Parks v. Ainsworth Pet Nutrition, LLC
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Louis L Stanton |
Case #: | 1:18-cv-06936 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 28:1332ct Diversity-(Citizenship) |
Case Filed: | Aug 01, 2018 |
Terminated: | Feb 21, 2020 |
Last checked: Monday Jan 28, 2019 4:25 AM EST |
Defendant
Ainsworth Pet Nutrition, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Markeith Parks
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/29/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, June 02, 2020 | ||
52 | 52
appeal
USCA Mandate
Tue 06/02 2:02 PM
MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to51 Notice of Appeal filed by Markeith Parks USCA Case Number 20-1042 The parties in the above-referenced case have filed a stipulation withdrawing this appeal pursuant to FRAP 42. The stipulation is hereby "So Ordered". Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 6/2/2020. (tp) |
|
appeal
Transmission of USCA Mandate/Order to District Judge
Tue 06/02 2:03 PM
Transmission of USCA Mandate/Order to the District Judge re:52 USCA Mandate. (tp) |