Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:15-bk-32450

Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Keith L Phillips
Case #: 3:18-ap-03091
Nature of Suit1 null
67 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny
71 Bankruptcy - Injunctive relief - imposition of stay
72 Bankruptcy - Injunctive relief - other
Case Filed:Sep 11, 2018
Terminated:Apr 08, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Blackhawk Mining, LLC
Represented By
Blackhawk Mining, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Virginia Conservation Legacy Fund, Inc.
Represented By
Virginia Conservation Legacy Fund, Inc.
contact info
Defendant
ERP Compliant Fuels, LLC
Represented By
ERP Compliant Fuels, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Laurel Coal Corp.
Represented By
Laurel Coal Corp.
contact info
Defendant
Dennis Wellman
Represented By
Dennis Wellman
contact info
Plaintiff
John D Parsley
Represented By
John D Parsley
contact info
Plaintiff
Vicki L Parsley
Represented By
Vicki L Parsley
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 1:11 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 08, 2020
34 34 court Adversary Proceeding Closed Wed 04/08 3:04 PM
Adversary Proceeding Closed (Baumgartner, Cindy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 18, 2020
33 33 notice Notice of Dismissal Wed 03/18 11:28 AM
Notice of Dismissal (Laurel Coal Corporation) filed by Ronald A. Page Jr. of Ronald Page, PLC on behalf of John D Parsley, Vicki L Parsley. (Page, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2020
32 32 notice Notice of Dismissal Fri 01/31 10:11 AM
Notice of Dismissal filed by Ronald A. Page Jr. of Ronald Page, PLC on behalf of John D Parsley, Vicki L Parsley. (Page, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2019
31 31 court Reopen Adversary Proceeding Mon 05/06 3:24 PM
Reopen Adversary Proceeding (Baumgartner, Cindy)
Related: [-]
30 30 court Adversary Proceeding Closed Mon 05/06 2:16 PM
Adversary Proceeding Closed (Baumgartner, Cindy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 04, 2019
29 29 court BNC certificate of mailing of order Fri 04/05 12:30 AM
BNC certificate of mailing of order Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] related document(s)28 Order Directing
Tuesday, April 02, 2019
28 28 order Directing Tue 04/02 10:33 AM
Agreed Order of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice (Blackhawk Mining LLC); see Order for Details Related [+] (Baumgartner, Cindy)
Related: [-] related document(s)14 Motion to Dismiss Party filed by John D Parsley, Vicki L Parsley
Thursday, March 07, 2019
27 27 court Hearing held Thu 03/07 12:54 PM
Hearing held; SETTLED; Consent Order to be submitted; Related [+] Appearances: Ronald A. Page and David Lunsford for the Plaintiffs; Will Prince and Michael Matheson on behalf of ERP and VCLF; Jed Donaldson on behalf of Black Hawk Mining. (rintyep)
Related: [-] 14 Motion to Dismiss Party filed by John D Parsley, Vicki L Parsley
26 26 court Pre-Trial Conference Held Thu 03/07 12:52 PM
Pre-Trial Conference Held; New Pretrial Conferenct to be scheduled once Amended Complaint and response to complaint are filed; Related [+] Appearances: James K. Donaldson; Ronald Page; Will Prince.(rintyep)
Related: [-] 1 Order Transferring Venue-IN AP Case filed by John D Parsley, Vicki L Parsley
25 25 court Hearing held Thu 03/07 12:50 PM
Hearing held; Continued Generally by Agreement; related document(s):13 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by John D Parsley, Vicki L Parsley) Appearances: Ronald A. Page; Will Prince. (rintyep)
Related: [-]
24 24 court Hearing held Thu 03/07 12:49 PM
Hearing held; Motion GRANTED; Defendant(s) to have 21 days to respond; Related [+] Appearances: Ronald A. Page and David Lunsford for Plaintiffs; Will Prince and Michael Matheson for Defendant ERP/VCLF. Consent Order to be submitted. (rintyep)
Related: [-] 10 Motion to Amend filed by John D Parsley, Vicki L Parsley
23 23 order Continuing/Rescheduling/Setting Hearing Thu 03/07 10:33 AM
Order Setting Hearing - Status Conference; hearing on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (13) continued to a future date and time as agreed Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 3/7/2019 at 11:00 AM at Judge Phillips' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5100, Richmond, Virginia. (Baumgartner, Cindy)
Related: [-] related document(s)19 Stipulation filed by Virginia Conservation Legacy Fund, Inc., ERP Compliant Fuels, LLC, Dennis Wellman
Wednesday, March 06, 2019
