Verity Health System of California, Inc.
California Central Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Sheri Bluebond |
Case #: | 2:18-bk-20151 |
Case Filed: | Aug 31, 2018 |
Plan Confirmed: | Aug 14, 2020 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 100-199 |
Est. Assets | $500,000,001 to $1 billion |
Est. Liabilities | $500,000,001 to $1 billion |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Verity Health System of California, Inc.
2040 E. Mariposa Avenue
El Segundo, CA 90245 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: Friday Jan 18, 2019 10:00 AM PST |
Attorney
Alicia Berry
Deputy Attorney General 300 South Spring St Ste 1702
Los Angeles, CA 90013 |
Represented By
|
Attorney
Dentons US LLP
601 South Figueroa Street, Suite 2500
Los Angeles, CA 90017 |
|
Attorney
Milbank, Tweed, Hadley & Mccloy
2029 Century Park East, 33rd Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90067 |
|
Attorney
Kevin Morse
|
|
Attorney
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
|
Represented By
|
Attorney
David M Powlen
|
|
Attorney
Christopher Rivas
Reed Smith 355 South Grand Ave Ste 2900
Los Angeles, CA 90071 |
|
Attorney
Michael A Sweet
345 California St Ste 2200
San Francisco, CA 94104 |
|
Attorney
Jade M Williams
|
|
Creditor
ALLY BANK
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Abbott Laboratories Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Aetna Life Insurance Company
333 S. Grand Avenue 46th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90071 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
American National Red Cross
2025 E Street NW
Washington, DC 20006 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Angeles IPA A Medical Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
AppleCare Medical Group
Shipman & Goodwin LLP One Constitution Plaza
Hartford, CT 06103 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
AppleCare Medical Group, Inc.
Shipman & Goodwin LLP One Constitution Plaza
Hartford, CT 06103 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
AppleCare Medical Management, LLC
Shipman & Goodwin LLP One Constitution Plaza
Hartford, CT 06103 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Asahi Intecc USA Inc
|
|
Creditor
BDO USA, LLP, a California corporation
|
|
Creditor
Bay Area Surgical Management, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Belfor USA Group, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
C. R. Bard, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
CHHP Holdings II, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
CPH Hospital Management, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
California Department of Health Care Services
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
California Nurses Association
155 Grand Avenue
Oakland, CA 94612 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
California Physicians' Service dba Blue Shield of California
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
California Statewide Communities Development Authority
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Care 1st Health Plan
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Center for Dermatology, Cosmetic and Laser Surgery
Wendel, Rosen, Black & Dean 1111 Broadway 24th Fl
Oakland, CA 94607 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Cerner Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Cochlear corporation dba Cochlear Americas
|
|
Creditor
County of San Mateo
400 County Center
Redwood City, CA 94063 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Delta Dental of California
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Ecolab Institutional
655 Loan Oak Drive
Eagan, MN 55121 |
|
Creditor
Eladh, L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Refugio Estrada
11620 Wilshire Blvd. #900
Los Angeles, CA 90025 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Experian Health fka Passport Health Communications Inc
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Experian Health, Inc
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
FTG Builders Inc
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Federal Communications Commission
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
GE HFS, LLC
Kutak Rock LLP 1650 Farnam Street
Omaha, NE 68102 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Gardena Hospital L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Golden GatePerfusion Inc
50 Osgood Place 5th Fl
San Francisco, CA 94133 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Health Net of California, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Healthcare Transformation Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Humana Inc and its affiliates
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Hunt Spine Institute, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Infor (US), Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Aida Iniguez
100 N. Brand Blvd. #3
Glendale, CA 91203 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Francisco Iniguez
100 N. Brand Blvd. #3
Glendale, CA 91203 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
KForce, Inc.
Shumaker, Loop & Kendrick, LLP c/o Steven Berman 101 E. Kennedy Blvd, Suite 2800
Tampa, FL 33602 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Kaiser Foundation Hospitals
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Long Beach Memorial Medical Center
Stradling Yocca Carlson & Rauth, P.C. 100 Wilshire Boulevard, 4th Floor
Santa Monica, CA 90401 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
MGH Painting, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Medecision, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Medline Industries, Inc.
