Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:14-bk-10745

Tennessee Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Shelley D Rucker
Case #: 1:18-ap-01029
Nature of Suit1 null
Case Filed:Aug 13, 2018
Terminated:Mar 06, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Casey Family Partnership of Emma P. Casey
920 McCallie Avenue
Chattanooga, TN 37403
Represented By
F. Scott LeRoy
Leroy Hurst & Cromie, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Lynn Casey
920 McCallie Avenue
Chattanooga, TN 37403
Represented By
F. Scott LeRoy
Leroy Hurst & Cromie, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Elizabeth Casey, individually, jointly and severally d/b/a Casey Family Partnership
920 McCallie Avenue
Chattanooga, TN 37403
Represented By
F. Scott LeRoy
Leroy Hurst & Cromie, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
American River Development, LLC
920 McCallie Avenue
Chattanooga, TN 37403
Represented By
F. Scott LeRoy
Leroy Hurst & Cromie, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
James L Henry
412 Broad Street
Chattanooga, TN 37402
Represented By
James L Henry
contact info

GPO Mar 13 2019
Memorandum Opinion. SDR (RE: related document(s)58 Motion to Reconsider filed by Counter-Defendant James L Henry, Plaintiff James L Henry). (cfy)
GPO May 17 2019
Order and Memorandum Opinion. SDR (RE: related document(s)65 Motion for Remand filed by Counter-Defendant James L Henry, Plaintiff James L Henry). The Motion to Abstain from Adversary Proceeding and Remand to State Court is DENIED. (mnj)
GPO Nov 16 2020
Memorandum and Order. SDR (RE: related document(s)127 Scheduling Order adjourned until further order of the Court, 132 Order to Set Hearing adjourned until further order of the Court, 138 Motion granted to Extend Time filed by Counter-Claimant Jerrold D. Farinash, Intervenor-Defendant Jerrold D. Farinash. The Chapter 7 Trustee will file any responding papers within 30 days of entry of this Order, 139 Motion granted to Continue/Reschedule Trial Date filed by Counter-Claimant Jerrold D. Farinash, Intervenor-Defendant Jerrold D. Farinash). The Court will adjourn the trial date and associated deadlines in Adv. No. 18-1044 as well. (cfy)
GPO Feb 09 2021
Memorandum and Order by SDR (RE: related document(s)135 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Counter-Defendant James L Henry, Plaintiff James L Henry). This order grants 135. (cfy)
GPO Mar 31 2022
Memorandum Opinion. SDR (RE: related document(s)175 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Counter-Defendant James L Henry, Plaintiff James L Henry). (cfy)

Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 1:11 PM EDT
Monday, March 06, 2023
220 220 court Close Adversary Case Mon 03/06 8:19 AM
Adversary Case 1:18-ap-1029 Closed. (cfy)
Related: [-]
utility Disposition of Adversary Mon 03/06 8:16 AM
Disposition of Adversary 1:18-ap-1029. (cfy)
Related: [-]