Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Catherine Peek Mcewen
Case #: 8:18-bk-07590
Case Filed:Sep 07, 2018
Terminated:Feb 06, 2024
Plan Confirmed:Apr 15, 2019

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$100,001 to $500,000
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
UVLrx Therapeutics, Inc.
640 Brooker Creek Blvd Ste 455
Oldsmar, FL 34677-2934
Represented By
Buddy D Ford
Buddy D. Ford, P.A.
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee - TPA
Timberlake Annex, Suite 1200 501 E Polk Street
Tampa, FL 33602


Docket last updated: 12 minutes ago
Thursday, July 18, 2024
381 381 misc Certificate Of Mailing (BK) Thu 07/18 1:07 PM
Certificate of Mailing Proof of Service of Order Filed by Luis Martinez-Monfort on behalf of Liquidating Trustee Tom Santoro Related [+]. (Martinez-Monfort, Luis)
Related: [-] 380
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
380 380 order Compensation Tue 07/16 1:16 PM
Order Granting Application For Compensation Related [+]. Fees awarded to Luis Martinez-Monfort in the amount of $34417.00, expenses awarded: $283.88 Service Instructions: Luis Martinez-Monfort is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Ryan S.)
Related: [-] 374