Arent Fox LLP c/o M. Douglas Flahaut 555 West 5th Street, 48th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90013 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Medtronic USA, Inc.
|
|
Creditor
NFS Leasing Inc
Devaney Pate Morris & Cameron LLP c/o Lesley A Riis 402 W Broadway Ste 1300
San Diego, CA 92101 |
|
Creditor
NTT DATA Services Holding Corporation
1801 S. Mopac Expressway Suite 320
Austin, TX 78746 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Nantworks, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
National Union of Healthcare Workers
5801 Christie Ave, Suite 525
Emeryville, CA 94608 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Noble Williams
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
O'Connor Building LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
O'Connor Health Center 1, a California Limited Partnership
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
OCH Forest 1, General Partner of O'Connor Health Center 1, a limited partnership
Kornfield Nyberg Bendes Kuhner & Little 1970 Broadway, Suite 600
Oakland, CA 94612 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Old Republic Insurance Company, et al
307 North Michigan Avenue, 15th Floor
Chicago, IL 60601 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Oracle America, Inc.
Buchalter, A Professional Corporation c/o Shawn M. Christianson 55 2nd St. 17th Fl.
San Francisco, CA 94105 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Otsuka Pharmaceutical Development & Commercialization, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Packard Children's Health Alliance
Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP Matthew S. Walker, Esq. 12255 El Camino Real, Suite 300
San Diego, CA 92130 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Paragon Mechanical, Inc.
70 S. First Street
San Jose, CA 95113 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Premier, Inc.
Stradling Yocca Carlson & Rauth 100 Wilshire Boulevard 4th Floor
Santa Monica, CA 90401 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Retirement Plan for Hospital Employees
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
RightSourcing, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Josefina Robles
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Roche Diagnostics Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Royal West Development, Inc.
543 Pine Street
Hermosa Beach, CA 90254 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
SEIU United Healthcare Workers - West
1001 Marina Village Parkway Suite 200
Alameda, CA 94501 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
San Jose Medical Group, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Schwalb Consulting, Inc.
Schwalb Consulting, Inc. 26 Valley View
Irvine, CA 92612 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Shared Imaging, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Sharp Electronics Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Smith & Nephew, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
SmithGroup, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Sodexo, Inc.
JD Thompson Law c/o Judy D Thompson Esq PO Box 33127
Charlotte, NC 28233 |
|
Creditor
Southeast Medical Center, LLC and Slauson Associates of Huntington Park, LLC
2029 Century Park East Suite 800
Los Angeles, CA 90067 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
SpecialtyCare Cardiovascular Resources, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Sports, Orthopedic and Rehabilitation Associates
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
St. Francis Inc.
One Constitution Plaza
Hartford, CT 06103 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
St. Vincent IPA Medical Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Stanford Blood Center, LLC
Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP Matthew S. Walker, Esq. 12255 El Camino Real, Suite 300
San Diego, CA 92130 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Stanford Health Care
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Stanford Health Care Advantage
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Stationary Engineers Local 39
1001 Marina Village Parkway Suite 200
Alameda, CA 94501 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Stationary Engineers Local 39 Health and Welfare Trust Fund
1001 Marina Village Parkway Suite 200
Alameda, CA 94501 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Stationary Engineers Local 39 Pension Trust Fund
1001 Marina Village Parkway Suite 200
Alameda, CA 94501 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Stryker Corporation
Purkey & Associates, 5050 Cascade Road, SE Suite A
Grand Rapids, MI 49546 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Surgical Information Systems, LLC
Law Office of Robert S. Lampl 21031 Ventura Blvd., Ste 640
Woodland Hills, CA 91364 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Swinerton Builders
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
c/o Darryl S. Laddin Sysco Los Angeles, Inc.
Arnall Golden Gregory LLP 171 17th Street NW, Suite 2100
Atlanta, GA 30363 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University
Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP Matthew S. Walker, Esq. 12255 El Camino Real, Suite 300
San Diego, CA 92130 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
The Huntington National Bank
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Toyon Associates, Inc.
Felderstein Fitzgerald et al 400 Capitol Mall, Suite 1750
Sacramento, CA 95814 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
U.S. Bank National Association, not individually, but as Indenture Trustee
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
UMB Bank, N.A., as master indenture trustee and Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, as indenture trustee
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
US Foods, Inc.
