Illinois Northern District Court
Judge:Virginia M Kendall
Case #: 1:18-cv-06785
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1331 Federal Question
Case Filed:Oct 09, 2018
Last checked: Sunday Apr 07, 2019 4:54 AM CDT
Defendant
Nexstar Media Group, Inc.
Represented By
Eliot A. Adelson
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Peter M. McCormack
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
James H. Mutchnik
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Catie Ventura
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Jacob H. Johnston
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Defendant
Sinclair Broadcast Group, Inc.
Represented By
Jonathan Lee Greenblatt
Shearman And Sterling LLP
contact info
Jerome Steven Fortinsky
Shearman & Sterling, LLP
contact info
Gregory J. Scandaglia
Scandaglia Ryan LLP
contact info
Defendant
Hearst Television Inc.
Represented By
Julie North
Cravath, Swaine & Moore LLP
contact info
Eva M Saketkoo
Hearst Corp. Office Of General Counsel
contact info
Natalie J. Spears
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Evan R. Chesler
Cravath, Swaine & Moore LLP
contact info
Defendant
Tribune Media Company
Represented By
John Augustine Bourgeois
Kramon And Graham PA
contact info
William B. Michael
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
contact info
Daniel H. Levi
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
contact info
Christopher M. Tom
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
contact info
Gerald P Meyer
Mololamken LLP
contact info
Nicholas A. Handler
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
contact info
Jay Cohen
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
contact info
Ameya Ananth
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
contact info
Defendant
Tribune Broadcasting Company, LLC
Represented By
John Augustine Bourgeois
Kramon And Graham PA
contact info
William B. Michael
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
contact info
Daniel H. Levi
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
contact info
Christopher M. Tom
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
contact info
Nicholas A. Handler
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
contact info
Jay Cohen
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
contact info
Ameya Ananth
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
contact info
Defendant
Does 1-20
Defendant
Hearst Communications, Inc.
Defendant
Hearst Communications
Represented By
Julie North
Cravath, Swaine & Moore LLP
contact info
Defendant
Gray Television, Inc.
Represented By
Anita K. Mazda
Cooley LLP
contact info
Jon F Cieslak
Cooley LLP
contact info
John Charles Dwyer
Cooley LLP
contact info
Laura Grossfield Birger
Cooley Llp (ny)
contact info
Lisa Michelle Mazzone
Figliulo & Silverman, P.C.
contact info
Beatriz Mejia
Cooley LLP
contact info
Peter A. Silverman
Figliulo & Silverman
contact info
Mazda K Antia
Cooley Godward Kronish LLP
contact info
Defendant
Tegna, Inc.
Represented By
Nathaniel Kenneth Sinnott Wackman
Jenner & Block LLP
contact info
Rachel Sandel Morse
Jenner & Block LLP
contact info
Ross Benjamin Bricker
Jenner & Block LLP
contact info
Andrew Francis Merrick
Jenner & Block LLP
contact info
In Re
In Re: Local TV Advertising Antitrust Litigation
Represented By
Jiamin Chen
Joseph Saveri Law Firm
contact info
Kenneth A. Wexler
Wexler Wallace LLP
contact info
Steven N. Williams
Joseph Saveri Law Firm
contact info
Tyler J. Story
Wexler Wallace LLP
contact info
Justin Nicholas Boley
Wexler Wallace LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
The Barnes Firm, L.C.
Represented By
Robert J. Wozniak
Freed Kanner London & Millen, LLC
contact info
Michael Jerry Freed
Freed Kanner London & Millen, LLC
contact info
Daniel Jay Mogin
Moginrubin LLP
contact info
Jodie Michelle Williams
Moginrubin LLP
contact info
Steven A Kanner
Freed Kanner London & Millen, LLC
contact info
Jennifer M. Oliver
Moginrubin LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
The Bon-Ton Stores, Inc.