22 22 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 03/06 5:30 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Michael Gordon Matheson of ThompsonMcMullan, P.C. on behalf of ERP Compliant Fuels, LLC, Virginia Conservation Legacy Fund, Inc., Dennis Wellman. (Matheson, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 04, 2019
21 21 answer Objection Mon 03/04 9:23 PM
Objection to (Objection to Plaintiffs' Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss and Reservation of Rights) Related [+] filed by William Daniel Prince IV of ThompsonMcMullan, PC on behalf of ERP Compliant Fuels, LLC, Virginia Conservation Legacy Fund, Inc., Dennis Wellman. (Prince, William)
Related: [-] related document(s)14 Motion to Dismiss Party filed by John D Parsley, Vicki L Parsley
20 20 answer Reply Mon 03/04 11:44 AM
Omnibus Reply to (A) Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss, and (B) Amended Motion for Summary Judgment; and Reservation of Rights Related [+] filed by James K. Donaldson of Vandeventer Black LLP on behalf of Blackhawk Mining, LLC. (Donaldson, James)
Related: [-] related document(s)13 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by John D Parsley, Vicki L Parsley,14 Motion to Dismiss Party filed by John D Parsley, Vicki L Parsley
19 19 misc Stipulation Mon 03/04 11:43 AM
Joint Stipulation and Consent Order Continuing Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Scheduling a Status Conference for March 7, 2019 By ERP Compliant Fuels, LLC, Virginia Conservation Legacy Fund, Inc., Dennis Wellman and Between Related [+] filed by William Daniel Prince IV of ThompsonMcMullan, PC on behalf of ERP Compliant Fuels, LLC, Virginia Conservation Legacy Fund, Inc., Dennis Wellman. (Prince, William)
Related: [-] related document(s)15 Notice of Hearing filed by John D Parsley, Vicki L Parsley
Friday, March 01, 2019
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 03/01 4:43 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service filed by William Daniel Prince IV of ThompsonMcMullan, PC on behalf of ERP Compliant Fuels, LLC, Virginia Conservation Legacy Fund, Inc., Dennis Wellman. (Prince, William)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 21, 2019
17 17 court Hearing set Thu 02/21 12:07 PM
Hearing set for proper placement of matter on the Court Docket Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 3/7/2019 at 11:00 AM at Judge Phillips' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5100, Richmond, Virginia. (Rintye, Peggy)
Related: [-] related document(s)14 Motion to Dismiss Party filed by John D Parsley, Vicki L Parsley
16 16 court Hearing set Thu 02/21 12:05 PM
Hearing set for proper placement of matter on the Court Docket Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 3/7/2019 at 11:00 AM at Judge Phillips' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5100, Richmond, Virginia. (Rintye, Peggy)
Related: [-] related document(s)10 Motion to Amend filed by John D Parsley, Vicki L Parsley
Tuesday, February 19, 2019
15 15 notice Notice of Hearing Tue 02/19 3:15 PM
Notice of Hearing Related [+] filed by Ronald A. Page Jr. of Ronald Page, PLC on behalf of John D Parsley, Vicki L Parsley. Hearing scheduled for 3/7/2019 at 11:00 AM at Judge Phillips' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5100, Richmond, Virginia. (Page, Ronald)
Related: [-] related document(s)13 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by John D Parsley, Vicki L Parsley,14 Motion to Dismiss Party filed by John D Parsley, Vicki L Parsley
14 14 motion Dismiss Party Tue 02/19 3:11 PM
Motion to Dismiss Party (Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss Black Hawk Mining, LLC) filed by Ronald A. Page Jr. of Ronald Page, PLC on behalf of John D Parsley, Vicki L Parsley. (Page, Ronald)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Summary Judgment Tue 02/19 3:10 PM
Amended Motion for Summary Judgment (1.Amended Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Incorporated Memorandum of Points and Authorities) Related [+] filed by Ronald A. Page Jr. of Ronald Page, PLC on behalf of John D Parsley, Vicki L Parsley. (Page, Ronald)
Related: [-] related document(s)9 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by John D Parsley, Vicki L Parsley
Wednesday, February 13, 2019
12 12 notice Notice of Hearing Wed 02/13 1:44 PM
Notice of Hearing Related [+] filed by Ronald A. Page Jr. of Ronald Page, PLC on behalf of John D Parsley, Vicki L Parsley. Hearing scheduled for 3/7/2019 at 11:00 AM at Judge Phillips' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5100, Richmond, Virginia. (Page, Ronald)
Related: [-] related document(s)9 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by John D Parsley, Vicki L Parsley,10 Motion to Amend filed by John D Parsley, Vicki L Parsley,11 Memorandum filed by John D Parsley, Vicki L Parsley
