O'Connor Hospital Foundation
Member Case
Lead case is: 2:18-bk-20151
Lead case is: 2:18-bk-20151
California Central Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Sheri Bluebond |
Case #: | 2:18-bk-20179 |
Case Filed: | Aug 31, 2018 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
O'Connor Hospital Foundation
2105 Forest Ave
San Jose, CA 95128-1425 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 minutes ago |
Friday, September 15, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
court
Case Reassigned - Admin Order Reassigning Judge Only (batch)
Fri 09/15 10:56 AM
In accordance with the Administrative Order 23 - 07 dated 07/28/2023, this case is hereby reassigned from Judge Ernest M. Robles to Judge Sheri Bluebond. (LL2) |
|
Friday, September 27, 2019 | ||
court
X - Receipt Number and Filing Fee (Generic) (Auto - CR/ECF)(Retired)
Fri 09/27 9:30 PM
Receipt of Certification Fee - $11.00 by 20. Receipt Number 20237420. (admin) |
||
Wednesday, October 17, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
![]() Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Official Form 2030) Filed by Debtor O'Connor Hospital Foundation . (Maizel, Samuel) |
|
Monday, October 15, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
![]() Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual Filing for Bankruptcy (Official Form 107 or 207) Filed by Debtor O'Connor Hospital Foundation . (Moyron, Tania) |
|
12 | 12
![]() Schedule A/B Non-Individual: Property (Official Form 106A/B or 206A/B) , Schedule D Non-Individual: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Official Form 106D or 206D) , Schedule E/F Non-Individual: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Official Form 106F or 206F) , Schedule G Non-Individual: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Official Form 106G or 206G) , Schedule H Non-Individual: Your Codebtors (Official Form 106H or 206H) , Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individual (Official Form 106Sum or 206Sum) , Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Official Form 202) Filed by Debtor O'Connor Hospital Foundation . (Moyron, Tania) |
|
Friday, September 14, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
![]() List of Equity Security Holders O'Connor Hospital Foundation Filed by Debtor O'Connor Hospital Foundation . (Moe, John) |
|
Tuesday, September 04, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration (BNC-PDF) on Lead Case 2:18-bk-20151 with Member Case 2:18-bk-20179. LEAD CASE: Verity Health System of California, Inc., Case No. 2:18-bk-20151-ER. An order has been entered in this case directing the procedural consolidation and joint administration of the Chapter 11 cases of Saint Louise Regional Hospital (Case No. 2:18-bk-20162-ER), Verity Holdings, LLC (Case No. 2:18-bk-20163-ER), St. Vincent Medical Center (Case No. 2:18-bk-20164-ER), St. Francis Medical Center (Case No. 2:18-bk-20165-ER), Seton Medical Center (Case No. 2:18-bk-20167-ER), OConnor Hospital (Case No. 2:18-bk-20168-ER), Verity Medical Foundation (Case No. 2:18-bk-20169-ER), St. Vincent Dialysis Center, Inc. (Case No. 2:18-bk-20171-ER), Saint Louise Regional Hospital Foundation (Case No. 2:18-bk-20172-ER), Verity Business Services (Case No. 2:18-bk-20173-ER), Seton Medical Center Foundation (Case No. 2:18-bk-20175-ER), De Paul Ventures, LLC (Case No. 2:18-bk-20176-ER), St. Francis Medical Center of Lynwood Medical Foundation (Case No. 2:18-bk-20178-ER), OConnor Hospital Foundation (Case No. 2:18-bk-20179-ER), St. Vincent Foundation (Case No. 2:18-bk-20180-ER), and De Paul Ventures San Jose Dialysis, LLC (Case No. 2:18-bk-20181-ER). The docket in Case No. 2:18-bk-20151-ER should be consulted for all matters affecting these cases. Signed on 9/4/2018. (Lomeli, Lydia R.) |
|
Friday, August 31, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Case Commencement Deficiency Notice (BNC) (Lomeli, Lydia R.) |
|
4 | 4
![]() Notice of Case Deficiency Under 11 U.S.C. Sec. 521(a)(1) and Bankruptcy Rule 1007 (BNC) (Lomeli, Lydia R.) |
|
3 | 3
![]() Notice of Dismissal of Case If Required Documents Are Not Filed Within 72 Hours (BNC) . Master Mailing List of Creditors to be uploaded in CM/ECF. Incomplete filing due 9/4/18. (Lomeli, Lydia R.) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Motion for Joint Administration Debtors Ex Parte Emergency Motion For Entry Of An Order For Joint Administration Of Cases; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities; Declaration Of Richard G. Adcock Filed by Debtor O'Connor Hospital Foundation (Moe, John) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1717 Filed by O'Connor Hospital Foundation (Moe, John) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Fri 08/31 12:55 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(2:18-bk-20179) [misc,volp11] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 47630251. Fee amount 1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
court
U - Assigned Judge to a case (Manual)
Fri 08/31 1:35 PM
Judge Ernest M. Robles added to case due to related case 2:18-bk-20151-ER. (Fleming, Lachelle) |
||
misc
Set Case Commencement Deficiency Deadlines (def/deforco)
Fri 08/31 9:05 PM
Set Case Commencement Deficiency Deadlines (def/deforco) List of Equity Security Holders due 9/14/2018. Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 9/14/2018. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 9/14/2018. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 9/14/2018. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 9/14/2018. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 9/14/2018. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 9/14/2018. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 9/14/2018. Incomplete Filings due by 9/14/2018. (Lomeli, Lydia R.) |
||
misc
Set Case Commencement Deficiency Deadlines (ccdn)
Fri 08/31 9:06 PM
Set Case Commencement Deficiency Deadlines (ccdn) Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Form 2030) due 9/14/2018. (Lomeli, Lydia R.) |