Represented By
Amy Elisabeth Keller
Dicello Levitt Gutzler LLC
contact info
Gregory Asciolla
Labaton Sucharow Llp-Ny
contact info
Karin E. Garvey
Labaton Sucharow, LLP
contact info
John E Tangren
Dicello Levitt & Casey LLC
contact info
Jonathan Scott Crevier
Labaton Sucharow LLP
contact info
Adam J. Levitt
Dicello Levitt Gutzler LLC
contact info
Brian Morrison
Labaton Sucharow LLP
contact info
Adam M. Prom
Dicello Levitt & Casey LLC
contact info
Robin Van Der Meulen
Labaton Sucharow LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Thoughtworx, Inc. d/b/a MCM Services Group
Represented By
Robert J. Wozniak
Freed Kanner London & Millen, LLC
contact info
Michael Loren Silverman
The Bruno Firm
contact info
Michael Jerry Freed
Freed Kanner London & Millen, LLC
contact info
Steven A Kanner
Freed Kanner London & Millen, LLC
contact info
Douglas A Millen
Freed Kanner London & Millen, LLC
contact info
Kimberly A. Justice
Freed Kanner London & Millen LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Walley's Auto Sales, Inc.
Represented By
Robert J. Wozniak
Freed Kanner London & Millen, LLC
contact info
Robert Samuel Kitchenoff
Weinstein Kitchenoff & Asher LLC
contact info
Michael Jerry Freed
Freed Kanner London & Millen, LLC
contact info
Steven A Kanner
Freed Kanner London & Millen, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Southern Chevrolet Cadillac, Inc.
Represented By
Christopher J. Cormier
Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC
contact info
Warren T. Burns
Burns Charest LLP
contact info
Stewart M. Weltman
Siprut PC
contact info
Korey Arthur Nelson
Burns Charest LLP
contact info
Todd Lawrence McLawhorn
Siprut PC
contact info
Plaintiff
One Source Heating & Cooling, LLC
P.O. Box 739
Gardendale, AL 35071
Represented By
Robert J. Wozniak
Freed Kanner London & Millen, LLC
contact info
James M Terrell
Mccallum, Methvin & Terrell, P.C.
contact info
Lesley E. Weaver
Bleichmar Fonti & Auld LLP
contact info
Justin Presnal
Simmons Hanly Conroy LLC
contact info
Jonathan Schochor
Schochor Federico And Staton PA
contact info
Jayne Conroy
Simmons Hanly Conroy LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Northtown Automotive Companies Inc.
Represented By
Marvin Alan Miller
Miller Law LLC
contact info
Andrew Szot
Miller Law LLC
contact info
Jeffrey A. Klafter
Klafter Olsen & Lesser LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Plaintiffs' Steering Committee
Represented By
Hollis L. Salzman
Robins Kaplan Llp (nyc)
contact info
Megan Elizabeth Jones
Hausfeld LLP
contact info
Kimberly A. Justice
Freed Kanner London & Millen LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
My Philly Lawyer
Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated 1500 John F. Kennedy Boulevard, Suite 1410
Philadelphia, PA 19102
Represented By
Eugene A. Spector
Spector Roseman & Kodroff, P.C.
contact info
David Peter Mclafferty
Mclafferty & Associates, P.C.
contact info
John Ritchie Solter, Jr
Azrael Franz Schwab And Lipowitz LLC
contact info
William Caldes
Spector Roseman And Kodroff PC
contact info
David P. McLafferty
Mclafferty & Associates P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Masseys Jewelers
Represented By
Alexandra S. Bernay
Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP
contact info
Patrick J Coughlin
Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP
contact info
James E Barz
Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP
contact info
Carmen A. Medici
Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP
contact info
Frank Anthony Richter
Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd
contact info
David W. Mitchell
Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Law Offices of Peter Miller, P.A.
