Member Case
Lead case is: 2:18-bk-20151

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Sheri Bluebond
Case #: 2:18-bk-20180
Case Filed:Aug 31, 2018

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $500,001 to $1 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
St. Vincent Foundation
2131 W 3rd St
Los Angeles, CA 90057-1901
Represented By
John A Moe
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017
Represented By
Hatty K Yip
Office Of The Ust/doj
contact info


Docket last updated: 20 seconds ago
Friday, September 15, 2023
15 15 court Case Reassigned - Admin Order Reassigning Judge Only (batch) Fri 09/15 10:56 AM
In accordance with the Administrative Order 23 - 07 dated 07/28/2023, this case is hereby reassigned from Judge Ernest M. Robles to Judge Sheri Bluebond. (LL2)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 17, 2018
14 14 misc Disclosure of Compensation of Atty for Debtor (Official Form 2030) Wed 10/17 2:28 PM
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Official Form 2030) Filed by Debtor St. Vincent Foundation Related [+]. (Maizel, Samuel)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Monday, October 15, 2018
13 13 misc Statement of Financial Affairs (Official Form 107 or 207) Mon 10/15 6:55 PM
Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual Filing for Bankruptcy (Official Form 107 or 207) Filed by Debtor St. Vincent Foundation Related [+]. (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
12 12 misc Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Official Form 202) Mon 10/15 6:54 PM
Schedule A/B Non-Individual: Property (Official Form 106A/B or 206A/B) , Schedule D Non-Individual: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Official Form 106D or 206D) , Schedule E/F Non-Individual: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Official Form 106F or 206F) , Schedule G Non-Individual: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Official Form 106G or 206G) , Schedule H Non-Individual: Your Codebtors (Official Form 106H or 206H) , Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individual (Official Form 106Sum or 206Sum) , Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Official Form 202) Filed by Debtor St. Vincent Foundation Related [+]. (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Friday, September 14, 2018
11 11 misc List of Equity Security Holders Fri 09/14 4:26 PM
List of Equity Security Holders Filed by Debtor St. Vincent Foundation Related [+]. (Moe, John)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Tuesday, September 04, 2018
6 6 order Joint Administration (BNC-PDF) Tue 09/04 4:24 PM
Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration (BNC-PDF) on Lead Case 2:18-bk-20151 with Member Case 2:18-bk-20180 . LEAD CASE: Verity Health System of California, Inc., Case No. 2:18-bk-20151-ER. An order has been entered in this case directing the procedural consolidation and joint administration of the Chapter 11 cases of Saint Louise Regional Hospital (Case No. 2:18-bk-20162-ER), Verity Holdings, LLC (Case No. 2:18-bk-20163-ER), St. Vincent Medical Center (Case No. 2:18-bk-20164-ER), St. Francis Medical Center (Case No. 2:18-bk-20165-ER), Seton Medical Center (Case No. 2:18-bk-20167-ER), OConnor Hospital (Case No. 2:18-bk-20168-ER), Verity Medical Foundation (Case No. 2:18-bk-20169-ER), St. Vincent Dialysis Center, Inc. (Case No. 2:18-bk-20171-ER), Saint Louise Regional Hospital Foundation (Case No. 2:18-bk-20172-ER), Verity Business Services (Case No. 2:18-bk-20173-ER), Seton Medical Center Foundation (Case No. 2:18-bk-20175-ER), De Paul Ventures, LLC (Case No. 2:18-bk-20176-ER), St. Francis Medical Center of Lynwood Medical Foundation (Case No. 2:18-bk-20178-ER), OConnor Hospital Foundation (Case No. 2:18-bk-20179-ER), St. Vincent Foundation (Case No. 2:18-bk-20180-ER), and De Paul Ventures San Jose Dialysis, LLC (Case No. 2:18-bk-20181-ER). The docket in Case No. 2:18-bk-20151-ER should be consulted for all matters affecting these cases Related [+] Signed on 9/4/2018. (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 2
Friday, August 31, 2018
5 5 misc Case Commencement Deficiency Notice (manual - ccdn) (BNC) Fri 08/31 6:53 PM
Case Commencement Deficiency Notice (BNC) Related [+] (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor St. Vincent Foundation
4 4 misc Deficiency Notice (11 U.S.C. Sec. 521 & Rule 1007) (Ch 11/12) (manual - def) (BNC) Fri 08/31 6:49 PM
Notice of Case Deficiency Under 11 U.S.C. Sec. 521(a)(1) and Bankruptcy Rule 1007 (BNC) Related [+] (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor St. Vincent Foundation
3 3 court Notice of Dismissal of Case If Required Documents Are Not Filed Within 72 Hours (VAN-197) Fri 08/31 6:45 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Case If Required Documents Are Not Filed Within 72 Hours (BNC) . Master Mailing List of Creditors must be uploaded. Incomplete filing due 9/4/18. (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Joint Administration (motion) Fri 08/31 2:53 PM
Motion for Joint Administration Debtors Ex Parte Emergency Motion For Entry Of An Order For Joint Administration Of Cases; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities; Declaration Of Richard G. Adcock Filed by Debtor St. Vincent Foundation (Moe, John)
Related: [-]
1 1 21 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Fri 08/31 1:00 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1717 Filed by St. Vincent Foundation (Moe, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Mailing Matrix
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Fri 08/31 1:18 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(2:18-bk-20180) [misc,volp11] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 47630333. Fee amount 1717.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
court U - Assigned Judge to a case (Manual) Fri 08/31 1:37 PM
Judge Ernest M. Robles added to case due to related case 2:18-bk-20151-ER. (Fleming, Lachelle)
Related: [-]
misc Set Case Commencement Deficiency Deadlines (def/deforco) Fri 08/31 6:48 PM
Set Case Commencement Deficiency Deadlines (def/deforco) Related [+] List of Equity Security Holders due 9/14/2018. Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 9/14/2018. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 9/14/2018. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 9/14/2018. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 9/14/2018. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 9/14/2018. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 9/14/2018. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 9/14/2018. Incomplete Filings due by 9/14/2018. (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor St. Vincent Foundation
misc Set Case Commencement Deficiency Deadlines (ccdn) Fri 08/31 6:49 PM
Set Case Commencement Deficiency Deadlines (ccdn) Related [+] Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Form 2030) due 9/14/2018. (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor St. Vincent Foundation