11 11 3 pgs misc Memorandum Wed 02/13 1:43 PM
Memorandum (Memorandum of Points and Authorities Supporting Motion to File Amended Complaint and to Amend Style of Case) Related [+] filed by Ronald A. Page Jr. of Ronald Page, PLC on behalf of John D Parsley, Vicki L Parsley. (Page, Ronald)
Related: [-] related document(s)10 Motion to Amend filed by John D Parsley, Vicki L Parsley
10 10 motion Amend Wed 02/13 1:41 PM
Motion to Amend (Motion to File Amended Complaint and to Amend Style of Case) Related [+] filed by Ronald A. Page Jr. of Ronald Page, PLC on behalf of John D Parsley, Vicki L Parsley. (Page, Ronald)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Order Transferring Venue-IN AP Case filed by John D Parsley, Vicki L Parsley
9 9 motion Summary Judgment Wed 02/13 1:40 PM
Motion for Summary Judgment (Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Incorporated Memorandum of Points and Authorities) filed by Ronald A. Page Jr. of Ronald Page, PLC on behalf of John D Parsley, Vicki L Parsley. (Page, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 12, 2019
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 02/12 8:22 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Ronald A. Page Jr. of Ronald Page, PLC on behalf of John D Parsley, Vicki L Parsley. (Page, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 23, 2019
7 7 court Hearing continued Thu 01/24 9:12 AM
Status Hearing continued; Motion to Dismiss Blackhawk as a defendant in complaint to be scheduled for March 7, 2019; Related [+] Appearances: James K. Donaldson on behalf of Blackhawk; David Lunsford (via Court-Solutions) on behalf of John and Vicki Parsley. Status Hearing scheduled for 03/07/2019 at 11:00 AM at Judge Phillips' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5100, Richmond, Virginia. (rintyep)
Related: [-] 1 Order Transferring Venue-IN AP Case filed by John D Parsley, Vicki L Parsley
Friday, January 11, 2019
6 6 notice Notice of Hearing Fri 01/11 10:27 AM
Notice of Hearing Related [+] filed by James K. Donaldson of Vandeventer Black LLP on behalf of Blackhawk Mining, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 1/23/2019 at 02:00 PM at Judge Phillips' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5100, Richmond, Virginia. (Donaldson, James)
Related: [-] -docketed Notice of Status Conference related document(s)4 Statement filed by Blackhawk Mining, LLC,5 Notice of Deficient Filing Issued
5 5 court Deficient Filing Notice Request Fri 01/11 10:07 AM
Notice of Deficient Filing Issued to James Donaldson regarding Document does not match the event entry used for docketing. Please review this filing and redocket using the correct event entry or redocket to attach the correct document. Related [+] Document(s) due by 1/25/2019. (Baumgartner, Cindy)
Related: [-] related document(s)4 Statement filed by Blackhawk Mining, LLC
Thursday, January 10, 2019
4 4 misc Statement Thu 01/10 10:49 AM
Statement (Notice of Status Conference) filed by James K. Donaldson of Vandeventer Black LLP on behalf of Blackhawk Mining, LLC. (Donaldson, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 18, 2018
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 09/18 3:25 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service filed by James K. Donaldson of Spotts Fain PC on behalf of Blackhawk Mining, LLC. (Donaldson, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 11, 2018
2 2 court Acknowledgment Letter Re: Transferred Case Tue 09/11 1:35 PM
Acknowledgment Letter of Receipt of Transferred Case to Eastern District of Virginia, Richmond - New Case Number: 18-03091 (Baumgartner, Cindy)
Related: [-]
1 1 4 pgs order AP Transferring Venue-IN Tue 09/11 1:21 PM
Adversary case 18-03091 Order Transferring Venue from Southern District of West Virginia, Charleston Division, Original Case number 18-02002 filed on 01/31/18 filed by John D Parsley, Vicki L Parsley. Nature of Suit: (71 (Injunctive relief - reinstatement of stay)), (72 (Injunctive relief - other)), (01 (Determination of removed claim or cause)), (67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)) Associated Bankruptcy Case Number: 3:15-bk-32450 (Baumgartner, Cindy) Additional attachment(s) added on 9/11/2018 (Gary, Lisa). Modified on 9/11/2018 (Gary, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Removal
Att: 2 Notice
Att: 3 CheckList
Att: 4 Answer
Att: 5 Answer
Att: 6 BNC
Att: 7 Order
Att: 8 Statement
Att: 9 BNC
Att: 10 Motion
Att: 11 Motion
Att: 12 Motion
Att: 13 Memo
Att: 14 Response
Att: 15 Response
Att: 16 Response
Att: 17 Reply
Att: 18 Reply
Att: 19 BNC
Att: 20 Certified Docket Sheet