Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:18-bk-07590

Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Catherine Peek Mcewen
Case #: 8:20-ap-00658
Nature of Suit91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
Case Filed:Dec 17, 2020
Terminated:Mar 09, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London Subscribing to Policy Number DOG01485266
Represented By
Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London Subscribing to Policy Number DOG01485266
contact info
Plaintiff
Tom Santoro, as Liquidating Trustee for the UVL Liquidating Trust, and as Assignee of Michael Harter
1 SE 3rd Avenue, Suite 1400
Miami, FL 33131
Represented By
Brett M Amron
Bast Amron LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Monday, March 22, 2021
24 24 notice Notice of Withdrawal from Case and Request to Stop Electronic Notice Mon 03/22 12:28 PM
Notice of Withdrawal from Case and Request to Stop Electronic Notice Filed by Lynn Maynard Gollin on behalf of Defendant Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London Subscribing to Policy Number DOG01485266. (Gollin, Lynn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 09, 2021
court Close Adversary Case Tue 03/09 3:03 PM
Adversary Case 8:20-ap-658 Closed. (Penny)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 04, 2021
23 23 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Fri 03/05 12:23 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Related [+]. Notice Date 03/04/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #18 )
22 22 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Fri 03/05 12:23 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Related [+]. Notice Date 03/04/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #17 )
Wednesday, March 03, 2021
21 21 order Virtual Order Vacating Order (TEXT ONLY) Wed 03/03 5:28 PM
Order Vacating Order on Motion to Extend Time. THIS CASE came on for consideration on the Court's own motion for the purpose of considering the entry of an appropriate order. The Court has considered the record and finds that on 3/3/2021, this Court erroneously entered an order titled Order on Motion to Extend Time in the above-captioned case and should, therefore, be vacated. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that the Order on Motion to Extend Time is hereby vacated. SO ORDERED by Judge Catherine Peek McEwen (text-only order) This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached. The Court has considered the record and finds that the general case is closed and therefore, this Court has no jurisdiction to consider the matter filed unless the general case is reinstated upon properly filed motion. Related [+]. Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. (Pamella)
Related: [-] 20
20 20 order Extend Time Wed 03/03 4:04 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Defendants Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy Number DOG01485266's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law - Time Extended to March 9, 2021 Related [+]. Service Instructions: Dana Quick is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Bernadette)
Related: [-] 19
19 19 motion Motion to Extend Time Wed 03/03 9:14 AM
Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Defendants Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy Number DOG01485266's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law Filed by Dana R Quick on behalf of Plaintiff Tom Santoro Related [+]. (Quick, Dana)
Related: [-] 8
Tuesday, March 02, 2021
18 18 1 pgs order Order Striking Tue 03/02 8:12 AM
Order Striking Motion to Determine Whether Proceeding Is Core . Related [+]. Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. (Dianna)
Related: [-] 15
17 17 1 pgs order Order Striking Tue 03/02 7:18 AM
Order Striking Motion for Withdrawal of Reference by Defendant . Related [+]. Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. (Margaret)
Related: [-] 14
Monday, March 01, 2021
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Mon 03/01 3:04 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Dana R Quick on behalf of Plaintiff Tom Santoro. (Quick, Dana)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 26, 2021
15 15 motion Motion to Determine Whether Proceeding Is Core Fri 02/26 11:57 PM
Motion to Determine Whether Proceeding Is Core Filed by Lynn Maynard Gollin on behalf of Defendant Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London Subscribing to Policy Number DOG01485266. (Gollin, Lynn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit DE 14
14 14 motion Motion for Withdrawal of Reference Fri 02/26 11:46 PM
