2018 (Sweet, Samuel) |
|
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued (auto)
Tue 07/31 1:50 PM
Summons Issued on QK Healthcare, Inc. Answer Due 08/30/2018 (Sweet, Samuel) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 07/31 1:50 PM
Adversary case 18-03059 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)): Complaint by Samuel D. Sweet against QK Healthcare, Inc.. Receipt Number DEFERRED, Fee Amount of $ 350 is Deferred. (Sweet, Samuel) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Sheet |