Gallagher v. NSA, et al
Original Case: 1:18-cv-01525
Tenth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:18-cv-01361 |
Type | civil / usa as party |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Sep 07, 2018 |
Terminated: | Oct 02, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 03, 2018 2:32 AM MDT |
Defendant
NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
DAVID J. SHERMAN
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
NATIONAL SECURITY DIRECTOR
|
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
RYAN GALLAGHER
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Oct 02 2018
[10594330] Default; Procedural termination without judicial action; Clerk of the Court. [18-1361] |
Docket last updated: 10/03/2018 2:32 AM MDT |
Friday, September 07, 2018 | ||
[10587349] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 09/06/2018. Notice of appearance due on 10/09/2018 for Ryan Gallagher. --[Edited 09/07/2018 by SDS to attach corrected letter] 18-1361 | ||
Att: 1 13 pgs Main Document | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs General Docketing Letter - Pro Se |