Represented By
Cyril Vincent Smith, III
Zuckerman Spaeder LLP
contact info
Geoffrey Coyle Jarvis
Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check, LLP
contact info
Asher S Alavi
Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check, LLP
contact info
Alicia Leigh Shelton
Zuckerman Spaeder LLP
contact info
Jonathan F. Neumann
Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check LLP
contact info
Kimberly A. Justice
Freed Kanner London & Millen LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
LM SAC, LLC
Represented By
Christopher J. Cormier
Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC
contact info
Warren T. Burns
Burns Charest LLP
contact info
Austin Blair Cohen
Levin Fishbein Sedran & Berman
contact info
Keith J. Verrier
Levin Fishbein Sedran & Berman
contact info
Stewart M. Weltman
Siprut PC
contact info
Korey Arthur Nelson
Burns Charest LLP
contact info
Todd Lawrence McLawhorn
Siprut PC
contact info
Howard J. Sedran
Levin Sedran & Berman
contact info
Plaintiff
John O'Neil Johnson Toyota, LLC
Represented By
Victoria Romanenko Sims
Cuneo Gilbert & Laduca, LLP
contact info
Shannon Marie McNulty
Clifford Law Offices
contact info
Robert A. Clifford
Clifford Law Offices, P.C.
contact info
Paul Mark Sandler
Shapiro Sher Guinot And Sandler
contact info
Eric R Harlan
Shapiro Sher Guinot And Sandler
contact info
Plaintiff
Holmen Locker & Meat Market
Represented By
Bethany R. Turke
Wexler Wallace LLP
contact info
Kyla J Gibboney
Joseph Saveri Law Firm
contact info
Kenneth A. Wexler
Wexler Wallace LLP
contact info
Justin Nicholas Boley
Wexler Wallace LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Hoglund Chwialkowski & Mrozik, P.L.L.C.
Represented By
Kyle Alan Shamberg
Lite Depalma Greenberg, LLC
contact info
Katrina Carroll
Lite Depalma Greenberg LLC
contact info
Garrett D Blanchfield, Jr.
Reinhardt Wendorf & Blanchfield
contact info
Plaintiff
Gibbons Ford, LP
Represented By
Bethany R. Turke
Wexler Wallace LLP
contact info
Kenneth A. Wexler
Wexler Wallace LLP
contact info
Michelle J. Looby
Gustafson Gluek PLLC
contact info
Justin Nicholas Boley
Wexler Wallace LLP
contact info
Patrick Howard
Saltz Mongeluzzi Barrett & Bendesky
contact info
Plaintiff
Randal S. Ford
Represented By
Stephanie Ann Scharf
Scharf Banks Marmor LLC
contact info
Hilary K. Scherrer
Hausfeld LLP
contact info
Megan Elizabeth Jones
Hausfeld LLP
contact info
Tamara Robyn Freilich
Hausfeld LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Kevin Forbes
Represented By
Joseph P. Guglielmo
Scottscott, Attorneys At Law, LLP
contact info
Amanda F Lawrence
Scottscott, Attorneys At Law, LLP
contact info
Derek Yeats Brandt
Mccune Wright Arevalo, LLP
contact info
Kristen M. Anderson
Scottscott LLP
contact info
Thomas Boardman
Scottscott, Attorneys At Law, LLP
contact info
Walter W. Noss
Scottscott Attorneys At Law LLP
contact info
Christopher M. Burke
Scottscott LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Dozier Law Firm LLC
Represented By
Daniel C Hedlund
Gustafson Gluek PLLC
contact info
Bethany R. Turke
Wexler Wallace LLP
contact info
Daniel E Gustafson
Gustafson Gluek PLLC
contact info
Kenneth A. Wexler
Wexler Wallace LLP
contact info
Michelle J. Looby
Gustafson Gluek PLLC
contact info
Mark Richard Miller
Wexler Wallace LLP
contact info
Justin Nicholas Boley
Wexler Wallace LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Curb Appeal Madison LLC
Represented By
Daniel C Hedlund
Gustafson Gluek PLLC
contact info
Bethany R. Turke
Wexler Wallace LLP
contact info
Daniel E Gustafson
Gustafson Gluek PLLC
contact info
Kenneth A. Wexler
Wexler Wallace LLP
contact info
Michelle J. Looby
Gustafson Gluek PLLC
contact info
Justin Nicholas Boley
Wexler Wallace LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Crowley Webb and Associates, Inc.
Represented By
Robert N. Kaplan
Kaplan, Kilsheimer & Fox LLP
contact info
Gary L. Specks
Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP
contact info
Elana Katcher
Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Clay, Massey & Associates, P.C.