Bryan Cave LLP 161 North Clark Street Suite 4300
Chicago, IL 60601 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
United Nurses Associations of CA/Union of Health Care Professionals
Bush Gottlieb 801 North Brand Boulevard Suite 950
GLENDALE, CA 91203 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
United States Department of Health and Human Services
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
United States of America, on behalf of the Federal Communications Commission
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company
One Constitution Plaza
Hartford, CT 06103 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Universal Hospital Services, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
University Healthcare Alliance
Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP Matthew S. Walker, Esq. 12255 El Camino Real, Suite 300
San Diego, CA 92130 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
University of Southern California
Hemar Rousso & Heald LLP c/o J. Alexandra Rhim 15910 Ventura Blvd., 12th Fl
Encino, CA 91436 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Verity MOB Financing II LLC
co NantWorks LLC 9920 Jefferson Boulevard
Culver City, CA 90232 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Verity MOB Financing LLC
co NantWorks LLC 9920 Jefferson Boulevard
Culver City, CA 90232 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Workday, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Florencio Zabala
19800 MacArthur Blvd, Suite 1000
Irvine, CA 92612 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Maria Zavala
19800 MacArthur Blvd, Suite 1000
Irvine, CA 92612 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Lesley c/o Riis
NFS Leasing, Inc. 900 Cummins Center Suite 226-U
Beverly, MA 01915 |
Represented By
|
Creditor Committee
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Verity Health System of California, Inc., et al.
|
Represented By
|
Financial Advisor
Berkeley Research Group LLC
|
|
Financial Advisor
Cain Brothers a division of KeyBanc Capital Markets
601 California St Ste 1505
San Francisco, CA 94108 |
|
Health Care Ombudsman
J. Nathan Ruben
4955 Van Nuys Blvd, Suite 308
Sherman Oaks, CA 91403 |
Represented By
|
Health Care Ombudsman
Jacob Nathan Rubin
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
All Care Medical Group, Inc
2675 E. Slauson Avenue
Huntington Park, CA 90255 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Attorney General For The State Of Ca
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
CO Architects
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Cigna Healthcare of California, Inc., and Llife Insurance Company of North America
Atten: William M. Rathbone Gordon Rees 101 West Broadway Suite 2000
San Diego, CA 92101 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
City of Daly City
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
County of Santa Clara
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Courtesy NEF
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Engineers and Scientists of California Local 20, IFPTE
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Ivan Kallick
Manatt, Phelps & Phillips, LLP 11355 West Olympic Blvd. 6th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90064 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Donald R Kirk
Carlton Fields Jorden Burt, P.A. 4221 W. Boy Scout Blvd., Suite 1000
Tampa, FL 33607 |
|
Interested Party
Medical Staff of Seton Medical Center
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Microsoft Corporation
Fox Rothschild LLP 1001 4th Ave Suite 4500
Seattle, WA 98154 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Alan I Nahmias
Mirman, Bubman & Nahmias, LLP 21860 Burbank Boulevard Suite 360
Woodland Hills, CA 91367 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
RCB Equities #1, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Matthew S Walker
Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP 12255 El Camino Real, Ste 300
San Diego, CA 92130 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, as indenture trustee
80 S. Eighth Street Suite 2000
Minneapolis, MN 55402 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Xavier Becerra, Attorney General of California
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
John Ryan Yant
Carlton Fields Jorden Burt, P.A. 4221 W. Boy Scout Blvd., Suite 1000
Tampa, FL 33607 |
|
Special Counsel
Nelson Hardiman LLP
|
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017 |
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Attorney
Hartford Fire Insurance Company
Terminated: 12/20/2018
Los Angeles 355 S. Grand Ave., Suite 2450
Los Angeles, CA 90071 |
Represented By
|
Attorney
Marilyn Klinger
Terminated: 12/27/2018
SMTD Law, LLP 355 S. Grand Avenue Suite 2450
Los Angeles, CA 90071 |
|
Creditor
Quadramed Affinity Corporation and Picis Clinical Solutions Inc.
Terminated: 11/08/2018
Perkins Coie LLP Sara L. Chenetz 1888 Century Park East, Suite 1700
Los Angeles, CA 90067 |
Represented By
|