Cambridge Valley Machining, Inc. v. Hudson MFG LLC
New York Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Christian F Hummel |
Referred: | Christian F Hummel |
Case #: | 1:18-cv-01022 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Aug 24, 2018 |
Terminated: | Oct 14, 2020 |
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 20, 2019 4:11 AM EST |
Counter Claimant
Lauren Hudson
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
Billie Hudson III
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
Hudson MFG LLC
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Cambridge Valley Machining, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Hudson MFG LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Lauren Hudson
302 Deepwood Dr.
Georgetown, TX 78628 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Billie Hudson III
302 Deepwood Dr.
Georgetown, TX 78628 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cambridge Valley Machining, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, February 03, 2021 | ||
102 | 102
order
Stipulation and Order
Wed 02/03 10:41 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 2/3/2021. (tab) |
|
101 | 101
appeal
USCA Mandate
Wed 02/03 9:59 AM
MANDATE of USCA [Issued on 02/03/2021] as to97 Notice of Appeal, filed by Hudson Standard LLC, Lauren Hudson, Hudson MFG LLC, Billie Hudson III: The parties in this case have filed a stipulation withdrawing this appeal pursuant to FRAP 42. The stipulation is hereby "So Ordered". (hmr) |
|
appeal
USCA Case Number
Wed 02/03 10:02 AM
USCA Case Number 20-3885 for97 Notice of Appeal, filed by Hudson Standard LLC, Lauren Hudson, Hudson MFG LLC, Billie Hudson III. (hmr) |
||
Tuesday, February 02, 2021 | ||
100 | 100
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 02/02 10:41 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Cambridge Valley Machining, Inc. submitted to Judge Christian F. Hummel. (Shaw, Adam) |
|
Monday, February 01, 2021 | ||
99 | 99
notice
Notice - Other
Mon 02/01 4:52 PM
NOTICE by Cambridge Valley Machining, Inc. re95 Judgment,, Satisfaction of Judgment (Shaw, Adam) |