Motion for Withdrawal of Reference. Filing Fee Paid. Filed by Lynn Maynard Gollin on behalf of Defendant Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London Subscribing to Policy Number DOG01485266. (Gollin, Lynn)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Receipt of Filing Fee Fri 02/26 11:49 PM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Motion for Withdrawal of Reference(8:20-ap-00658-CPM) [motion,mwdrefad] ( 188.00). Receipt Number 66687868, Amount Paid $ 188.00 (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 23, 2021
13 13 misc Statement of Corporate Ownership Tue 02/23 8:19 AM
Statement of Corporate Ownership. Corporate Affiliates added to case:, Alterra Capital Holdings, Ltd., Antares Underwriting Services, Ltd., Canopius Group, Ltd., Chaucer Holdings PLC, Hardy (Underwriting Agencies) Ltd., Markel Corp. Filed by Lynn Maynard Gollin on behalf of Defendant Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London Subscribing to Policy Number DOG01485266. (Gollin, Lynn)
Related: [-]
Saturday, February 20, 2021
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest Sun 02/21 12:18 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest Related [+]. Notice Date 02/20/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #10 )
Friday, February 19, 2021
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest Sat 02/20 12:24 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest Related [+]. Notice Date 02/19/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #9 )
Thursday, February 18, 2021
10 10 court Notice Of Dismissed/Closed Underlying BK Case Thu 02/18 4:53 PM
Notice of Closed Underlying Bankruptcy Case. Bankruptcy Case Closed on 8:18-bk-7590-CPM . (Susan B.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 17, 2021
9 9 court Notice of Deficient Filing Wed 02/17 5:14 PM
Notice of Deficient Filing. Statement of Corporate Ownership Related [+]. Compliance required no later than 3/8/2021. (Susan B.)
Related: [-] 8
Tuesday, February 16, 2021
8 8 motion Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Tue 02/16 11:04 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Lynn Maynard Gollin on behalf of Defendant Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London Subscribing to Policy Number DOG01485266 Related [+]. (Gollin, Lynn)
Related: [-] 1
Saturday, February 13, 2021
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Sun 02/14 12:16 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Related [+]. Notice Date 02/13/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #6 )
Thursday, February 11, 2021
6 6 order Appear pro hac vice Thu 02/11 12:29 PM
Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice of Tami Kay Lee for Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London Subscribing to Policy Number DOG01485266. Upon completion of the required registration form, a temporary login and password will be issued. Filing privileges are limited to this case and any related adversary proceedings. The attorney is directed to file a statement notifying the Clerk when Attorneys involvement in this case is concluded Related [+]. Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. (Nita)
Related: [-] 4
Tuesday, February 09, 2021
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 02/09 1:48 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Lynn Maynard Gollin on behalf of Defendant Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London Subscribing to Policy Number DOG01485266. (Gollin, Lynn)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Motion to Appear pro hac vice Tue 02/09 1:47 PM
Motion of Tami Kay Lee to Appear pro hac vice Filed by Lynn Maynard Gollin on behalf of Defendant Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London Subscribing to Policy Number DOG01485266. (Gollin, Lynn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit WRITTEN DESIGNATION AND CONSENT TO ACT AS LOCAL COUNSEL
Wednesday, December 23, 2020
3 3 misc Summons Service Executed Wed 12/23 2:35 PM
Service Executed on CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NUMBER DOG01485266 of Summons, Complaint, Local Rule 7001-1. Filed by Brett M Amron on behalf of Plaintiff Tom Santoro Related [+]. (Amron, Brett)
Related: [-] 2 ,1
Monday, December 21, 2020
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Mon 12/21 10:59 AM
Summons issued along with Local Rule 7001-1 - Adversary Proceedings - Procedures. Answer Due 01/20/2021. If one or more defendants are the United States or an officer or agency thereof, add an additional five days to the Answer Due date. A copy of this summons must be included when filing proof of service of this summons. (ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 17, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint - Original Thu 12/17 4:27 PM
Complaint by Tom Santoro against Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London Subscribing to Policy Number DOG01485266. (Fee Paid.) Nature of Suit: [91 (Declaratory judgment)]. (Amron, Brett)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Att: 4 Exhibit D
Att: 5 Exhibit E
Att: 6 Exhibit F
Att: 7 Exhibit G
Att: 8 Exhibit H
Att: 9 Exhibit I
Att: 10 Exhibit J