Represented By
Nathaniel Caleb Ament-Stone
Robins Kaplan LLP
contact info
Meegan F. Hollywood
Robins Kaplan LLP
contact info
Hollis Salzman
Robins Kaplan LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Cellino & Barnes, P.C.
Represented By
Scott Vincent Papp
Lowey Dannenberg P.C.
contact info
Barbara J Hart
Lowey Dannenberg, P.C.
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Plaintiff
Mowrer for Iowa
Terminated: 02/07/2019
Represented By
Suyash Agrawal
Massey & Gail LLP
contact info
Kalpana Srinivasan
Susman Godfrey L.L.P.
contact info
Leonard A. Gail
Massey & Gail
contact info
Oleg Elkhunovich
Susman Godfrey L.L.P.
contact info
Bryan Caforio
Susman Godfrey L.L.P.
contact info
Eli Johnson Kay-Oliphant
Massey & Gail LLP
contact info

GPO Nov 06 2020
nd the Motion to Strike the Class Allegations 328 is denied. See Opinion for further details. Mailed notice(lk, )MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 11/6/2020. Broadcaster Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 328 is denied, Gray TV's Motion to Dismiss 330 is granted, Katz's Motion to Dismiss 346 is denied, a
GPO Jul 05 2022
MEMORANDUM Order: For the reasons stated in the attached Memorandum Order, Plaintiffs' Motion to Quash and/or For Protective Order Regarding Subpoenas Issued to Absent Class Members (ECF. No. 523) is granted. All matters relating to the referral of this matter having been addressed, Judge Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert no longer referred to the case. Signed by the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert on 7/5/2022. Mailed notice(ber, )
GPO Aug 29 2022
MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 8/29/2022. ShareBuilders's Motion to Dismiss 588 is granted and ShareBuilders is dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiffs may timely amend their complaint should they discover additional facts that plausibly implicate ShareBuilders in the underlying conspiracy. See Opinion for further details. Mailed notice(lk, )
GPO Oct 21 2022
MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 10/21/2022. The Court dismisses as moot Sinclair's and Griffin's Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings 637, 638 because the Court has already established ShareBuilders did not facilitate Plaintiffs' alleged price-fixing conspiracy or their alleged exchange of competitively sensitive information in the Court's Opinion and Order granting ShareBuilders's Motion to Dismiss, (dkt. 716). See Opinion for further details. Mailed notice(lk, )
GPO Feb 09 2023
MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 2/9/2023. The Court denies Defendants' Motion to Compel Discovery 652. See Opinion for further details. Mailed notice(lk, )
GPO Aug 30 2023
MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 8/30/2023. The Court grants in part and denies in part Plaintiffs' Motion for Spoliation Sanctions against Defendant Griffin Communications, Inc. 960. The Court grants fee-shifting sanctions against Griffin as described in Opinion. Plaintiffs shall file their fee petition by 9/21/2023 with any objections by Griffin to be filed by 10/5/2023. Please refer to Opinion for further details. Mailed notice(lk, )
GPO Aug 31 2023
MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 8/31/2023. The Court grants Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Defendant Nexstar Group to produce whitepapers, including any attached exhibits, submitted to the U.S. Department of Justice in response to the Department's Merger Investigation and Pacing Investigation, if such documents exist and are not subject to an evidentiary privilege 977. Further, the Court orders Defendant Nexstar Group to pay Plaintiffs' reasonable expenses and costs, including attorney's fees, associated with bringing this Motion. [Id.] Please refer to Opinion for further details. Mailed notice(lk, )
GPO Jan 16 2024
MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 1/16/2024. The Special Master Report and Recommendation No. 1 (Dkts. 1030, 1033) is accepted and Defendants' Objections are overruled 1052. Please refer to Opinion for further details. Mailed notice(lk, )

Docket last updated: 02/25/2025 4:17 AM CST
Tuesday, October 09, 2018
1 1 TRANSFER order of 10/3/2018 from MDL Panel establishing MDL 2867. Case No. 18 cv 6785 master docket. (mma, )
Related: [-]